USA v. Elve
Criminal Case Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-20045-RNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2021 at 12:04 PM DT (1.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manolo Reboso +1 305 961 9091 Manolo.Reboso@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole Grosnoff +1 205 244 2001 +1 205 244 2184 nicole.s.grosnoff@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Billy Elve, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by gmvlawgroup.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Sean McGill +1 954 530 6206 +1 954 530 6183 kmcgill@gmvlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hglawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carson L. Hancock +1 954 281 2231 +1 754 312 7228 chancock@hglawyers.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Billy Elve (1)
Office Miami
Filed 1/21/2021
County Miami-Dade (Office - Miami)
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
120-mj-04087-EGT
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1029A.F
Offense Level 4
Use of Unauthorized Devices
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
Aggravated Identity Theft
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags BNDDUTY,JG
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: None Disclosure of Presentence Investigation/Plea and Sentencing Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Disclosure of Presentence Investigation/Plea and Sentencing Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
          PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE granting [24] Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Billy Elve (1). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (jh)
            LREF
            Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021, Terminated: 5/24/2021 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
            MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Preliminary Order of Forfeiture by USA as to Billy Elve. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Grosnoff, Nicole)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice of Probation Officer Assignment
            Notice of Presentence Investigation Assignment of Billy Elve to US Probation Officer Michael Soto in the Miami Wilkie D. Ferguson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse and he can be contacted at (305)523-5316 or Michael_Soto@flsp.uscourts.gov. (lrn)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or SentencingCourt Filing
              PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SENTENCING HEARING as to Billy Elve. Sentencing set for 7/9/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/28/2021. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the sentencing hearing will proceed by way of video-teleconference. Counselors and U.S. Probation will receive a follow-up email with a Zoom meeting ID number and password prior to the scheduled date. If you have any questions, please contact Judge's chambers at 305-523-5145. (jh)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Change of Plea Hearing as to Billy Elve held via Zoom meeting on 4/28/2021. Billy Elve (1) Guilty Counts 1 and 2 of the information. Sentencing hearing set for 7/9/2021 at 9:00 AM. Defendant is allowed to remain on present bond. Total time in court: 22 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): AUSA Manolo Reboso, Carson L. Hancock, and Kevin Sean McGill. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Plea Agreement/Factual Proffer Statement
                  FACTUAL PROFFER STATEMENT as to Billy Elve (jh)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Plea Agreement/Factual Proffer Statement
                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Billy Elve (jh)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Clerk's Notice (Other)
                      CLERK'S PAPERLESS NOTICE as to Billy Elve re [17] Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing for 4/28/2021 09:30 AM. Change of plea will proceed by video teleconference. Join ZoomGov Meeting:https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603219744?pwd=OUNJUTRSVGk0NjFzMzlZWm5ZbGpLZz09Meeting ID: 160 321 9744 and Passcode: 547806 (jh)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or SentencingCourt Filing
                        PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Billy Elve. Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/28/2021 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/19/2021. The Government shall e-mail the Court with any plea agreement/proffer no later than one day prior to the change of plea hearing at scola@flsd.uscourts.gov and shall advise the Court if there is no plea agreement. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the change of plea hearing will proceed by way of video-teleconference. Counselors will receive a follow-up email with a Zoom meeting ID number and passcode prior to the scheduled date. If you have any questions, please contact Judge's chambers at 305-523-5145. (jh)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                          PAPERLESS ORDER canceling calendar call set for 4/20/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. and jury trial set for 4/26/2021 09:00 AM as to Billy Elve. Parties informed the Court Defendant will be pleading guilty and requested a change of plea date. Change of plea hearing will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/16/2021. (jh)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Nicole Grosnoff appearing for USA. for the purpose of addressing asset forfeiture matters in this case. Attorney Nicole Grosnoff added to party USA(pty:pla). (Grosnoff, Nicole)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER as to Billy Elve. Calendar Call set for 4/20/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (jh) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: ARRAIGNMENT as to Billy Elve (1) Count 1,2 held on 1/22/2021. Parties advise Information was filed. Defendant waives Indictment on the record. (Digital EGT-01-:1-22-2021-ZOOM-10:33 a.m.) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the obligation of the United States to produce all exculpatory and impeachment evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by the Court. PAPERLESS STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER: The defendant(s) having been arraigned this date in open Court, it is Ordered that within 14 days of the date of this order that all parties to this action shall review and comply with Southern District of Florida Local Rules 88.10 (Criminal Discovery), and 88.9(c) (Motions in Criminal Cases). Upon a sufficient showing, the Court may at any time, upon a properly filed motion, order that the discovery or inspection provided for by this Standing Order be denied, restricted or deferred, or make such other order as is appropriate. It is expected by the Court, however, that counsel for both sides shall make a good faith effort to comply with the letter and spirit of this Standing Order. It shall be the continuing duty of counsel for both sides to immediately reveal to opposing counsel all newly discovered information or other material within the scope of Local Rule 88.10. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/22/2021). (at)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 information - felony
                                  INFORMATION as to Billy Elve (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jao)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carson L. Hancock appearing for Billy Elve (Hancock, Carson)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Waiver of Indictment
                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Billy Elve (McGill, Kevin)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Notice of hearing
                                        NOTICE OF HEARING **TIME CHANGE ONLY** as to Billy Elve Preliminary Examination / Arraignment RESET for 1/22/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (mdc)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin Sean McGill appearing for Billy Elve (McGill, Kevin)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Attorney Appointment/Report Re: Counsel HearingCourt Filing
                                            Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Report Re Counsel Hearing as to Billy Elve held on 12/11/2020. Counsel Carson Hancock has filed a Permanent Notice of Appearance on ECF [de 6]. (Digital 11;54:05/LFL-12/11/20-ZOOM) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 12/11/2020. (mdc)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carson L. Hancock appearing for Billy Elve . Attorney Carson L. Hancock added to party Billy Elve(pty:dft). (Hancock, Carson)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 bondCourt Filing
                                                $50K 10% PSB Bond Entered as to Billy Elve Receipt # FLS100219958. Approved by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (dgj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2020: # (1) Restricted Bond with 7th Page) (dgj).[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Status Conference Re: Detention and Report Re: Counsel Hearings as to Billy Elve held on 12/4/2020. The Court sets the STIPULATED Bond of $50,000 w/10% w/nebbia -NEBBIA SATISFIED. Bond paperwork and 10% to be posted and filed by 12/7/20, ( Report Re: Counsel Hearing RESET for 12/11/2020 11:30 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate). (Digital 11:36:37) (mdc)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                    Reset Hearings as to Billy Elve: Detention Hearing reset for 12/4/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 12/4/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate, per agreement of the parties. (cg1)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                      Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Billy Elve held on 11/25/2020. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 11/24/20. The Court grants the request of a temporary hold not to exceed 10 days. Arraignment set for 1/22/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 12/7/2020 11:30 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 1/22/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 12/7/2020 11:30 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (Digital EGT-01-11-25-2020-ZOOM 2:11 PM) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the obligation of the United States to produce all exculpatory and impeachment evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/25/2020). (at)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020 Notice of Temporary Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                        NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin Sean McGill appearing for Billy Elve (mdc)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT as to Billy Elve (1). (dgj)[1:20-mj-04087-EGT]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 458 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?