District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Illinois Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit United States Supreme Court

JNS Power and Control System, v. 350 Green, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 13-3365

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2020 at 10:56 PM ST (3.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 350 Green, Llc, A Virginia Limited Liability Company, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven L. Baron sbaron@bhhlawfirm.com
Space Michael Ira Bernstein +1 305 672 9544 +1 305 672 4572 michael@bernstein-lawfirm.com
No Logo 350 HOLDINGS, LLC, Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "350 Holdings, Llc, A Florida Limited Liability Company"
No Logo Car Charging Group, Inc., Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Car Charging Group, Incorporated, A Nevada Corporation"
Blink Charging Co. Predecessor Entity, Blink Charging Co.
No Logo Jns Holding Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Jns Power And Control System Incorporated, An Illinois Corporation, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick E. Deady +1 312 946 1800
Space J. Michael Tecson +1 312 946 1800
Nature of Suit 4190 - Contract: Other
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1:13-cv-03124
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1:13-cv-03124
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702618115 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None ?
FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 09/09/2015 Final Order with Mandate and Bill of Costs sent to the District Court Clerk. [6696688-2] [6696688] [13-3365] (SK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702618107 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None ?
    Mandate issued with bill of costs in the amount of $96.00. No record to be returned. [49] [6696686] [13-3365] (SK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702613428 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None ?
      Filed Bill of Costs by Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated in the amount of $96.00. [48] [6694876] [13-3365] (Tecson, J.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702603135 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None ?
        ORDER: Final judgment filed per nonprecedential disposition. With costs: yes. [47] [6691013] [13-3365] (CR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702603106 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None ?Court Filing
          Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge; Ann Claire Williams, Circuit Judge and John Daniel Tinder, Circuit Judge. [46] [6691005] [13-3365] (CR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None ?
            Case argued by Michael Ira Bernstein for Appellant 350 Green, LLC and Patrick E. Deady for Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated. [45] [6627515] [13-3365] (GW)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None ?
              Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge; Ann Claire Williams, Circuit Judge and John Daniel Tinder, Circuit Judge. [44] [6627514] [13-3365] (GW)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702432335 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None ?
                Received argument confirmation from Michael I. Bernstein, Esq. for Appellant 350 Green, LLC. [43] [6625708] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702432161 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                  Received argument confirmation from Patrick E. Deady for Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated. [42] [6625636] [13-3365] (Deady, Patrick)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702426411 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None ?
                    Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant 350 Green, LLC. Paper copies due on 12/02/2014 Electronically Transmitted. [41] [6623530] [13-3365] (AB)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702426226 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None ?
                      Submitted appellant reply brief by Michael Ira Bernstein for Appellant 350 Green, LLC. [40] [6623470] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702422137 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None ?
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702421905 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None ?
                          Added Attorney(s) Patrick E. Deady for party(s) Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated, in case 13-3365 per disclosure statement. Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Patrick E. Deady for Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated. [38] [6621944] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [13-3365]--[Edited 11/18/2014 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Deady, Patrick)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702421595 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None ?
                            Motion filed by Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated to correct Jurisdictional Statement in Appellate Brief, or alternatively, to file amended Appellate Brief. [37] [6621827] [13-3365] (Tecson, J.)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702414112 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None ?
                              Argument set for Friday, December 12, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [36] [6619018] [13-3365] (SK)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702409895 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                Appellee's brief filed by Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated. Paper copies due on 11/07/2014 Electronically Transmitted. [35] [6617410] [13-3365] (GW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702409805 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                  Submitted appellee brief by John Michael Tecson for Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated. [34] [6617369] [13-3365] (Tecson, J.)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702406672 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None ?
                                    Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's reply brief [31] Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/25/2014 for Appellant 350 Green, LLC. CMD [33] [6616170] [13-3365] (JO)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702341453 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None ?
                                      Motion filed by Appellant 350 Green, LLC to extend time to file the response [32] [6616087] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702341434 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None ?
                                        Motion filed by Appellant 350 Green, LLC to extend time to file the response [31] [6616079] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702329869 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None ?
