District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Florida Middle District Court Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit United States Supreme Court

Securities & Exchange Commissi v. Sky Way Global LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 11-12510

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2020 at 11:17 PM ST (3.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth R. Kramer, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barton Stuart Sacher +1 305 371 8797 +3742 374 374 2605 bsacher@sacherzelman.com
Space Joseph Alan Sacher +1 954 998 1441
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "U.s. Securities And Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amie Berlin +1 305 416 6292
Space James Michael Carlson +1 305 416 6292
Space David Darren Lisitza +1 202 551 5015
Space Drew Douglas Panahi +1 305 416 6292
Nature of Suit 1850 - Securities Commodities Exchange
Case Type U.S. Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=8:09-cv-00455-SDM-TBM
Lower Court Case https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=8:09-cv-00455-SDM-TBM
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106478270 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None ?
ORDER: Appellee's "Motion for Rule 38 Damages (Or, Alternatively, Pursuant to Rule 39-2 and/or the Inherent Powers of this Court), Based Upon Appellant's Frivolous Appeal" is DENIED. [6474037-2]; [6474037-3] JLE, EEC and FMH
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106423285 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None ?
    Reply to response filed by Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106416498 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None ?
      RESPONSE to Motion for sanctions filed by Appellee Kenneth R. Kramer in 11-12510 , Motion for attorney's fees filed by Appellee Kenneth R. Kramer in 11-12510 filed by Attorney David Lisitza for Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106416461 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None ?
        MOTION to impose sanctions for damages and costs pursuant to Rule 38, for attorney's fees filed by Appellee Kenneth R. Kramer. Motion is Opposed [6474037-1]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106370260 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None ?
          ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. JLE, EEC and FMH
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106314558 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None ?
            USDC order: Order as to Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission was filed on 09/09/2011. Docket Entry 255.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106305757 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None ?
              "Verified Response" to SEC's Motion for Miscellaneous Relief..." construed as Supplemental Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Attorney Barton S. Sacher for Appellee Kenneth R. Kramer.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106299183 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None ?
                USDC order: as to Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission was filed on 08/24/2011. Docket Entry 253.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None ?
                  Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission. Service date: 08/19/2011 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Sacher, Sacher.
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None ?
                    Appellant's brief filed by Securities & Exchange Commission. Service date: 08/19/2011 [11-12510] Attorney for Appellee: Sacher - US mail; Attorney for Appellee: Sacher - US mail.
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106297034 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None ?
                      Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Attorney Amie Berlin for Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission.
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106297019 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None ?
                        Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Attorney Barton S. Sacher for Appellee Kenneth R. Kramer.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 01106296799 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None ?
                          E-Brief Tendered: Appellant brief for Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission.
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106284125 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None ?
                            JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Securities & Exchange Commission.
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106280434 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None ?
                              Certificate of Readiness filed as to Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission.
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106280091 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None ?
                                Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission. The appellant brief and record excerpts are due on or before 08/22/2011.
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106275864 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None ?
                                  Notification by Court Reporter Bill Jones that 1/18-27/11 trial transcripts were filed in District Court. Transcript Order: Dt.all Trans. Filed: 07/11/2011.
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106277612 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None ?
                                    APPEARANCE of Counsel filed by Joseph Alan Sacher for Kenneth R. Kramer.
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106277608 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None ?
                                      APPEARANCE of Counsel filed by Barton S. Sacher for Kenneth R. Kramer.
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106262302 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None ?
                                        Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Bill Jones as to Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 06/15/2011.
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106253431 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None ?
                                          TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM filed. Court Reporter: Bill Jones, as to Securities & Exchange Commission, Trial 01/18/2011 - 01/27/2011.
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106253421 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None ?
                                            Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Lisitza for Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission.
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106253405 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None ?
                                              Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission.
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106253399 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None ?
                                                APPEARANCE of Counsel filed by David Lisitza for Securities & Exchange Commission.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106245571 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None ?
                                                  CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Securities & Exchange Commission on 06/06/2011. Fee Status: Fee Not Required.
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?