Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ripple Labs, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-10832-AT-SN
District Judge Analisa Torres, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 3, 2021 at 3:12 PM EST (4.5 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Best +1 212 336 0042 bestr@sec.gov
Space Benjamin J. Hanauer +1 312 353 8642 +1 312 353 7398 hanauerb@sec.gov
Space Robert MacDonald Moye +1 312 353 1051 +1 312 353 7398 moyeR@sec.gov
Space Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart +1 212 336 0153 +1 212 336 7477 stewartla@sec.gov
Space MARK R. SYLVESTER +1 215 597 3100 sylvesterm@sec.gov
Space Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro +1 212 336 9145 tenreiroj@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Bradley Garlinghouse, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucas Dehaan Hakkenberg +1 212 225 2326 lhakkenberg@cgsh.com
Space Alexander Javad Janghorbani +1 212 225 2000 ajanghorbani@cgsh.com
Space Samuel Loewenson Levander +1 212 225 2000 slevander@cgsh.com
Space Matthew Solomon +1 202 974 1680 msolomon@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nowell D. Bamberger +1 202 974 1752 +1 202 974 1999 nbamberger@cgsh.com
No Logo Christian A. Larsen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Linsenmayer +1 628 432 5117 rlinsenmayer@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristina Anne Bunting +1 212 373 3503 +1 212 492 0503 kbunting@paulweiss.com
Space Meredith Richardson Dearborn +1 202 223 7300 +1 202 223 7420 mdearborn@paulweiss.com
Space Martin Flumenbaum +1 212 373 3191 +1 212 492 0191 mflumenbaum@paulweiss.com
Space Michael E. Gertzman +1 212 373 3281 +1 212 373 2274 mgertzman@paulweiss.com
Space Justin David Ward +1 212 373 3654 +1 212 492 0654 jward@paulweiss.com
Ripple Labs Inc. Ripple Labs Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Ceresney +1 212 909 6000 aceresney@debevoise.com
Space Joy Guo +1 212 909 6000 jguo@debevoise.com
Space Lisa R. Zornberg +1 212 909 6000 lzornberg@debevoise.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Sean Ford +1 212 909 6161 csford@debevoise.com
Space Mary Jo White +1 212 909 6260 +1 212 909 6836 mjwhite@debevoise.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-326-7967

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eliana M. Pfeffer +1 202 326 7981 epfeffer@kellogghansen.com
Space Lillian Virginia Smith +1 804 815 3221 +1 202 326 7999 lsmith@kellogghansen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reid Mason Figel +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 rfigel@kellogghansen.com
Space Andrew Edward Goldsmith +1 202 326 7945 +1 202 326 7999 agoldsmith@kellogghansen.com
Space Michael K. Kellogg +1 202 326 7902 +1 202 326 7999 mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
Space Bradley E Oppenheimer +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 boppenheimer@kellogghansen.com
Space Gregory G. Rapawy +1 202 326 7967 +1 202 326 7999 grapawy@kellogghansen.com
Space Collin Randall White +1 202 326 7925 cwhite@kellogghansen.com
No Logo Investor A, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eva C Carman +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 eva.carman@ropesgray.com
No Logo James LaMonte, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by The Deaton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Deaton +1 401 351 6400 +1 401 351 3601 jdeaton@deatonlawfirm.com
No Logo Jordan Deaton, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Deaton +1 401 351 6400 +1 401 351 3601 jdeaton@deatonlawfirm.com
No Logo Kristiana Warner, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by The Deaton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Deaton +1 401 351 6400 +1 401 351 3601 jdeaton@deatonlawfirm.com
No Logo Mitchell McKenna, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by The Deaton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Deaton +1 401 351 6400 +1 401 351 3601 jdeaton@deatonlawfirm.com
No Logo Mya LaMonte, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by The Deaton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Deaton +1 401 351 6400 +1 401 351 3601 jdeaton@deatonlawfirm.com
No Logo Tyler LaMonte, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by The Deaton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Deaton +1 401 351 6400 +1 401 351 3601 jdeaton@deatonlawfirm.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 12/22/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CASREF,ECF
  Entries (378) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 12/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/22/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 10/22/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 10/22/2021, Entered: None Seal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 10/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: None File Amicus Brief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/18/2021, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/15/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/15/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/13/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/13/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/13/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/13/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/8/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/8/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/8/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/8/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 10/4/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/25/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 266 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 265 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 262 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 260 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 259 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 258 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 255 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 250 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 249 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 243 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 241 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 217 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert Moye dated June 2, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Moye, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated June 2, 2021 re: [197] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Re Omnibus Discovery Matters addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro dated May 25, 2021. . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A).(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 237 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated June 2, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 236 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 214 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [213] MOTION for Discovery / Motion to Obtain International Discovery. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Bitfinex Proposed Letter, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Bitforex Proposed Letter, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Bithumb Proposed Letter, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Bitlish Proposed Letter, # (6) Exhibit 6 - BitMart Proposed Letter, # (7) Exhibit 7 - AscendEX Proposed Letter, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Bitrue Proposed Letter, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Bitstamp Proposed Letter, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Coinbene Proposed Letter, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Coinone Proposed Letter, # (12) Exhibit 12 - HitBTC Proposed Letter, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Huobi Proposed Letter, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Korbit Proposed Letter, # (15) Exhibit 15 - OKEx Proposed Letter, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Upbit Proposed Letter, # (17) Exhibit 17 - ZB Proposed Letter).