Spears, Britney Jean - Conservatorship
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BP108870

Tags
Last Updated August 15, 2021 at 7:23 PM DT (1.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bessemer Trust Company Of California, NA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Eardley John J., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Ghalib Adnah, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Ingham Iii Samuel D. Esq, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Lutfi Sam, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Spears, James P., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Wallet Andrew M., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Wantuch Stan, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Entertainment Tonight, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo KABC-TV, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Moore, Ernest L., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo People Magazine, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Perreault Katerina, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo S.J. Gibson Films, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Spears, Lynne, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo The Weekly LLC. The New York Times, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Tmz, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Wantuch Stan, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Wright Lauriann, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo American Contractors Indemnity Company, Surety Company
No Logo Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Surety Company
No Logo Boxer Joel E. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Cohen, Jeryll S. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Diamond Roger Jon, Attorney
No Logo Eardley Jon, Attorney
No Logo Freedman Bryan J. Esq, Attorney
No Logo In Pro Per, Attorney
No Logo Ingham Samuel D. Iii Esq, Attorney
No Logo Kreshek Bradley H. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Miller, Louis R., Esq., Attorney
No Logo Moore, Bonita D., Attorney
No Logo Neri, Geoffrey A., Attorney
No Logo Phillips Stacy D., Attorney
No Logo Schleimer Joseph D., Attorney
No Logo Swan Rebekah E., Attorney
No Logo Thoreen Vivian Lee Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wallet Andrew Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wasser Laura A. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wexler Jeffrey D., Attorney
No Logo Wyle Geraldine A. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Bua Joseph D. Sr, Probate Referee
No Logo Kraus Britt, Other
No Logo Montgomery, Jodi, Nominee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Rubin Jason, Nominee
Officer/Director, T-hq, Inc.
No Logo O'Riordon, Peter, Requestor
No Logo Park Jonathan Hoon, Associated Attorney for Petitioner
No Logo Thoreen Vivian Lee, Associated Attorney for Petitioner
Spears, Britney Spears, Britney, Subject
Officially listed as "Spears, Britney Jean"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Superior Court, Court
No Logo Wyle Geraldine A. Esq, Attorney Participant Removal (Conversion)
Type Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)
Status Under Court Supervision 04/30/2016
  Entries (2014) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 2014 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: 8/12/2021 Objection
Objection - Subsequent Petition Conservator/Guardianship (JAMES P. SPEARS' FIRST RESPONSE TO CONSERVATEE'S PETITION FOR SUSPENSION AND REMOVAL, ETC. )
    Legal Document 2013 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: 8/9/2021 Objection - Subsequent Petition Conservator/Guardianship
    JAMES P. SPEARS' FIRST RESPONSE TO CONSERVATEE'S PETITION FOR SUSPENSION AND REMOVAL, ETC.
      Blank 2012 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: 8/9/2021 Confidential Screening Form
      Confidential Screening Form
        Blank 2011 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: 8/6/2021 ExParte Order
          Legal Document 2010 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: 8/5/2021 Opposition
          OPPOSITION TO NON-APPEARANCE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE SEPTEMBER 29 HEARING DATE ON THE PETITION TO REMOVE JAMES P. SPEARS AS CONSERVATOR OF THE ESTATE OR FOR HIS IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION; DECLARATION OF JAMES P. SPEARS
            Blank 2009 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: 8/5/2021 Joinder
            Verified Joinder of Jodi Montgomery
              Blank 2008 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: 8/5/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                Blank 2007 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: 8/5/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                  Legal Document 2006 Filed: 7/31/2021, Entered: 7/31/2021 Ex-Parte Application
                  (Appearing 8/6/2021) Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing Hearing on Petition
                    Blank 2005 Filed: 7/31/2021, Entered: 7/31/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                      Blank 2004 Filed: 7/31/2021, Entered: 7/31/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                        Blank 2003 Filed: 7/31/2021, Entered: 7/31/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                          Blank 2002 Filed: 7/31/2021, Entered: 7/31/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                            Blank 2001 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: 7/30/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                              Blank 2000 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: 7/28/2021 Request: Special Notice
                                Blank 1999 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: 7/27/2021 Joinder
                                Joinder to Remove and Appoint
                                  Blank 1998 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Letters - Temporary
                                    Blank 1997 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Notice
                                    Notice of Appearance
                                      Blank 1996 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Minute Order
                                        Legal Document 1995 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Petition - Removal
                                        - Petition for Suspension and Removal of James P. Spears
                                          Blank 1994 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                          Denied
                                            Blank 1993 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                            KTTV Fox 11 News
                                              Blank 1992 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Notification-Cons./Guard Address
                                              Notification - Cons/Guard Address
                                                Blank 1991 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Confidential Screening Form
                                                  Blank 1990 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Citation
                                                  ISSUED
                                                    Legal Document 1989 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Petition - Appoint Conservator of Estate
                                                    Successor
                                                      Blank 1988 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: 7/26/2021 Order-Extending Temporary Letters
                                                        Blank 1987 Filed: 7/24/2021, Entered: 7/24/2021 Order
                                                          Blank 1986 Filed: 7/24/2021, Entered: 7/24/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                            Blank 1985 Filed: 7/24/2021, Entered: 7/24/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                              Blank 1984 Filed: 7/24/2021, Entered: 7/24/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                Blank 1983 Filed: 7/24/2021, Entered: 7/24/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                  Blank 1982 Filed: 7/24/2021, Entered: 7/24/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                    Blank 1981 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: 7/23/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                      Blank 1980 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                        Blank 1979 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                          Blank 1978 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                            Blank 1977 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                              Blank 1976 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                Blank 1975 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                  Blank 1974 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                    Blank 1973 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                      Blank 1972 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                        Blank 1971 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                          Blank 1970 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                            Blank 1969 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                              Blank 1968 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                Blank 1967 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                  Blank 1966 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                    Blank 1965 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                      Blank 1964 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                        Blank 1963 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                          Blank 1962 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                            Blank 1961 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                              Blank 1960 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                Blank 1959 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                  Blank 1958 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                    Blank 1957 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                      Blank 1956 Filed: 7/18/2021, Entered: 7/18/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                        Blank 1955 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/16/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                          Blank 1954 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: 7/15/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                            Blank 1953 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: 7/15/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                              Blank 1952 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: 7/15/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                Blank 1951 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: 7/15/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                  Blank 1950 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: 7/15/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1949 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: 7/15/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                      Blank 1948 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1947 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1946 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1945 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                              Blank 1944 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                Blank 1943 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1942 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1941 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1940 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1939 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1938 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Petition Denied
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1937 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1936 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Petition Granted
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1935 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1934 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1933 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Petition Denied
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1932 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1931 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Petition Denied
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1930 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1929 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Petition Granted
