United States of America v. Space Exploration Technologies Corp. d/b/a SpaceX
Federal Court Proceeding California Central District Court, Case No. 2:21-mc-00043-DMG-MRW
District Judge Dolly M. Gee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 30, 2021 at 7:36 PM DT (3.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Renee Sandoval +1 202 532 5736 lisa.sandoval@usdoj.gov
v.
Space Exploration Technologies Corporation Space Exploration Technologies Corporation, Respondent
Officially listed as "Space Exploration Technologies Corp. d/b/a SpaceX"
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Report and Recommendation (Issued)Court Filing
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1] (vm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Notice of Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Objections to R&R due by April 12, 2021. (Attachments: # (1) Report and Recommendation) (vm)
                LREF
                Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jessica H. Ro at jro@akingump.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Ro, Jessica)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Status Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
                  MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conducted another video hearing with the parties this week regarding the fully-briefed application. No further proceedings will be scheduled nor will additional briefing be received. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: ZoomGov 3/18/2021. (vm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Reply (Motion related)
                    REPLY to Respondent's Opposition filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit)(Sandoval, Lisa)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
                      MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. Re: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1] (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher Cardaci in Support of Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Application for Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Cardaci Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Cardaci Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 3 to Cardaci Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 4 to Cardaci Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 5 to Cardaci Declaration, # (7) Proposed Order)(Ro, Jessica)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance[8]. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 Status Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
                          ORDER RE SCHEDULING held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: 1. The Court conducted a video hearing with the parties today. Based on that discussion, here's the scheduled for the subpoena enforcement action: a. SpaceX's responsive submission (NTE 25 pages plus relevant exhibits/attachments/declarations) due by Friday, February 26. b. The government's optional reply (same limits) due by Friday, March 12. c. Video hearing tentatively set for Thursday, March 18, at 10 a.m. PT. 2. The parties may jointly contact t he Clerk at the chambers' e-mail address to request revisions to the schedule or to arrange additional meetings with Judge Wilner. Court Reporter: Zoom. (es)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph DiPiero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SpaceX, designating Jessica H. Ro as local counsel [11]. (gk)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney James Tysse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SpaceX, designating Jessica H. Ro as local counsel [10]. (gk)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SpaceX, designating Jessica H. Ro as local counsel [9]. (gk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                  NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph DiPiero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30408693)[11]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): DC admission not listed. (Thrasher, Lupe)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                    NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30407696)[9]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (Thrasher, Lupe)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021, Terminated: 2/5/2021 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph DiPiero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30408693) filed by defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Ro, Jessica)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021, Terminated: 2/5/2021 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                        APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Tysse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30408550) filed by defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Ro, Jessica)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021, Terminated: 2/5/2021 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                          APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30407696) filed by defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Ro, Jessica)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jessica H. Ro on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Attorney Jessica H. Ro added to party Space Exploration Technologies Corp.(pty:res))(Ro, Jessica)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner United States of America, Application for Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena and Related Documents by E-mail served on February 1,2021. (Jhaveri, Sejal)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner United States of America, Application for Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena and Related Documents served on January 29, 2021. (Jhaveri, Sejal)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The matter will be set for a video conference on Monday, February 8, at 10 a.m. PT. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                    (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court is in receipt of Petitioner United States of America's Application for an Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena [1]. The Petition is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Wilner for a report and recommendation. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Sandoval, Lisa)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                          APPLICATION For Order to Comply With Administrative Subpoena No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Proposed Order) (Attorney Lisa Renee Sandoval added to party United States of America(pty:pet))(Sandoval, Lisa)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 282 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?