Dan Kearns et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 21CV375872

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2021 at 2:36 AM DT (4.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kearns, Dan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weingarten Brown LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan J. Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 eb@wbllp.com
No Logo Kearns, Dorothy, Plaintiff
No Logo Kearns, Sydney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc I Zussman +1 310 772 2250 mzussmanlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J. Benjamin Blakeman, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Benjamin Blakeman +1 213 629 9922 +1 213 232 3230 ben@lifeinsurance-law.com
Space Marc I Zussman +1 310 772 2250 mzussmanlaw@gmail.com
v.
Robinhood Financial, LLC Robinhood Financial, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Brandon Wisoff +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 bwisoff@fbm.com
Robinhood Markets, Inc. Robinhood Markets, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle A. McLorg
Robinhood Securities, LLC Robinhood Securities, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Superior Court of California, Notice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara +1 831 454 2400
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Stipulation & Order re Retention of Jurisdiction pursuant to CCP 664.6 - signed/SRK.
    Blank 19 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Dismissal - Entire Action
    With Prejudice
      Blank 18 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Notice
      CMC reset from 7/8/21 to 9/16/21
        Blank 17 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
          Blank 16 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Order
          Order Granting Stipulation to Continue CMC - signed/SRK.
            Blank 15 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Notice
            CMC reset from 6/3/21 to 7/8/21.
              Blank 14 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
              Stipulation to Continue CMC
                Blank 13 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                Notice Of Order Deeming Case Complex And Staying Discovery And Responsive Pleading Deadline
                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice
                  Notice of Appearance
                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice
                    Notice of Appearance
                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Order: Deeming Case Complex
                      Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.
                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                        Proof of Service of Summons Complaint
                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                          Proof of Service of Summons Complaint
                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                            Proof of Service of Summons Complaint
                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Order
                              Letter from U.S. District Court, Northern District of California, enclosing copies of docket entries and Remand Order.
                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Civil Lawsuit Notice
                                        1st CMC set for 6/3/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil. R. Kulkarni for all purposes

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?