Sasso v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:21-cv-00024-D
District Judge James C. Dever, III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 6, 2021 at 11:37 PM DT (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chad Sasso, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ROSE WALDORF PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK W. SKANES +1 518 869 9200 mskanes@rosewaldorf.com
Office Western Division
Filed 1/15/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County WAKE
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Special Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Special Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Notice - other
                                              Notice filed by Tesla, Inc. regarding [1] Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Skanes, Mark)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                Financial Disclosure Statement by Tesla, Inc. (Skanes, Mark)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 notice of removal
                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tesla, Inc. from Superior Court, Wake County, case number 20CV13943. ( Filing fee $ 402), filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A_Notice of Removal) (Skanes, Mark)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?