                                          AMENDED Notice of Circuit Rule 33 settlement conference issued. The conference will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, November 19, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [30] [6611689] [13-3365] (DAM)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702328034 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                            Notice of Circuit Rule 33 settlement conference issued. The conference will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, October 14, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [29] [6610974] [13-3365] (DAM)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702322668 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                              Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [27] Appellee's brief due on or before 10/30/2014 for JNS Power and Control System Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/13/2014 for Appellant 350 Green, LLC. CMD [28] [6608838] [13-3365] (ER)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702322477 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                Motion filed by Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated to extend time to file appellee brief. [27] [6608766] [13-3365] (Tecson, J.)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702314542 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                  Disclosure Statement sfiled by Attorneys J. Michael Tecson and Limo T. Cherian for Appellee JNS Power and Control System Incorporated. [26] [6605868] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [26] [6605868] [13-3365]--[Edited 09/16/2014 by AM to add attorney Tecson and terminate attorney Cherf] (Cherf, Kelly)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702313708 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                    Appellant's brief filed by Appellant 350 Green, LLC. Paper copies due on 09/22/2014 Electronically Transmitted. [25] [6605581] [13-3365] (AB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702313402 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                      Submitted appellant brief by Michael Ira Bernstein for Appellant 350 Green, LLC. [24] [6605482] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702298696 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                        Order: The court, on its own initiative, DIRECTS the clerk to correct the caption in this case to indicate JNS Power & Control Systems, Inc. as plaintiff, and 350 Green, LLC as defendant. DW [23] [6600084] [13-3365] (AD)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702289552 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                            Filed electronic transcript of proceedings held on 7/19/13 and 10/18/13. [21] [6542026] THIS TRANSCRIPT IS FOR INTERNAL COURT USE ONLY. Remote electronic access to the transcript is ONLY available through the District Court's PACER system. [13-3365] (SK)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702135031 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                              Motion filed by Appellees JNS Holding Corporation and JNS Power and Control to Supplement the Record on Appeal. [20] [6538847] [13-3365] (Cherf, Kelly)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702124175 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                Filed Reply by Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated Attorney Michael Bernstein to Appellee's Response to Jurisdictional memorandum filed 11/19/2013. [19][6534781] [13-3365]--[Edited 12/02/2013 by CD - Correct version of doc. #18 in Native PDF format.] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702124092 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Filed Reply by Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated Attorney Michael Bernstein to Appellee's Response to Appellants' Jurisdictional Memorandum filed on November 19, 2013. [18][6534744] [13-3365]--[Edited 12/02/2013 by CD - This is a Scanned PDF; a Native PDF must be submitted.] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702120113 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                    ORDER re: APPELLEES' RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS' JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM" filed on November 19, 2013.
                                                                    The appellants shall file, on or before December 2, 2013, a reply to "APPELLEES' RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS' JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM". [17] DW [6533249] [13-3365] (FP)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702117745 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Docketing statement filed by Appellees JNS Holding Corporation and JNS Power and Control. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [16] [6532313] [13-3365] (Cherf, Kelly)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702117654 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Filed Response by Appellees JNS Holding Corporation and JNS Power and Control to Appellants' Jurisdictional Memorandum. [15][6532280] [13-3365] (Cherf, Kelly)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702115994 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 3 vol. of pleadings. [14] [6531611] [13-3365] (RT)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702113392 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kelly McCloskey Cherf for Appellees JNS Holding Corporation and JNS Power and Control. [13] [6530669] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [13-3365] (Cherf, Kelly)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702112938 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                              ORDER: Filed clerk's notice to Appellees JNS Holding Corporation and JNS Power and Control to file a response to APPELLANTS' AMENDED DOCKETING STATEMENT, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of November 5, 2013. Response due for Appellees JNS Holding Corporation and JNS Power and Control by 11/20/2013. DW [12] [6530502] [13-3365] (AD)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702112393 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Amended Docketing statement filed by Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [6530304] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702111801 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702111187 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. [9] [6529853] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702111159 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. [8] [6529839] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702110897 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. [7] [6529715] [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702110865 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Steven L. Baron for Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. [6] [6529700] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [6] [6529700] [13-3365]--[Edited 11/08/2013 by AM to add attorney Baron] (Baron, Steven)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702110862 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael I. Bernstein for Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. [5] [6529698] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [13-3365] (Bernstein, Michael)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702108607 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              ORDER: In the present case, plaintiffs rely on diversity of citizenship for federal jurisdiction. However, appellants' Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify the principal place of business of Car Charging Group, Inc. Appellants also fail to quantify the amount in controversy. Appellants must provide this information. More importantly, it does not appear that the parties are diverse. According to appellants' Docketing Statement, plaintiff 350 Holdings, LLC has a member (Car Charging, Inc.) that is a citizen of Delaware, and defendant JNS Holding Corporation is also a citizen of Delaware. Accordingly, appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. Appellants' statement must also address the appearant non-existence of diversity jurisdiction. The statement is due on 11/12/2013. (See order for further details) DW [4] [4] [6528798] [13-3365] (CMD)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702107848 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Docketing statement filed by Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [6528511] [13-3365] (DS)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702102634 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  ORDER: Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6526565] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated by 11/08/2013 [2] [6526565] [13-3365] (ER)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702100805 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 11/07/2013. Docketing Statement due for Appellants 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated by 10/30/2013. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/03/2013 for 350 Green, LLC, 350 Holdings, LLC and Car Charging Group, Incorporated. Record on Appeal from Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division due by 11/14/2013. [1] [6525887] [13-3365] (AD)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?