Alliance for Open Society International, Inc. et al v. United States Agency for International Development et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-08209-VM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Klein Abel +1 212 988 6737 +1 212 995 4550 laura.abel@nyu.edu
Space Rebekah Ruth Diller +1 212 992 8635 +1 212 995 4550 rebekah.diller@nyu.edu
Space Aziz Huq +1 212 992 8632 +1 212 995 4550 aziz.huq@nyu.edu
Space Burt Neuborne +1 212 998 6172 +1 212 995 4341 burt.neuborne@nyu.edu
Space David Stuart Udell +1 212 998 6720 +1 212 995 4550 david.udell@nyu.edu

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

No Logo Global Health Council, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cardozo School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebekah Ruth Diller +1 212 992 8635 +1 212 995 4550 rebekah.diller@nyu.edu
No Logo Open Society Institute, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Klein Abel +1 212 988 6737 +1 212 995 4550 laura.abel@nyu.edu
Space Aziz Huq +1 212 992 8632 +1 212 995 4550 aziz.huq@nyu.edu
Space Burt Neuborne +1 212 998 6172 +1 212 995 4341 burt.neuborne@nyu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Cardozo School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebekah Ruth Diller +1 212 992 8635 +1 212 995 4550 rebekah.diller@nyu.edu
Space David Stuart Udell +1 212 998 6720 +1 212 995 4550 david.udell@nyu.edu

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

No Logo Pathfinder International, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cardozo School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebekah Ruth Diller +1 212 992 8635 +1 212 995 4550 rebekah.diller@nyu.edu

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

v.
No Logo Henrietta Fore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo Julie Louise Gerberding, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael O. Leavitt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Agency For International Development, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Edward Rosberger +21253 050 00x5729 +1 212 822 5729 rrosberger@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Edward Rosberger +21253 050 00x5729 +1 212 822 5729 rrosberger@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Edward Rosberger +21253 050 00x5729 +1 212 822 5729 rrosberger@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo AIDS Action et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CLAUDIA FLORES +1 212 519 7816 +1 212 549 2580 cflores@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine Ingrid Magdo +1 212 841 1252 +1 646 441 9252 cmagdo@cov.com
No Logo Apne Aap et.al [Amicus], Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Equality Now

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Neuwirth +1 212 586 0906 +1 212 586 1611 jneuwirth@equalitynow.org
No Logo Interaction, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Cardozo School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebekah Ruth Diller +1 212 992 8635 +1 212 995 4550 rebekah.diller@nyu.edu