(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 235 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 213 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery / Motion to Obtain International Discovery. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 234 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 212 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice [176] Letter Motion to Seal. Ripple's motion is denied without prejudice. The parties are directed to meet and confer to further limit the sealing request and file a joint letter proposing reasonable redactions no later than June 7, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 211 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [191] Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Given the parties' representations in their letters at ECF Nos. 199 and 207, the SEC's motion is denied as moot. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 210 Filed: 5/30/2021, Entered: 5/30/2021 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION & ORDER re: [165] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 7, 2021, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, [166] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 7, 2021, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The SEC's motion is DENIED. If, at some later date, Ripple raises its good faith beliefs or relies upon its privileged communications in support of its fair notice defense, the Plaintiff may renew its application to the Court. Respectfully, the Clerk of Court is directed to deny the motions at ECF Nos. 165 and 166. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/30/2021) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/21/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 230 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated May 28, 2021 re: [191] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated May 18, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [53].(Sylvester, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 206 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated May 28, 2021 re: [176] LETTER MOTION to Seal re: [166] SEC's LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 14, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 205 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [128] MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 - Cornerstone Research Report).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 204 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [200] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Ripple is granted until June 2, 2021, to respond to the SEC's omnibus discovery letter motion. The parties are strongly urged to continue to meet and confer on these issues in an effort to resolve them without judicial intervention. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 203 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [201] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dugan William Edward Bliss terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 224 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related Document Number: [201]..(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 223 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 201 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021, Terminated: 5/27/2021 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Dugan Bliss to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021, Terminated: 5/27/2021 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 26, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Ceresney dated May 25, 2021 re: [191] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated May 18, 2021. (Protective Order docketed at ECF 53). Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [191].(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Re Omnibus Discovery Matters addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro dated May 25, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit E, # (5) Exhibit F, # (6) Exhibit G, # (7) Exhibit H, # (8) Exhibit I, # (9) Exhibit J, # (10) Exhibit K, # (11) Exhibit L, # (12) Exhibit M, # (13) Exhibit N, # (14) Exhibit O, # (15) Exhibit Q)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [54].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 197 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Re Omnibus Discovery Matters addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro dated May 25, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 5/21/2021. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 5/21/2021. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro dated May 19, 2021 re: [166] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 7, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [53].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 195 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 19, 2021 re: [165] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 7, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 194 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [121] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 16, 2021, filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse. The Defendants' motion is DENIED. The SEC is ordered to produce all documents obtained in response to the Requests. In addition, to improve transparency in the process, the SEC is ordered to produce copies of all previously served Requests within 14 days and produce any subsequent Requests within 14 days of their service. To the extent the SEC believes it has a proper claim of privilege, it must simultaneously produce a privilege log. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to deny the motion at ECF No. 121. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/19/2021) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 193 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [192] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ripple shall file its opposition no later than May 25, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021, Terminated: 5/19/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [191] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated May 18, 2021. addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated May 19, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021, Terminated: 6/2/2021 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated May 18, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit H)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [53].(Sylvester, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Opposition re: [122] MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 189 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [122] MOTION to Intervene . Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 188 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re: [122] MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 187 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of John E. Deaton in Support re: [122] MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E).