Fish v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:21-cv-00060-JLS-JDE
District Judge Josephine L. Staton, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2021 at 9:08 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Fish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN D. VAN LOBEN SELS +1 650 517 9800 +1 650 517 9898 jvanlobensels@fishiplaw.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Motion for leaveCourt Filing
    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to File First Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Robert Fish. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order) (Van Loben Sels, John)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven M. Sepassi has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)Court Filing
        ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 16, 2023. (rrp)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form onlyCourt Filing
          CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (rrp)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has received and reviewed the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Doc. [25].) The Scheduling Conference set for hearing 5/14/2021, is VACATED, and the following scheduleis set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 8/16/2021. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 6/18/2022. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 11/28/2022. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 11/28/2022. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 12/26/2022. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 1/16/2023. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 11/23/2023. Last Day to File Daubert Motions: 1/30/2023. Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): 2/20/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2023 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
              JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 16 days, filed by Plaintiff Robert Fish.. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER DENIED RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON RULE 12(c) MOTION AND TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES [22] by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (lom)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 motion for judgment on the pleadingsCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum Memorandum In Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, # (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Tesla Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Nassihi, Amir)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Stipulation for Order
                    STIPULATION for Order To Set Briefing Schedule on Rule 12(c) Motion and to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Dates filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer J Shih counsel for Plaintiff Robert Fish. Jennifer Shih is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Fish. (Shih, Jennifer)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 Notice of change of address
                        NOTICE of Change of address by Amir M Nassihi attorney for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 555 Mission Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Nassihi, Amir)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Joan R Camagong counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Changing Address to 555 Mission Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Camagong, Joan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Camagong, Joan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachel Aleeza Straus counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Adding Rachel A. Straus as counsel of record for Tesla, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Straus, Rachel)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joan R Camagong on behalf of Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Attorney Joan R Camagong added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Camagong, Joan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael L Mallow counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Adding Michael L. Mallow as counsel of record for Tesla, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Mallow, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Notice of appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amir M. Nassihi on behalf of Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Nassihi, Amir)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc [11]. The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. (3) The event to be use is: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties - under Category - "NOTICES". In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form onlyCourt Filing
                                        ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                          ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc..(Nassihi, Amir)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                            STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tesla, Inc. answer now due 3/5/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc..(Attorney Amir M. Nassihi added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nassihi, Amir)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Fish, upon Defendant Tesla, Inc. served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren of Corporation Trust Company, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to Defendant Tesla, Inc. (lh)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                        Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert Fish, identifying none. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Summons Request
                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)[2] filed by plaintiff Robert Fish. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Fish. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                              COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29996436 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Robert Fish. (Attorney John D Van Loben Sels added to party Robert Fish(pty:pla))(Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 996 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?