Represented by Gibbons PC

Office Foley Square - Suspense
Filed 9/23/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SUSPENSE
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 86 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Related document: [84] Amended Complaint,, filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute, InterAction, Global Health Council, Pathfinder International.(Torrance, Benjamin)
    LREF
    Legal Document 85 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 8/25/2008 re: Counsel writes in response to the Court's request that the parties agree on a schedule for further proceedings in this case. The parties have agreed that any further proceedings in this case should await the issuance of a final regulation by HHS. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Further proceedings in this matter are stayed pending the rule making purpose by defendant's Department of Health and Human Services. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain this action on the Court's suspense docket. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/25/2008) (jfe)
      LREF
      Legal Document 84 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Amended Complaint
      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [20] Amended Complaint,, against Henrietta Fore, Global Health Council, United States Agency for International Development, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services.Document filed by Global Health Council, InterAction, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. Related document: [20] Amended Complaint,, filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute, Pathfinder International.(dle) (dle).
        LREF
        Legal Document 83 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
        DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, it is hereby ordered that the motion (docket no. 66) of plaintiffs Alliance for Open Society International (AOSI) and Pathfinder International (Pathfinder) for leave to file a second amended complaint to add Global Health Council (GHC) and InterAction as plaintiffs to this action is GRANTED. The motion of GHC and InterAction for a preliminary injunction, is GRANTED, as set forth herein. DKT, as member of GHC, shall be barred form benefiting from the preliminary injunction. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/7/2008) (jpo)
          LREF
          Legal Document 82 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
          REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Nils Daulaire in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
            LREF
            Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
              LREF
              Legal Document 80 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Laura K. Abel dated 4/4/08 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs request permission to submit an overlength reply regarding Plaintiffs' motions to amend the complaint and to extend the preliminary injunction to cover Global Health Council and InterAction. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The page limitations provision of the Court's Individual Practices is modified to authorize plaintiff's to file a brief not to exceed 26 pages in connection with the motion to amend the complaint herein. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/4/08) (tro)
                LREF
                Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin H. Torrance on behalf of United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Torrance, Benjamin)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                  DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance in Opposition re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit HHS Guidance, # (2) Exhibit USAID AAPD, # (3) Exhibit GHC Member List, # (4) Exhibit DKT Complaint)(Torrance, Benjamin)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 3/13/08 re: Counsel for defendant requests an enlargement of the Government's brief due on March 17, in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint and extend the preliminary injunction, from 25 to 40 pages. Plaintiffs previously obtained an equivalent enlargement of their opening brief, and have consented to this request. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The page limitations provision of the Court's Individual Practices is modified to authorize The Government to file a brief not to exceed 41 pages in connection with the motion to amend the complaint herein and extend the preliminary injunction. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/14/08) (js)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 3/5/2008 re: This Office represents the defendants in the above-named case. I am writing to request an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint and extend the preliminary injunction to additional parties, as follows: Government's response (now due March 7): March 17; Plaintiffs' reply (now due March 28) April 7. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The briefing schedule with regard to the motion to amend the complaint herein is extended as set forth herein: motion papers submitted by response 3-17-08; reply 4-7-08. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 3/17/2008, Replies due by 4/7/2008.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/5/2008) (jmi)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                          DECLARATION of Mark Sidel in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit B1, # (4) Exhibit B2, # (5) Exhibit B3, # (6) Exhibit B4, # (7) Exhibit B5, # (8) Exhibit C, # (9) Exhibit D, # (10) Exhibit E, # (11) Exhibit F)(Diller, Rebekah)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                            DECLARATION of Pape Gaye in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                              DECLARATION of Helene Gayle in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                DECLARATION of Sam Worthington in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                  DECLARATION of Daniel E. Pellegrom in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                    DECLARATION of Nils Daulaire in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                      DECLARATION of Rebekah Diller in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [66] MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008, Terminated: 8/8/2008 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute.(Diller, Rebekah)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura K. Abel dated 2/1/08 re: Counsel for plaintiffs request permission to submit an overlength brief regarding Plaintiffs' motions to amend the complaint and to extend the preliminary injunction to cover Global Health Council of Inter Action. Plaintiffs request leave to file a 40-page brief.. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The page limitations provision of the Court's Individual Practices is modified to authorize plaintiffs to file a brief not to exceed 40 pages in connection with the motion to amend the complaint and add a party herein. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/4/08) (js)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 USCA Mandate
                                              MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to [57] Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services USCA Case Number 06-4035-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the case is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings consistent with this order. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 12/21/2007. (nd)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Jud
                                                Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: [64] USCA Mandate,. (nd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 11/30/2007. Judge's Decision: Parties to submit letter in 10 days informing the court of their discussions and the contemplated schedule. (djc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Order Placing Case on SuspenseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER PLACING CASE ON SUSPENSE: This action be placed on the Court's Suspense Docket pending a ruling by the Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit on dft's appeal of this Court's Order dated 6/30/2006. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/2007) (jar)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Edward Rosberger on behalf of United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Rosberger, Richard)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Status Conference