(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re: [65] MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 185 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/30/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint., [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [104].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 182 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint., [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jorge G. Tenreiro in Opposition re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint., [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jorge G. Tenreiro in Opposition re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint., [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Jorge G. Tenreiro in Opposition re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint., [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit E, # (4) Exhibit F, # (5) Exhibit G)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [104].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 14, 2021 re: [104] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 12, 2021., [170] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 13, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B to Waxman Decl. [D.E. 130], # (2) Exhibit C to Waxman Decl. [D.E. 130])Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [104].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 14, 2021 re: [170] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 13, 2021., [104] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 12, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021, Terminated: 6/2/2021 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION to Seal re: [166] SEC's LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 14, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER with respect to [170] Motion to Seal. The Court has reviewed the parties' letters dated April 22 and May 13, 2021. ECF Nos. 133, 170. Accordingly, concurrently with its reply to the motion to strike, the SEC may file a combined letter motion (1) opposing Ripple Labs' motion to seal Exhibits B and C of the Waxman Declaration, to the extent arguments not articulated in its opposition to Defendant Larsen's motion, ECF No. 104, apply, and (2) moving to seal the non-public SEC correspondence contained in Ripple Labs' opposition to the motion to strike, to the extent it wishes after meeting and confening with Ripple Labs. By June 10, 2021, Ripple Labs may respond to the SEC's motion to seal, if it so wishes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/14/2021) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 174 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 14, 2021 re: opposition to [165] SEC's LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Raymond Sylvester on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/10/2021 (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [128] MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [170].(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 171 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [128] MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1).(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 13, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: A telephonic conference is scheduled for May 21, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the SEC's pending motion to compel at ECF No. 165. Credentialed members of the press should contact the SDNY media office in advance of the conference to obtain access. Members of the public may listen to the proceedings at the following numbers: USA: (844) 291- 4185 International: (409) 207-6997 Access Code: 4934010 # Unauthorized recording and rebroadcasting of the conference (e.g., YouTube, Twitch, audio- only streams, etc.) is strictly prohibited. Any unauthorized recordings will be investigated, and anyone found to engage in such behaviors may be subject to criminal sanctions. So Ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/11/2021) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [167] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall respond to the SEC's motion no later than Friday, May 14, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021, Terminated: 5/10/2021 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 10, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021, Terminated: 5/30/2021 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 7, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit E, # (5) Exhibit F, # (6) Exhibit G, # (7) Exhibit H, # (8) Exhibit I, # (9) Exhibit J, # (10) Exhibit K, # (11) Exhibit L, # (12) Exhibit M)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [164].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021, Terminated: 5/30/2021 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 7, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 7, 2021 re: Documents Filed Under Seal. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part [126] Letter Motion for Discovery. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court makes the following clarifications: (1)The SEC must produce communications with third-parties, including external agencies and market participants, subject to a privilege assertion. (2)The SEC need not produce informal intra-agency communications, such as emails, and such communications need not be searched or logged. (3)Intra-agency memoranda or formal position papers discussing Bitcoin, Ethereum, and XRP must be searched for and produced subject to a privilege assertion. Examples of such documents include Division reports, final reports of internal working groups, or formal position papers submitted to the Commissioners. Although such documents may ultimately be privileged, information that would be provided on a privilege log, such as dates and participants, may itself be relevant and is discoverable. (4)Any documents withheld on the basis of privilege must be identified on a privilege log. (5)The Court directs the parties to continue to meet-and-confer on the remaining issues presented in their letters. Respectfully, the Clerk of Court is directed to GRANT in PART the motion at ECF No. 126. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/6/2021) (ras) Modified on 5/6/2021 (ras).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 162 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [157] Letter filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse. ENDORSEMENT: Respectfully, the Clerk of Court is directed to delete the exhibits at ECF Nos. 141-1 and 141-2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2021) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [159] Motion for Benjamin J. Hanauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [158] Motion for Robert MacDonald Moye to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Benjamin J. Hanauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Benjamin Hanauer, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [159] MOTION for Benjamin J. Hanauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [158] MOTION for Robert MacDonald Moye to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Robert MacDonald Moye to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Declaration of Robert Moye, # (2) Exhibit B, Certificate of Admission, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order).(Moye, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 157 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum dated May 4, 2021 re: withdrawal of exhibits. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [148] Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court has reviewed the parties' letters dated April 30 and May 3 and 4, 2021. ECF Nos. 148, 150, 155. Accordingly, the Securities and Exchange Commission's (the "SEC") motion is GRANTED. The SEC shall be permitted to respond to the individual defendants' motions to dismiss in a single opposition brief, not to exceed 60 pages. