Estavillo v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:21-cv-00277-VKD
District Judge Virginia K. Demarchi, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 22, 2021 at 10:40 PM ST (8.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Erik Estavillo, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez, Defendant
No Logo Ilhan Omar, Defendant
Twitter, Inc. Twitter, Inc., Defendant
Office San Jose
Filed 1/12/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ProSe
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Received Document
          (Proposed) Order Granting Motion for Permission for Electronic Case filing re [3] by Erik Estavillo. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Request
            REQUEST for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. by Erik Estavillo. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAlexandria Ocasio-Cortez. (In-forma Pauperis Application Pending) Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment to Complaint (Part 1 of 2), # (2) Attachnmen to Complaint Part 2 of 2)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 94 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?