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1928 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1927 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1926 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1925 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1924 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1923 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1922 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1921 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1920 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1919 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1918 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1917 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1916 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1915 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1914 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: 7/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1913 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1912 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1911 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Takeflight Film Ltd.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1910 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1909 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1908 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1907 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1906 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1905 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1904 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1903 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1902 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1901 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1900 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1899 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1898 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1897 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1896 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1895 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1894 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1893 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1892 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1891 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1890 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1889 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1888 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1887 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1886 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1885 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1884 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1883 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1882 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1881 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1880 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1879 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1878 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1877 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1876 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Notice-Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP TIME RECORDS AND COSTS DETAIL FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1875 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1874 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1873 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1872 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1871 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1870 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1869 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1868 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1867 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1866 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1865 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1864 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1863 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1862 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1861 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Petition - Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION BY AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOR CONFIDENTIAL COMMUNICATION WITH CONSERVATEE TO OFFER AND PROVIDE SUPPORTED DECISION-MAKING SERVICES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1860 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AND APPROVING PAYMENT OF 1 COMPENSATION TO CONSERVATOR AND ATTORNEYS FOR CONSERVATOR; AND 2 REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1859 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AND APPROVING PAYMENT OF 1 COMPENSATION TO CONSERVATOR AND ATTORNEYS FOR CONSERVATOR; AND 2 REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1858 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jodi Montgomery's Reply to James P. Spears' Opposition to Petition for Order Authorizing and Instructing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1857 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1856 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Objection - Subsequent Petition Conservator/Guardianship
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jodi Montgomery's Response to James Spears Petition for Instructions and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1855 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1854 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1853 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1852 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1851 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1850 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1849 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1848 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1847 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1846 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1845 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1844 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1843 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1842 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1841 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1840 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1839 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1838 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1837 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1836 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1835 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1834 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1833 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1832 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1831 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1830 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1829 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1828 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1827 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1826 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1825 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1824 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1823 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1822 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1821 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1820 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1819 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1818 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1817 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1816 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1815 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1814 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1813 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1812 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1811 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1810 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1809 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1808 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1807 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1806 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1805 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1804 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1803 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1802 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1801 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1800 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1799 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1798 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Jodi Montgomery's Reply to James P. Spears' Response CAC Samuel D. Ingham
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1797 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1796 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplement No. 2 to Fee Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1795 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1794 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1793 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1792 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1791 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1790 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1789 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1788 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1787 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1786 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1785 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1784 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1783 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1782 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1781 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing Ex Parte re GAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1780 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Ex Parte re Security Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1779 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1778 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1777 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1776 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1775 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1774 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1773 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1772 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1771 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1770 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1769 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1768 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1767 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1766 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1765 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1764 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1763 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1762 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1761 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1760 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1759 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1758 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1757 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1756 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1755 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1754 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1753 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1752 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1751 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1750 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: 7/8/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1749 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Ex Parte Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    $435) (JAMES P. SPEARS??? OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING AND INSTRUCTING CONSERVATOR(S) OF THE ESTATE TO PAY FOR ADDITIONAL SECURITY EXPENSES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1748 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      James P. Spears' Response to Temporary Conservator of the Person Jodi Montgomery's Ex Parte Petition for Appointment of GAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1747 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1746 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration re Service of Ex Parte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1745 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1744 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof of Service re Ex Parte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1743 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Ex Parte Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Petition re Appointment of GAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1742 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1741 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    People Magazine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1740 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Ex Parte Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      7/8/2021 - Ex Parte re Additional Security Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1739 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1738 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1737 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1736 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1735 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1734 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1733 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1732 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1731 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1730 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1729 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Petition - Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Petition for Permission to Hire Private Legal Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1728 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1727 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1726 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1725 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1724 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1723 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1722 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1721 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1720 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1719 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1718 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1717 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1716 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1715 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1714 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1713 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1712 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1711 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1710 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1709 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1708 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1707 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1706 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1705 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: 7/2/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            KABC-TV