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 148. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/4/2021) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 155 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated May 4, 2021 re: [148] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Combine Opposition to Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 30, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Opposition re: [122] MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 153 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [122] MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 152 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: [122] MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 151 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re: [126] LETTER MOTION for Discovery Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated April 21, 2021. Correction. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 150 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum & Matthew C. Solomon dated May 3, 2021 re: [148] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Combine Opposition to Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 30, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 149 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated May 3, 2021 re: [126] LETTER MOTION for Discovery Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated April 21, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/4/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Combine Opposition to Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 147 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Due to an inadvertent typo in an earlier Order, the public Access Code for today's conference was incorrect. The April 30, 2021, 10:00 a.m. EDT (-4:00 GMT) conference dial in information is as follows: USA: (844) 291-4185 International: (409) 207-6997 Access Code: 7106935. As a reminder, unauthorized recording or rebroadcasting is strictly prohibited (including YouTube streams, Twitch streams, audio stream, etc.). Any identified violations will be investigated, and anyone found to have engaged in these behaviors may be subject to criminal sanctions. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/30/2021) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  discovery hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Discovery Hearing held on 4/30/2021. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 146 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 29, 2021 re: [121] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 16, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES***SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 29, 2021 re: Letter from the SEC. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - SEC Letter)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [143].(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 144 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 29, 2021 re: Letter from the SEC. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal).(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 143 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 29, 2021 re: Document filed under seal. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 142 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated April 28, 2021 re: [126] LETTER MOTION for Discovery Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated April 21, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B).(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 28, 2021 re: [121] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 16, 2021. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. ***Deleted document numbers 141-1 and 141-2 from the case record pursuant to [162] Memo Endorsement. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Produced Document, # (2) Exhibit B - Produced Document)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [139].(Flumenbaum, Martin) Modified on 5/5/2021 (ras). Modified on 5/5/2021 (ras).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 140 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 28, 2021 re: [121] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 16, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, # (2) Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal).(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 139 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 28, 2021 re: Certain Exhibits Filed under Seal. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 138 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated April 28, 2021 re: [126] LETTER MOTION for Discovery Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated April 21, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B).(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 23, 2021 re: [121] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 16, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit G, # (2) Exhibit H)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [135].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 136 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 23, 2021 re: [121] LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 16, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 23, 2021 re: Certain Exhibits Filed Under Seal in Connection with SEC's Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [127] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their responses to the SEC's letter motion no later than April 28, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 133 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 22, 2021 re: Sealed Documents in SEC's Motion to Strike. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 132 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [128] MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [128] MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [117].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Daphna A. Waxman in Support re: [128] MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit C)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [117].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Daphna A. Waxman in Support re: [128] MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 128 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Document No. [51] Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 5/13/2021.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 127 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021, Terminated: 4/23/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated April 21, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 126 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021, Terminated: 5/6/2021 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Discovery Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated April 21, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - The Court's April 6, 2021 Order, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Proposed Discovery Order, # (3) Exhibit 3 - April 8, 2021 Letter, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Defs. Br. in Opp. in Tetragon Fin. Grp. Ltd. v. Ripple Labs, Inc., 2021-0007-MTZ, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Ripple subpoena to One River Asset Mgmt.).