US DOMINION, INC. et al v. POWELL et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-00040

Tags
Last Updated April 2, 2021 at 2:35 PM DT (1.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dominion Voting Systems Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Megan A. Meier (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Clare +1 202 628 7401 tom@clarelocke.com
No Logo Dominion Voting Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Megan A. Meier (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Clare +1 202 628 7401 tom@clarelocke.com
No Logo US DOMINION, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Clare +1 202 628 7401 tom@clarelocke.com
v.
No Logo DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., Defendant
No Logo SIDNEY POWELL, Defendant
No Logo Sidney Powell, PC, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/8/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1303470000
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8052122) filed by US DOMINION, INC., DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66, # (67) Exhibit 67, # (68) Exhibit 68, # (69) Exhibit 69, # (70) Exhibit 70, # (71) Exhibit 71, # (72) Exhibit 72, # (73) Exhibit 73, # (74) Exhibit 74, # (75) Exhibit 75, # (76) Exhibit 76, # (77) Exhibit 77, # (78) Exhibit 78, # (79) Exhibit 80, # (80) Exhibit 81, # (81) Exhibit 82, # (82) Exhibit 83, # (83) Exhibit 84, # (84) Exhibit 85, # (85) Exhibit 86, # (86) Exhibit 87, # (87) Exhibit 88, # (88) Exhibit 89, # (89) Exhibit 90, # (90) Exhibit 91, # (91) Exhibit 92, # (92) Exhibit 93, # (93) Exhibit 94, # (94) Exhibit 95, # (95) Exhibit 96, # (96) Exhibit 97, # (97) Exhibit 98, # (98) Exhibit 99, # (99) Exhibit 100, # (100) Exhibit 101, # (101) Exhibit 102, # (102) Exhibit 103, # (103) Exhibit 104, # (104) Exhibit 105, # (105) Exhibit 106, # (106) Exhibit 107, # (107) Notice to Counsel/Party of Filing Audio/Video Exhibits, # (108) Certificate of Corporate Disclosure, # (109) Civil Cover Sheet, # (110) Summons to Sidney Powell, # (111) Summons to Sidney Powell, P.C., # (112) Summons Defending the Republic, Inc., # (113) Exhibit 79, pt.1, # (114) Exhibit 79 pt.2)(Clare, Thomas)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 351 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?