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero : Status Conference held on 12/4/2006. Parties are to submit an appropriate briefing schedule or alternative plan for determining which plaintiffs can bring forth claims with timing of pending appeal as a factor. (jar, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Laura Abel dated 11/13/06 re plntf request for a status conference: a status conf is set for 12/4/06 at 3:00 pm to address the matter described above by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/15/06) (cd, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                            Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Status Conference set for 12/4/2006 03:00 PM before Judge Victor Marrero. (cd, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 12/27/2007 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA - Index
                                                              First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Supplemental Index to the record on Appeal for [57] Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, USCA Case Number 06-4035, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Supplemental Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2006 (tp, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura Abel dated 10/13/06 re: counsel for plaintiffs request to provide the court with a further update on the progress and/or results of these surveys on or before 11/13/06. Request granted. The time for plaintiffs to update the court on the survey described above is extended to 11/13/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/13/06) (dle, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/13/2006. (dle, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE of Notice of Appearance and Request for Electronic Notification. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.. (Rosberger, Richard)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero : Pretrial Conference held on 9/6/2006. (cd, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 12/27/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                        Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [23] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Pathfinder International,, [34] Endorsed Letter,, [12] Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by AIDS Action et al.,, [35] Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Andrew Natsios,, Michael O. Leavitt,, Julie Louise Gerberding,, [5] Summons Returned Executed, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [18] Endorsed Letter,, [17] Notice of Appearance filed by AIDS Action et al.,, [19] Endorsed Letter,, [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. filed by Pathfinder International,, [14] Certificate of Service Other, filed by AIDS Action et al.,, [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [37] Endorsed Letter,, [26] Endorsed Letter,, [43] Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, Pathfinder International,, [38] Notice of Appearance filed by Open Society Institute,, Pathfinder International,, [47] Stipulation and Order,,, [25] Summons Returned Executed as to USA,, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, Pathfinder International,, [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [9] Stipulation and Order,, [46] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [44] Endorsed Letter,, [33] Stipulation and Order,, [29] Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services,, Andrew Natsios,, Michael O. Leavitt,, United States Agency for International Development,, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention,, Julie Louise Gerberding,, [13] Response in Support of Motion, filed by AIDS Action et al.,, [41] Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, Pathfinder International,, [27] Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services,, Andrew Natsios,, Michael O. Leavitt,, United States Agency for International Development,, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention,, Julie Louise Gerberding,, [28] Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services,, Andrew Natsios,, Michael O. Leavitt,, United States Agency for International Development,, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention,, Julie Louise Gerberding,, [31] Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services,, Andrew Natsios,, Michael O. Leavitt,, United States Agency for International Development,, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention,, Julie Louise Gerberding,, [2] Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [42] Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, Pathfinder International,, [1] Complaint, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [57] Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services,, United States Agency for International Development,, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention,, [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [32] Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services,, Andrew Natsios,, Michael O. Leavitt,, United States Agency for International Development,, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention,, Julie Louise Gerberding,, [55] Endorsed Letter,, [50] Endorsed Letter,, [53] Preliminary Injunction,, [51] Endorsed Letter,, [40] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, Pathfinder International,, [15] Notice of Appearance filed by AIDS Action et al.,, [11] Endorsed Letter,, [7] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [56] Endorsed Letter,, [45] MOTION for Richard A. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, Pathfinder International,, [16] Notice of Appearance filed by AIDS Action et al.,, [20] Amended Complaint,, filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, Pathfinder International,, [49] Order,, [24] Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by Apne Aap et.al [Amicus],, [54] Endorsed Letter,,, [4] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Open Society Institute,, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.,, [36] Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by InterAction,, [39] Notice of Appearance filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 12/27/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                                          Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [57] Notice of Appeal,. (nd, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 12/27/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to District Judg
                                                                            Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: [57] Notice of Appeal,. (nd, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Notice of Appeal