(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021 Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [121] Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. A telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for April 30, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. EDT (GMT -04:00). The Court will communicate with the parties regarding the conference line. Members of the public who wish to listen to the conference may do so by dialing: USA: (844) 291-4185; or International: (409) 207-6997, and entering Access Code 7106935, followed by the pound (#) key. This public line will accommodate 4,000 callers. The public is reminded that both recording and rebroadcasting (e.g., Youtube streams, Twitch streams, audio-only streaming, etc.) is strictly prohibited, and anyone found making unauthorized recordings or rebroadcasts will be investigated and may be subject to criminal sanctions. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah) Modified on 4/30/2021 (ras).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of John E. Deaton in Support re: [122] MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Answer to Complaint, # (2) Exhibit Gensler at Peterson Link, # (3) Exhibit Hinman, Howey Meets Gary, # (4) Exhibit GianCarlo Crypto and Securities Law, # (5) Exhibit Jay Clayton Letter March 2019, # (6) Exhibit Bailard's Code of Ethics Excerpt, # (7) Exhibit Grundfest Letter Discussion, # (8) Exhibit Hester Peirce Interview Link, # (9) Exhibit Email Correspondence Demonstrating "use cases" by XRP Holders, # (10) Exhibit Twitter Correspondence Demonstrating "use cases" by XRP Holders, # (11) Exhibit Cryptwerk Directory, # (12) Exhibit Nexo Instant Credit Line, # (13) Exhibit XRP Ecosystem companies and applications, # (14) Exhibit XRP Ledger intro to XRP, # (15) Exhibit Spend the Bits features, # (16) Exhibit Major Reasons Why XRP is Better Than Bitcoin, # (17) Exhibit XRP is the Fastest Way to Send Bitcoin, # (18) Exhibit XRP Use Cases, # (19) Exhibit Brainard Speech May 2018, # (20) Exhibit Bitcoin as Store Value, # (21) Exhibit Deaton FXStreet).(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 123 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [122] MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 122 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 121 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021, Terminated: 4/20/2021 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum, Andrew J. Ceresney, Michael K. Kellogg and Matthew C. Solomon dated April 16, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 3/22/21 Letter, # (2) Exhibit B - Email correspondence between SEC and Defendants, # (3) Exhibit C - SEC v. Badian decision, # (4) Exhibit D - SEC 9/4/19 letter).(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [118] Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Defendants may file one combined letter motion, not to exceed seven pages. The SEC may respond by letter not to exceed seven pages within five business days of Defendants' filing. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 119 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/15/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 15, 2021 re: motion for leave [D.E 118]. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/15/2021, Terminated: 4/16/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 15, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 117 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/15/2021 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [115] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [115] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [104] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 12, 2021. addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenre. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/15/2021) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/15/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Linsenmayer on behalf of Christian A. Larsen..(Linsenmayer, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021, Terminated: 4/15/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [104] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 12, 2021. addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 14, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 114 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Matthew C. Solomon in Support re: [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Digital Ventures Interview, # (2) Exhibit B - FinCEN's Fact Sheet on MSB Registration, # (3) Exhibit C - DOJ Settlement, # (4) Exhibit D - FinCEN Settlement, # (5) Exhibit E - DOJ's Crytocurrency Enforcement Framework, # (6) Exhibit F - 12 CFR Part 1005, # (7) Exhibit G - CB Insights Interview, # (8) Exhibit H - Article - Ripple to Place 55 Billion XRP in Escrow, # (9) Exhibit I - Article - ICO=IPO, # (10) Exhibit J - Hinman Speech).(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/6/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly) Modified on 4/29/2021 (ras).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 111 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 110 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 109 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Martin Flumenbaum in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Produced Document, # (2) Exhibit B-Produced Document, # (3) Exhibit C-DOJ Settlement Papers, # (4) Exhibit D-FinCEN Settlement Papers).(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Martin Flumenbaum in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Produced Document, # (2) Exhibit B-Produced Document)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [104].(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 107 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. [REDACTED]. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [104].(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum dated April 12, 2021. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 103 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION & ORDER: Accordingly, the Court finds that the SEC's requests for the Individual Defendants' personal financial records, apart from those records of XRP transactions that are already promised, are not relevant or proportional to the needs of the case. Accordingly, the Individual Defendants' motion is GRANTED. The SEC shall withdraw its Requests for Production seeking the Individual Defendants' personal financial records and withdraw its third-party subpoenas seeking the same. If, as discovery progresses, the SEC uncovers evidence that the Individual Defendants have not been forthcoming with records of their XRP transactions, it may provide such evidence to the Court and renew its application. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/9/2021) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [67] Letter Motion to Compel. For the reasons stated on the record during the April 6, 2021 discovery conference, the Defendants' motion is granted in part and denied in part. The Court's ruling on the motion to seal stands. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 101 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE: The telephonic discovery conference in this matter that is scheduled for today is not scheduled to take place until 2:00 p.m. EST. The Court is aware that many members of the public have been calling into the Court's telephone conference line many hours in advance of the conference. There are other court proceedings currently taking place prior to the conference in this matter, so for any member of the public that wishes to listen in to the conference in this matter, please do not call in until 2:00 p.m. EST. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/6/2021) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 4/6/2021. