Garcia v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:21-cv-00070-SCD
District Judge Stephen C Dries, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 1, 2021 at 3:30 PM DT (2.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krohn and Moss, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Howard Moss +1 312 578 9428 gmoss@consumerlawcenter.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olga Tymouch +1 773 351 5553 olga.tymouch@bowmanandbrooke.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roshan Nicholas Rajkumar +1 612 339 8682 +1 612 672 3200 roshan.rajkumar@bowmanandbrooke.com
Office Milwaukee
Filed 1/14/2021
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Milwaukee
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 2020-cv-007066[Milwaukee County Circuit Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ATTYOPEN
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Remand to State Court
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Tesla Inc. (kah)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Disclosure Statement
                            DISCLOSURE Statement by Tesla, Inc.. (Rajkumar, Roshan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Attachments
                              ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet by Tesla, Inc. re [1] Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Rajkumar, Roshan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 notice of removal
                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tesla, Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020-cv-007066 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3699851) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Rajkumar, Roshan)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Notice of Judge Assignment
                                NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available here. (jcl)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?