In re: Lusio Filiba, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 20-7009

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2021 at 12:11 AM ST (3.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey W. Washington +1 410 986 0850 gwashington@adelberg.com
No Logo Bear Mountain, Llc, In re - Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew S. Levetown +1 703 618 2264 asl@iveylevetown.com
No Logo In Re: Lusio Filiba, In re - Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew S. Levetown +1 703 618 2264 asl@iveylevetown.com
Nature of Suit
Case Type Orig. Proceeding Private
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:18-cv-00341-EGS-RMM
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:18-cv-00341-EGS-RMM
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208247125 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None ?
CLERK'S ORDER [1853024] filed granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [1851062-2], No mandate shall issue. [20-7009]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208245115 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None ?
    NOTICE [1851987] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court of filing by petitioners in district court a notice of withdrawal of petition for writ of mandamus [20-7009]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208243305 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None ?
      UNOPPOSED MOTION [1851062] to dismiss case as moot filed by Bear Mountain, LLC and Lusio Filiba [Service Date: 07/10/2020 ] Length Certification: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE This brief complies with the type-volume limit of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 21(d)(1) because it contains 411 words. This brief also complies with the typeface and type-style requirements of Fed. R. of Appellate Proc.. [20-7009] (Levetown, Andrew)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208242163 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None ?
        CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1850454] received from unreadable [signed for on 06/17/2020] for order [1846809-2] sent to Respondent Cochrane USA, Inc. [20-7009]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None ?
          1ST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1846809] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70173044000112612359] of order [1846754-3]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/13/2020 from Geoffrey W. Washington. [20-7009]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208235079 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None ?
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208221359 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None ?
              MOTION [1839461] to remove case from abeyance filed by Bear Mountain, LLC and Lusio Filiba (Service Date: 04/23/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 201 words. [20-7009] (Levetown, Andrew)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208205690 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                PER CURIAM ORDER [1830533] filed granting motion to hold case in abeyance [1828766-3]. Petitioners are directed to file a motion to govern further proceedings by April 23, 2020. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Pillard. [20-7009]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208202663 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                  MOTION [1828766] to hold case in abeyance filed by Bear Mountain, LLC (Service Date: 02/17/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 307 words. [20-7009]--[RELIEF REPLACED--Edited 02/18/2020 by LMC] (Levetown, Andrew)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208201059 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                    LETTER [1827909] sent regarding attorney membership to Geoffrey W. Washington for Cochrane USA, Inc.. Application for Admission due 03/11/2020. [20-7009]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208201028 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                      PETITION [1827879] for writ of mandamus filed by Petitioners Bear Mountain, LLC and Lusio Filiba [Service Date: 02/10/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 6326 words. [20-7009]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                        PRIVATE CIVIL ORIGINAL PROCEEDING CASE docketed. [20-7009]
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 24 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?