Securities and Exchange Commission v. Parnas et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-00995

Tags
Last Updated April 15, 2021 at 5:11 PM DT (6.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Best +1 212 336 0042 bestr@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LEE ATTIX GREENWOOD +1 212 336 1060 greenwoodl@sec.gov
Space Lindsay Senechal Moilanen +1 212 336 1100 +1 212 336 1100 moilanenl@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Correia, David, Defendant
Officially listed as "David Correia"
No Logo Parnas Lev, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lev Parnas"
Officer/Director, Dairene International
Office Foley Square
Filed 2/4/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Intervene
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Proposed Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Correia, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Greenwood, Lee)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lev Parnas, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Greenwood, Lee)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Senechal Moilanen on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Moilanen, Lindsay)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Civil Cover Sheet
                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greenwood, Lee)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Attix Greenwood on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Greenwood, Lee)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against David Correia, Lev Parnas. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Best, Richard)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Space Space

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?