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL from [53] Preliminary Injunction,. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (A.U.S.A.) (nd, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura K. Abel dated 8/16/2006 re: respectfully requesting a postponement of the status conference for 8/25/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The next status conference herein is rescheduled to 9/6/2006 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/21/2006) (lb, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 8/9/06 re: Government defendants respond to Plaintiffs' letter, dated August 6, 2006, requesting a pre-motion conference; Request Granted. A status conference herein is scheduled for 8/25/06 at 2:00 p.m. to address the matter described above by defendants.. plaintiffs' prior correspondence in this regard.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/10/06) (djc, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 8/4/06 re: counsel for plaintiffs request permission to file a motion seeking leave to file a second amended complaint and permission to move for a preliminary injunction. Request granted. A status conference herein is scheduled for 8/11/06 at 1:30 p.m. to address the matter described above by plaintiffs, unless prior thereto the parties stipulate to the amendment of the complaint proposed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/4/06) (dle, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/11/2006 01:30 PM before Judge Victor Marrero. (dle, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                        PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Pending entry of a final judgment on the merits of the parties' dispute in this action or until any reconsideration or modification of the order is authorized by the court; dfts are enjoined as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/06) (dle, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/2/06 before Judge Victor Marrero. (tro, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 6/9/06. ENDORSEMENT: request GRANTED. The time for the parties to submit a proposed preliminary injunction herein is extended to 6/12/06. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/9/06) (js, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/2/2006. Counsel for all parties present. Parties to negotioate to try to agree to injunction by 6/9/2006. Plaintiffs to notify Court of status of negotiations. Court to determine injunction if no agreement by 6/9/2006. (jar, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Richard Rosberger dated 5/23/06: the time for the parties to submit the proposed preliminary injunction hearing is extended to 6/24/06. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/23/06) (cd, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2006 (cd, ).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER that the parties to submit to the Court, with fourteen days of the date of this Order, a proposed preliminary injunction conforming with the determinations in this Decision. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/9/2006) (jmi, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/13/2006 @ 9:05 a.m. before Judge Victor Marrero. (lb, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that during the pendency of Pathfinder International's motion for a preliminary injunction, Pathfinder International will in good faith not take any action that it thinks violates the US Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaris Act of 2003, 22 USC 7631(f) CDC Funding Opportunity numbers 04263, 04208, and 04256 and Pathfinder International's related representations... (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/12/2006) (lb, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Oral Argument
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero : Oral Argument held on 4/13/2006 re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. filed by Pathfinder International. (pl, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                          CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [46] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 3/6/2006, Receipt Number 571893. (jd, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER; granting [45] Motion for Richard A. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/2/06) (pl, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
                                                                                                              Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: [46] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (pl, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006, Terminated: 3/3/2006 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                MOTION for an order, admitting Richard A. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (sac, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Megan Lewis dated 1/30/06 re: Application GRANTED. The [36] Motion of InterAction, to participate in this action as amicus curiae is GRANTED. InterAction is authorized to file a memorandum of law. If the Government elects to respond seperately, it shall propose a briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/30/06) (db, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Daniel E. Pellegrom in Support re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (4) # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Robert Kushen in Support re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Rebekah Diller in Support re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David William Bowker on behalf of Alliance for Open Society International, Inc. (Bowker, David)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David William Bowker on behalf of Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute (Bowker, David)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 1/24/06 re: a request to file a reply brief not exceeding 43 pages in length. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Plaintiff's reply brief herein may exceed to Court's page limititation up to a total of 43 pages as set forth above (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/24/06) (kco, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Lawrence S. Lustberg on behalf of InterAction. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law of Proposed Amicus Curiae Interaction in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Lustberg, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt.(Rosberger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER during the pendency of plaintiff Pathfinder's motion for a preliminary injunction, Pathfinder will in good faith not take any action that it thinks violates the United States Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria Act of 2003,22 U.S.C. 7631(f)(the "Act"),etc. as further set forth in this Order. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/12/06) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                        Set Answer Due Date purs. to [34] Endorsed Letter, as to United States Agency for International Development answer due on 1/13/2006; Andrew Natsios answer due on 1/13/2006; Julie Louise Gerberding answer due on 1/13/2006; Michael O. Leavitt answer due on 1/13/2006; United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention answer due on 1/13/2006; United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due on 1/13/2006. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Michael J. Garcia dated 1/10/06 re: Counsel writes to request that the date for defendants to answer the amended complaint be extended to 1/13/06. Request Granted. The time for defendant(s) to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint in this action is extended to 1/13/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/12/06) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Rosberger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Richard E. Rosberger in Opposition re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) # (5) Exhibit E)(Rosberger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 1/3/2006 re: to Defendants request permission to file an opposition brief with a page length of up to 55 pages, as so that it may properly respond to all of the Plaintiff motions and to the amici briefs. Further, Defendants respectfully request that the date for Defendants submit their answer to the Amended Complaint be extended from January 3,2006 to January 10,2006. Plaintiffs have consented to the foregoing requests, and that their reply brief upon their motions be extended from January 24,2006 to January 25,2006.., United States Agency for International Development answer due 1/10/2006; Andrew Natsios answer due 1/10/2006; Julie Louise Gerberding answer due 1/10/2006; Michael O. Leavitt answer due 1/10/2006; United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention answer due 1/10/2006; United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due 1/10/2006. Replies due by 1/25/2006. Responses due by 1/4/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The briefing schedule with regard to the motion for preliminary injunction herein is extended as set forth herein motion papers submitted by response 1/4/2006; reply 1/25/2006. Defendants' brief may contain up to 55 pages. Defendants' time ro answer the amended complaint is extended to 1/10/2006. