LUBINSKY v. TESLA ENERGY OPERATIONS, INC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:21-cv-00053-DMR
Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 23, 2021 at 3:10 PM EDT (2.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DAVID LUBINSKY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Wiener and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Francis Brennan +1 818 249 5291 +1 818 249 4329 rbrennan@brennanlaw.com
v.
Equifax Information Services LLC Equifax Information Services LLC, Defendant
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
Office Oakland
Filed 1/5/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Contra Costa
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADRMOP
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Terminate Civil Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Compel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: 1/6/2021 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: 1/6/2021 Summons issued
                                                    Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, TESLA ENERGY OPERATIONS, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/6/2021 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                      Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Proposed Summons
                                                        Proposed Summons. (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Proposed Summons
                                                          Proposed Summons. (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                            Civil Cover Sheet by DAVID LUBINSKY . (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15401301.). Filed by DAVID LUBINSKY. (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?