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES***Exhibit List / Exhibit 3 - Under Seal Version. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4 - Under Seal Version)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [98].(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 98 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Seal / Update on Letter Motion to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew Ceresney dated April 2, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Public Version, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Public Version).(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES***Exhibit List Exhibit A to Motion to Compel (D.E. 72-1). Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Motion to Quash (D.E. 78-1))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [83].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 96 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated April 2, 2021 re: [83] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew Ceresney dated March 25, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 95 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/19/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Franko, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [83] Letter Motion to Seal. The Defendants' motion to seal is GRANTED solely on an interim basis. Furthermore, the parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss whether the Defendants' motion to seal can be narrowed and shall file a letter with the Court regarding any further narrowing no later than April 2, 2021. To the extent that the parties cannot agree, any remaining sealing issues will be addressed along with the decision on the merits of the motions. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [82] Letter Motion to Seal. For the reasons stated in the SEC's March 30, 2021 letter, Investor A's motion to seal is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 30, 2021 re: [82] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Eva Ciko Carman dated March 25, 2021., [83] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew Ceresney dated March 25, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [83].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 30, 2021 re: [82] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Eva Ciko Carman dated March 25, 2021., [83] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew Ceresney dated March 25, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' and proposed intervenors' letters dated March 19 and 26, 2021, ECF Nos. 75, 85-86. Accordingly, The proposed intervenors' request for leave to file a motion to intervene is GRANTED; By April 19, 2021, the proposed investors shall file their motion to intervene; By May 3, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition papers, and Defendants shall file their response papers, if any; By May 17, 2021, the proposed intervenors shall file their reply to Plaintiff's opposition papers and Defendants' response papers, if any, and Plaintiff shall file a reply to Defendants' response papers, if any. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 4/19/2021., Responses due by 5/3/2021, Replies due by 5/17/2021.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/29/2021) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/19/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Franko, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 86 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 26, 2021 re: Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 85 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 26, 2021 re: Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***SELECTED PARTIES***Exhibit List // Exhibit A, 72-1. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, 72-2, # (2) Exhibit A, 78-1, # (3) Exhibit B, 78-2)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [83].(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021, Terminated: 3/31/2021 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew Ceresney dated March 25, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 82 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021, Terminated: 3/31/2021 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Eva Ciko Carman dated March 25, 2021. Document filed by Investor A..(Carman, Eva)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 81 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 24, 2021 re: [67] LETTER MOTION to Compel Securities and Exchange Commission to Produce addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 15, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 80 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: A telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for Tuesday, April 6, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., to discuss the Defendants' joint motion to compel. See ECF No. 67. Members of the public interested in listening to the conference should dial (877) 402-9757 and enter Access Code 7938632, followed by the pound (#) key. A dial-in number will be circulated to the parties before the conference. Separately, several unauthorized recordings were made of the previous discovery conference. The parties and the public are reminded that, pursuant to S.D.N.Y. Local Civil Rule 1.8(b), "no one other than Court officials engaged in the conduct of Court business shall... make an audio or video recording of any proceeding or any communication with the Court, an employee of the Court or any person acting at the direction of the Court, including a mediator." (Discovery Hearing set for 4/6/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/24/2021) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated March 22, 2021 re: [67] LETTER MOTION to Compel Securities and Exchange Commission to Produce addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 15, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, # (2) Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, # (3) Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, # (4) Exhibit D - Feb. 19, 2020 Transcript, # (5) Exhibit E - Mitchell Declaration).(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dugan Bliss dated March 22, 2021 re: [67] LETTER MOTION to Compel Securities and Exchange Commission to Produce addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 15, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, # (2) Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, # (3) Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [77].(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 77 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 22, 2021 re: Sealed Documents. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [74] Motion for John E. Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [74] MOTION for John E. Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated March 19, 2021 re: Intention to file Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021, Terminated: 3/22/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for John E. Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Exhibit A: Affidavit of John E. Deaton, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B: CT Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C: Iowa Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D: RI Certificate of Good Standing, # (5) Exhibit Ex. E: MA Certificate of Good Standing, # (6) Exhibit Ex. F USD Certificate of Good Standing, # (7) Text of Proposed Order).(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  discovery hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Discovery Hearing held on 3/19/2021. