Ferraiori v. Triterras, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:20-cv-10795-CS
District Judge Cathy Seibel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 26, 2021 at 1:10 PM DT (3.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Raffaele Ferraiori, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Henry Linehan +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 clinehan@glancylaw.com
Space Gregory Bradley Linkh +1 646 722 4180 glinkh@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo Marat Rosenberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Anne Havlin +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 kim.havlin@whitecase.com
No Logo Srinivas Koneru, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peggy Senyie Chen +1 212 404 8722 pschen@duanemorris.com
Space DANA B. KLINGES +1 215 979 1143 +1 215 405 2632 dklinges@duanemorris.com
No Logo Triterras, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peggy Senyie Chen +1 212 404 8722 pschen@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DANA B. KLINGES +1 215 979 1143 +1 215 405 2632 dklinges@duanemorris.com
Office White Plains
Filed 12/21/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Westchester
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: oral argument held on 4/15/2021 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Angela O*Donnell, (914) 390-4025. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021..(O'Donnell, Angela)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a oral argument proceeding held on 4/15/2021 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(O'Donnell, Angela)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Exhibit to Pleading
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Notice of appearance
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peggy Senyie Chen on behalf of Srinivas Koneru, Triterras, Inc...(Chen, Peggy)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Notice of appearance
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana B. Klinges on behalf of Srinivas Koneru, Triterras, Inc...(Klinges, Dana)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel and subject to the Court's approval, as follows: 1. Defendants waive service of the summons and initial complaint and appear in this Action by their undersigned counsel, but reserve all defenses other than those based upon service of process. Defendants have no obligation to respond to the initial complaint in this Action. 2. Within 45 days of the Court's approval of this Stipulation, Lead Plaintiff will file an amended complaint. 3. Within 60 days of the filing of an amended complaint, Defendants will answer, move or otherwise respond thereto. 4. Within 45 days of the filing of a motion to dismiss, Lead Plaintiff will file papers in opposition thereto. 5. Within 30 days of the filing of opposition to any motion to dismiss, Defendants will file reply papers in further support of such motion. 6. If a deadline herein falls on a weekend or federal holiday, the deadline will move to the next business day. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original and all of which will constitute one document, and copies by facsimile or in electronic format will be deemed originals for all purposes. An electronic signature on this Stipulation will be considered an original signature. The 6/14/21 conference is canceled. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 5/17/2021) (mml)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Notice of appearance
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Anne Havlin on behalf of Marat Rosenberg..(Havlin, Kimberly)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Russello, Joseph)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Joseph Russello dated May 17, 2021 re: Revised Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Establishing Schedule. Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Russello, Joseph)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [23] Letter filed by John A. Erlandson. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed schedule seems awfully leisurely. We will have a conference on 6/14/21 at 2:30 pm to discuss. The parties are also welcome to submit a tighter scheduled that may obviate the need for the conference. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 6/14/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 5/12/2021) (mml)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                        PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Russello, Joseph)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Joseph Russello dated May 12, 2021 re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Establishing Schedule. Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Russello, Joseph)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021 Notice of appearance
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William A. Massa on behalf of John A. Erlandson..(Massa, William)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Frank Russello on behalf of John A. Erlandson..(Russello, Joseph)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/15/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL: The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. The Motion is GRANTED. 3. John A. Erlandson is appointed Lead Plaintiff pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(iii). 4. John A. Erlandson's selection of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Lead Counsel is hereby approved, pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v). Lead Counsel shall have the following responsibilities and duties on behalf of Lead Plaintiff and the putative class: (As further set forth herein.) IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/15/2021) (va)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Oral Argument
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Bench Ruling held on 4/15/2021 re: [10] MOTION to Appoint John A. Erlandson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John A. Erlandson, [5] MOTION to Appoint Raffaele Ferraiori to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Raffaele Ferraiori. Plaintiff's counsel Charles Linehan, Esq. appears telephonically. Movant's counsel(s) David Rosenfeld, Esq. and Jennifer Caringal, Esq. appear telephonically. Law Clerk Joshua Cohen appears telephonically. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby GRANTS Movant's (Erlandson) Motion to Serve as lead Plaintiff and approves the selection of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as lead counsel. The Court DENIES Plaintiff Ferraiori's Motion. The Clerk is directed to terminate Motions (Docs # 5 and 10). The Court hereby STRIKES Paragraph Two of the proposed Order. The Court also extends Plaintiff's time to serve the Complaint until May 31, 2021. See transcript. Motion(s) terminated: [10] MOTION to Appoint John A. Erlandson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John A. Erlandson, [5] MOTION to Appoint Raffaele Ferraiori to serve as lead plaintiff(s)and for Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Raffaele Ferraiori. (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (wc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [18] Motion for Charles H. Linehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [18] MOTION for Charles H. Linehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24379293. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/12/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                        MOTION for Charles H. Linehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24379293. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order).(Linehan, Charles)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Bench Ruling on the pending Motion(s) is scheduled for April 15, 2021 at 2:45 p.m. (via telephone). Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. The parties should call in from a landline phone (if possible), announce their last name(s) before addressing the Court at any time during the call, and mute their lines (pressing *6 on phone) when not speaking. Telephone Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 02:45 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [10] MOTION to Appoint John A. Erlandson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Rosenfeld, David)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [10] MOTION to Appoint John A. Erlandson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori..(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [5] MOTION to Appoint Raffaele Ferraiori to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Lead Counsel. . Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Rosenfeld, David)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
                                                                  ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. [13] Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by John A. Erlandson. Related Document Number: [10]..(Rosenfeld, David) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                      DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: [10] MOTION to Appoint John A. Erlandson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by John A. Erlandson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, # (2) Exhibit B - Certification, # (3) Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, # (4) Exhibit D - Declaration of John A. Erlandson).(Rosenfeld, David)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [10] MOTION to Appoint John A. Erlandson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Rosenfeld, David)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021, Terminated: 4/15/2021 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s)
                                                                          MOTION to Appoint John A. Erlandson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Rosenfeld, David)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from David A. Rosenfeld dated 2/19/21 re: Pre-Motion Conference Letter. Document filed by John A. Erlandson..(Rosenfeld, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori. Related Document Number: [5]..(Linkh, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                DECLARATION of Gregory B. Linkh in Support re: [5] MOTION to Appoint Raffaele Ferraiori to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Press Release, # (2) Exhibit B - Movant Loss Chart, # (3) Exhibit C - GPM Firm Resume).(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [5] MOTION to Appoint Raffaele Ferraiori to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Lead Counsel. . Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori..(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021, Terminated: 4/15/2021 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s)
                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Raffaele Ferraiori to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori..(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Srinivas Koneru, Marat Rosenberg, Triterras, Inc...(pc)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                        Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                            CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (pc)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Raffaele Ferraiori, Triterras, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Triterras, Inc., Srinivas Koneru, Marat Rosenberg, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori..(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Srinivas Koneru, Marat Rosenberg, Triterras, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23138352)Document filed by Raffaele Ferraiori..(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 529 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?