NELSON v. ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-00777

Tags
Last Updated April 2, 2021 at 10:09 AM DT (5.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRENDON NELSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Derek T. Smith Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander G. Cabeceiras +1 212 587 0760 +1 212 587 4169 alexc@dereksmithlaw.com
v.
Robinhood Financial, LLC Robinhood Financial, LLC, Defendant
Robinhood Markets, Inc. Robinhood Markets, Inc., Defendant
Robinhood Securities, LLC Robinhood Securities, LLC, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/28/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Contempt Proceedings
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Intervene
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/2021, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/31/2021, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/31/2021, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23727947)Document filed by BRENDON NELSON..(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 6,473 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?