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: [70] Letter filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. Accordingly, 1. Defendants Garlinghouse's and Larsen's requests for leave to file a motion to dismiss is GRANTED; 2. By April 12, 2021, Defendants Garlinghouse and Larsen shall file their motions to dismiss; 3. By May 14, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition papers; and 4. By June 4, 2021, Defendants Garlinghouse and Larsen shall file their replies, if any. Separately, 5. Plaintiff's request for leave to file a motion to strike is GRANTED; 6. By April 22, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its motion to strike; 7. By May 13, 2021, Defendant Ripple Labs shall file its opposition; and 8. By May 27, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 4/22/2021., Responses due by 4/14/2021, Replies due by 6/4/2021.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/18/2021) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: 3/17/2021 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 17, 2021 re: [59] LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC's Requests for Production and Third-Party Subpoenas addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon & Martin Flumenbaum dated March 11, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: 3/16/2021 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [69] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [67] LETTER MOTION to Compel Securities and Exchange Commission to Produce. GRANTED. The S.E.C. shall file its reply to the Defendants' combined motion to quash no later than March 22, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: 3/16/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated March 16, 2021 re: Response to SEC Letter re Motion to Strike [dkt. no. 54]. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021, Terminated: 3/16/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [67] LETTER MOTION to Compel Securities and Exchange Commission to Produce addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 15, 2021. addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 15, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion [65] Motion to Intervene. DENIED without prejudice to renewal in a motion that complies with Rule III(A) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/15/2021) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021, Terminated: 4/8/2021 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION to Compel Securities and Exchange Commission to Produce addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 15, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I).(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [64] MOTION for John E. Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24247842. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CONNECTICUT, SUPREME COURT OF IOWA, SUPREME COURT OF RHODE ISLAND, SUPREME COURT OF MASSACHUSETTS, AND SUPREME COURT OF RHODE ISLAND;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 3/14/2021, Entered: 3/14/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated March 14, 2021 re: Explanation of Recent Motions. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 3/14/2021, Entered: 3/14/2021, Terminated: 3/15/2021 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene).(Deaton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 3/14/2021, Entered: 3/14/2021, Terminated: 3/15/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John E. Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24247842. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of John E. Deaton in support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Pro Hac Vice Order).(Deaton, John) Modified on 3/15/2021 (vba).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 12, 2021 re: Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [61] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Defendants may file a combined letter motion of 10 pages or fewer. The Plaintiff will be accorded an equal page limit to respond. In addition, the parties are notified that Joy Guo, counsel for Defendants, was one of my law clerks during the September 2016-September 2017 term, more than three years ago. The Court does not believe this relationship creates a conflict but will entertain any application to have this case reassigned. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021, Terminated: 3/12/2021 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Combined Letter Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joy Guo dated March 12, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Guo, Joy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [59] Letter Motion for Conference re: [59] LETTER MOTION for Conference. A telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for March 19, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. at which to discuss the Defendants' motion to quash. At that time the parties should dial into the Court's dedicated teleconferencing line at (877) 402-9757 and enter Access Code 7938632, followed by the pound (#) key. The Plaintiff may file a reply to the Defendants' motion no later than March 18, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 3/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021, Terminated: 3/12/2021 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC's Requests for Production and Third-Party Subpoenas addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon & Martin Flumenbaum dated March 11, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J).(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [57] Motion for Nowell D. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021, Terminated: 3/11/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Nowell D. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24236296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, Maryland, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing, DC, # (4) Proposed Order).(Bamberger, Nowell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [57] MOTION for Nowell D. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24236296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: 3/10/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated 03/10/2021 re: Defendant Larsen's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: 3/10/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated 03/10/2021 re: Defendant Garlinghouse's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 9, 2021 re: Anticipated Motion to Strike. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/9/2021) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [46] Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: 3/3/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum dated March 3, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: 3/3/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew C. Solomon dated March 3, 2021 re: anticipated motion to dismiss. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/22/2021) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2021. (if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [4] Complaint against Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related document: [4] Complaint..(Best, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: 2/15/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Parties dated 2/15/21 re: Proposed Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: 2/15/2021 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [4] Complaint. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [40] Motion for Meredith R. Dearborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021, Terminated: 1/21/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Meredith R. Dearborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23532786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Meredith R. Dearborn, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order).