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/3/2006) (jmi, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Richard E. Rosberger in Opposition re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit C)(Rosberger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Richard E. Rosberger in Opposition re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Rosberger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Rosberger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 1/3/06 re: request granted; the briefing schedule with regard to the motion for preliminary injunction herein is extended as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/3/06) (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. United States Agency for International Development served on 12/5/2005, answer due 2/3/2006; Andrew Natsios served on 12/5/2005, answer due 2/3/2006; Julie Louise Gerberding served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006; Michael O. Leavitt served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006; United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.; Pathfinder International; Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 1/10/2006 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero : Telephone Conference held on 12/13/2005. Counsel for plaintiff and goverment dft's in light of addition of new discuss possible adjustment to filing deadline (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                            Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jessica Neuwirth on behalf of Apne Aap et.al [Amicus].(Neuwirth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Pathfinder International. (Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Pathfinder International. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Pellegrom)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jane Manning dated 12/5/05 re: counsel requests to file their motion on 12/12/05 and a conference with the court if the court prefers counsel to follow a different procedure. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/6/05) (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/12/2005. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute.(sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, against Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios.Document filed by Pathfinder International, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by Open Society Institute, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc..(sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                        Set Answer Due Date purs. to [20] Amended Complaint,, as to United States Agency for International Development answer due on 12/19/2005; Andrew Natsios answer due on 12/19/2005; Julie Louise Gerberding answer due on 1/3/2006; Michael O. Leavitt answer due on 1/3/2006; United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention answer due on 1/3/2006; United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due on 1/3/2006. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Christine I. Magdo dated 11/9/05 re: Request granted. Amici Curiae herein are granted leave to file Memorandum of Law in support of plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/10/05) (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Flores on behalf of AIDS Action et al. (Flores, Claudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Flores on behalf of AIDS Action et al. (Flores, Claudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Flores on behalf of AIDS Action et al. (Flores, Claudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance, Memorandum of Law served on Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute, United States Agency for International Development, Andrew S. Natsios on November 9, 2005. Service was made by Mail (Federal Express). Document filed by AIDS Action et al.. (Magdo, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re: [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Memorandum of Law of AIDS Action and 21 Other Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by AIDS Action et al.. (Magdo, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                        Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Christine Ingrid Magdo on behalf of AIDS Action et al..(Magdo, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 10/19/05 re: The briefing schedule set forth in said letter with respect to plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order is approved. Defendants response served by 11/21/05, reply served by 12/9/05. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/19/05) (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/7/2005 before Judge Victor Marrero. (jar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER that during the pendency of plntfs' motions for perliminary injunction and a TRO, AOSI will in good faith not take any action that they think violates the US Leadership against HIV et al. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/13/05) (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Rebekah Diller# (2) Exhibit Exhibit A to Diller Declaration# (3) Exhibit Exhibit B to Diller Declaration# (4) Exhibit Exhibit C to Diller Declaration# (5) Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DOCUMENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Rebekah Diller to RE-FILE Document [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction.. Use the document type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the document list Responses and Replies. (kg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005, Terminated: 10/3/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction). Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) Modified on 10/6/2005 (kg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Agency for International Development served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005; Andrew Natsios served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005. Service was accepted by Daniel Green. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.; Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney David Stuart Udell for noncompliance with Section (3) of the S.D.N.Y. 3rd Amended Instructions For Filing An Electronic Case or Appeal and Section 1(d) of the S.D.N.Y. Procedures For Electronic Case Filing. E-MAIL the PDF for Document [1] Complaint, [2] Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (lb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Burt Neuborne# (2) Declaration of Rossana Barbero# (3) Declaration of Chris Beyrer (Part 1 of 3)# (4) Declaration of Chris Beyrer (Part 2 of 3)# (5) Declaration of Chris Beyrer (Part 3 of 3)# (6) Delaration of Pedro Chequer# (7) Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 1 of 4)# (8) Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 2 of 4)# (9) Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 3 of 4)# (10) Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 4 of 4)# (11) Declaration of Robert Kushen# (12) Declaration of Ruth W. Messinger# (13) Declaration of Maurice I. Middleberg# (14) Declaration of Aryeh Neier# (15) Certificate of Service)(Diller, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero : Telephone Conference held on 9/27/2005. Court held telephone conf. to address whether this case should be consoldiated with similar case pending in District of Columbia. Plaintiff's request for extension of page limitation for brief in supprot of preliminary injunction motion granted. Gov't to inform Court of anticipated response within one week of receipt of preliminary injunction motion. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc..(lb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (kco, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 556437)Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute.(lb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (kco, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Designated ECF. (lb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (lb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (lb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 215 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?