USA v. Derges
Criminal Case Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 6:21-cr-03016-BCW

Tags
Last Updated May 6, 2021 at 6:04 PM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon T. Kempf(Designation Assistant US Attorney) +1 417 831 4406 +1 417 831 0078 Shannon.Kempf@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Patricia Ashton Derges, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacie R. Bilyeu +1 417 866 4094 +1 417 866 4791 bilyeulaw@live.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Patricia Ashton Derges (1)
Office Springfield
Filed 1/20/2021
County Christian
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 19-20
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
STATEMENTS OR ENTRIES GENERALLY
Count 9-18
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841B=ND.F
Offense Level 4
NARCOTICS - SELL, DISTRIBUTE, OR DISPENSE
Defendant Custody Status Released
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Compel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Compel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Compel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Pretrial conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Patricia Ashton Derges: In accordance with the Chief Judge's General Order dated February 1, 2021, limiting in-person hearings, this matter will be moved from the March 22, 2021 trial docket to the May 3, 2021 trial docket. Accelerated Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Berziel, Karla)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: 2/2/2021 Bond Report
                      BOND REPORT as to Patricia Ashton Derges. Document is available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter PACER login and password first for authentication. (Naumann, Brandy)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Stacie R. Bilyeu appearing for Patricia Ashton Derges. (Attorney Stacie R. Bilyeu added to party Patricia Ashton Derges(pty:dft))(Bilyeu, Stacie)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 order setting conditions of release
                          ORDER setting conditions of release as to Patricia Ashton Derges. Defendant released on a personal recognizance bond. (Berziel, Karla)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 bond
                            APPEARANCE BOND ENTERED as to Patricia Ashton Derges. (Berziel, Karla)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 warrant returned executed
                              ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED on 2/1/2021 as to Patricia Ashton Derges. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 49.1(a), access to this document is restricted to case participants and the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 Scheduling and Trial OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER as to Patricia Ashton Derges. Accelerated Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes.(Berziel, Karla)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush: INITIAL APPEARANCE, ARRAIGNMENT and SCHEDULING CONFERENCE as to Patricia Ashton Derges held on 2/1/2021. Time in court: 1:55 p.m. to 1:59 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Karla Berziel, 417-865-3869. DEFENDANT ON BOND. (Berziel, Karla) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/1/2021) to correct spelling of Defendant's last name. (Berziel, Karla).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Remark Sealing/Unsealing Indictment
                                    ORAL ORDER as to Patricia Ashton Derges. A defendant having been arrested, it is ordered that this indictment be unsealed, and then processed in accordance with established procedure and law. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge David P Rush. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. (Berziel, Karla)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF CUSTODY ON CONSENT
                                      ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF CUSTODY ON CONSENT as to Patricia Ashton Derges. Signed on 1/20/2021. (Keller, Jeanne)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David P Rush as to Patricia Ashton Derges Signed on 1/20/2021 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes.(Keller, Jeanne)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 indictment
                                          INDICTMENT as to Patricia Ashton Derges (1) count(s) 1-8, 9-18, 19-20. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Remark Sealing/Unsealing Indictment
                                            ORDER as to Patricia Ashton Derges. This indictment shall be kept secret until a defendant is in custody or has been given bail, and upon completion of the issuance of the warrant of arrest, the Clerk shall seal the indictment, and it shall remain sealed pending further order of the Court. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge David P Rush. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?