(Dearborn, Meredith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [40] MOTION for Meredith R. Dearborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23532786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [25] Motion for Matthew C. Solomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [24] Motion for Bradley E Oppenheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [23] Motion for Collin R White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [22] Motion for Eliana Margo Pfeffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [21] Motion for Gregory G Rapawy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [20] Motion for Lillian V. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [18] Motion for Michael K. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin David Ward on behalf of Christian A. Larsen..(Ward, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristina Anne Bunting on behalf of Christian A. Larsen..(Bunting, Kristina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael E. Gertzman on behalf of Christian A. Larsen..(Gertzman, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Flumenbaum on behalf of Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Loewenson Levander on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse..(Levander, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Dehaan Hakkenberg on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse..(Hakkenberg, Lucas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Javad Janghorbani on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse..(Janghorbani, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Matthew C. Solomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23450851. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) NY Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) DC Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order).(Solomon, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Bradley E Oppenheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23446785. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Bradley E Oppenheimer Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Bradley E Oppenheimer DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit Bradley E Oppenheimer MD Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Exhibit Bradley E Oppenheimer MA Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (5) Text of Proposed Order Bradley E Oppenheimer Proposed PHV Order).(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Collin R White to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23446169. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Collin R White Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Collin R White DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit Collin R White NY Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Collin R White Proposed PHV Order).(White, Collin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Eliana Margo Pfeffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23445880. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Eliana Margo Pfeffer Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Eliana Margo Pfeffer NY Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Eliana Margo Pfeffer Proposed PHV Order).(Pfeffer, Eliana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Gregory G Rapawy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-23445611. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gregory G Rapawy Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Gregory G Rapawy DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit Gregory G Rapawy MA Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Gregory G Rapawy Proposed PHV Order).(Rapawy, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Lillian V. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23445197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Lillian Smith Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Lillian Smith DC Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit Lillian Smith NY Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Lillian Smith Proposed Order).(Smith, Lillian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Christian A. Larsen waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Michael K. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23444062. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit MKK Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit MKK Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order MKK PHV Proposed Order).(Kellogg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joy Guo on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Guo, Joy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Sean Ford on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Ford, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Ceresney on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa R. Zornberg on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Jo White on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(White, Mary Jo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reid Mason Figel on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Figel, Reid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bradley Garlinghouse waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [25] MOTION for Matthew C. Solomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23450851. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [24] MOTION for Bradley E Oppenheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23446785. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [20] MOTION for Lillian V. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23445197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [22] MOTION for Eliana Margo Pfeffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23445880. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [21] MOTION for Gregory G Rapawy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-23445611. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [23] MOTION for Collin R White to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23446169. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [18] MOTION for Michael K. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23444062. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ripple Labs Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: 12/29/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/29/2020) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: 12/29/2020 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 10:00 a.m. on February 22, 2021, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Initial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/29/2020) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: 12/29/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dugan William Edward Bliss on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Bliss, Dugan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard R. Best. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Christian A. Larsen. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Best, Richard) Modified on 12/23/2020 (pc). Modified on 12/29/2020 (pc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Best, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Christian A. Larsen. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Best, Richard) Modified on 12/29/2020 (pc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 806 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?