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1704 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: 7/2/2021 Request: Special Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Special Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1703 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: 7/2/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1702 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1701 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Ann Piedmont Re: Ex Parte Notices; Proof of Service of Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1700 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1699 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1698 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1697 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1696 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1695 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1694 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1693 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1692 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1691 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1690 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1689 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1688 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1687 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1686 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1685 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1684 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1683 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1682 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1681 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1680 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1679 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1678 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1677 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1676 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1675 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1674 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1673 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Ex Parte Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Application for Court Approval of Resignation of Bessemer Trust Company of California, N.A. as Co-Conservator of the Estate Due to Changed Circumstances; Declarations in Support Thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1672 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1671 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1670 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Order - Appointing Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1669 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1668 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1667 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1666 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1665 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1664 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1663 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1662 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1661 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1660 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1659 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1658 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1657 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1656 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1655 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1654 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1653 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1652 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: 6/29/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1651 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: 6/29/2021 Petition - Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        James P. Spears' Petition for Instructions and Order Investigating Issues and Claims Raised by Britney Jean Spears at June 23, 2021 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1650 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          James P. Spears' Response to Court-Appointed Counsel Samuel D. Ingham III's Petition for Appointment of Jodi Montgomery as Conservator of the Person
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1649 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1648 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1647 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1646 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1645 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1644 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1643 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1642 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1641 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1640 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1639 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1638 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1637 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1636 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1635 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1634 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1633 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/24/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1632 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/24/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1631 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/24/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                KNX 1070AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1630 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/24/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1629 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: 6/23/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOX40 Sacramento
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1628 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: 6/22/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1627 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: 6/22/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1626 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: 6/22/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1625 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: 6/22/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1624 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1623 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1622 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1621 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED Supplement No. 1 to Petition Allowing Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1620 Filed: 6/19/2021, Entered: 6/19/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1619 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1618 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1617 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1616 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1615 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1614 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1613 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1612 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1611 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1610 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          KABC TV
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1609 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: 6/15/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1608 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1607 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1606 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1605 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Petition - Terminate Conservatorship
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1604 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1603 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: 6/11/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1602 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: 6/11/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1601 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entertainment Tonight
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1600 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1599 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Denied.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1598 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Australian Broadcasting Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1597 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1596 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law & Crime Trial Network
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1595 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1594 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1593 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1592 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Associated Press
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1591 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1590 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Story Syndicate LLC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1589 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1588 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Continued Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1587 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1586 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1585 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1584 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1583 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1582 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1581 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1580 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1579 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1578 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1577 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1576 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1575 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1574 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1573 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1572 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      People Magazine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1571 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1570 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1569 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1568 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1567 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1566 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1565 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1564 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1563 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Petition Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1562 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1561 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Denied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1560 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TMZ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1559 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1558 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1557 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1556 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1555 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1554 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1553 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1552 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1551 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1550 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1549 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1548 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1547 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1546 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1545 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1544 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1543 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1542 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1541 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1540 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1539 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1538 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1537 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1536 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1535 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1534 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1533 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1532 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSERVATOR'S PRELIMINARY RESPONSE TO LYNNE SPEARS' OBJECTION TO FEE AND COST REQUEST OF HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1531 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1530 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1529 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1528 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1527 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1526 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1525 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1524 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1523 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1522 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1521 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1520 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1519 Filed: 4/25/2021, Entered: 4/25/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1518 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1517 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1516 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1515 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Remote Appearance - Scheduled

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 8,692 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?