Superior Appellate Supreme
State
Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York NY Supreme Court

In the Matter of the Inquiry by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York v. iFinex Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County, Case No. 450545/2019

Tags
Last Updated February 11, 2021 at 3:09 PM ST (4.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo In the Matter of the Inquiry by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, Petitioner
v.
No Logo BFXNA Inc., Respondent
No Logo BFXWW Inc., Respondent
No Logo iFinex Inc., Respondent
No Logo Tether Holdings Limited, Respondent
No Logo Tether International Limited, Respondent
No Logo Tether Limited, Respondent
No Logo Tether Operations Limited, Respondent
  Entries (139) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 140 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Joint Update Letter Confirmation Notice
    Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 Letter - Correspondence
    SO ORDERED
      Legal Document 138 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
      Notice of Neutral Evaluation Program - Commercial Division - Supreme NY Civil
        Legal Document 137 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
          Legal Document 136 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Remittitur
            Legal Document 135 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Remittitur
              Legal Document 134 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Letter - Correspondence
              SO ORDERED
                Legal Document 133 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
                Letter from Bitfinex and Tether as Directed by 9.9.2020 Letter Endorsement (Doc. 131)
                  Legal Document 132 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
                    Legal Document 131 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 Letter - Correspondence
                    SO ORDERED
                      Legal Document 130 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
                        Legal Document 129 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003)
                        Notice of Entry of the First Department's Decision and Order Denying Respondent's Motion to Dismiss
                          Legal Document 128 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
                            Legal Document 127 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 URGENT
                            COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
                              Legal Document 126 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Letter - Correspondence
                              SO ORDERED
                                Legal Document 125 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                F (Motion #003) Transcript of Proceedings, dated May 6, 2019
                                  Legal Document 124 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                  E (Motion #003) Email Chain with Special Referee Liebman, dated September 4, 2019
                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                    D (Motion #003) Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Stay, dated September 6, 2019
                                      Legal Document 122 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                      C (Motion #003) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for a Stay, dated August 30, 2019
                                        Legal Document 121 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                        B (Motion #003) Respondents' Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Stay, dated August 21, 2019
                                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                          A (Motion #003) First Department Stay Order, dated September 24, 2019
                                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
                                              Legal Document 118 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
                                                Legal Document 117 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #003)
                                                Notice of Appeal from Order Denying Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (With Informational Statement App ... show more
                                                  Legal Document 116 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003)
                                                  Notice of Entry of Order Denying Respondents' Motion to Dismiss
                                                    Legal Document 115 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
                                                      Legal Document 114 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
                                                        Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: 7/22/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003)
                                                          Respondents' Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss
                                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: 7/22/2019 AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
                                                            Reply Affirmation Of Stuart Hoegner
                                                              Legal Document 110 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #003)
                                                                Legal Document 109 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                BB (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service
                                                                  Legal Document 108 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                  AA (Motion #003) Service Delivery Confirmations
                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                    Z (Motion #003) IEO White Paper
                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                      Y (Motion #003) IEO Tweets
                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                        X (Motion #003) IEO Announcements
                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                          W (Motion #003) 5W NY Meeting
                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                            V (Motion #003) 5W Agency of Record Press Release
                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                              U (Motion #003) Freeh Report
                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                T (Motion #003) Friedman Report
                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                  S (Motion #003) Texts with Devasini (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                    R (Motion #003) NY Trading Firm Account Signup (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                      Legal Document 98 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                      Q (Motion #003) Noble Execute Pool Agreement (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                        Legal Document 97 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                        P (Motion #003) Noble Pool Agreement Emails and Edits (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                          Legal Document 96 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                          O (Motion #003) Noble Investment (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                            Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                            N (Motion #003) Signature Bank Docs (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                              Legal Document 94 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                              M (Motion #003) Metropolitan Bank Docs (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                L (Motion #003) Tether Terms of Srvice 1.3.18
                                                                                                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                  K (Motion #003) Tether Terms of Service 11.27.18
                                                                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                    J (Motion #003) NY Clients Login (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                      I (Motion #003) NY Trader Docs (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                        H (Motion #003) Galaxy Onboarding (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                          G (Motion #003) Hoegner Emails with NY Trader 2 (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                            F (Motion #003) Hoegner Emails with NY Trader (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                              Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                              E (Motion #003) NY Trader - Bitfinex Team Introductory Email (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                D (Motion #003) NY Trader - Noble Introductory Email (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                  C (Motion #003) 354 Order
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 83 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                    B (Motion #003) Tether Subpoena
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                      A (Motion #003) iFinex Subpoena
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 AFFIRMATION (Motion #003)
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003)
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
                                                                                                                            Respondent's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss And For An Immediate Stay
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003)
                                                                                                                              Affirmation Of Stuart Hoegner
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
                                                                                                                                Proposed Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                  76
                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                      A (Motion #002) Ex. A - Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                        Respondents' Letter Regarding Proposed Form of Order on Motion to Vacate or Modify
                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                          H (Motion #002) Fowler Indictment
                                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                            G (Motion #002) Wall Street Journal Article
                                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                              F (Motion #002) Bloomberg Article
                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                E (Motion #002) Indiana Order re Bionic
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                  D (Motion #002) Texas Order re BTCRUSH
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                    C (Motion #002) SCROLL Record of Spitzer v. Merril Lynch
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                      B (Motion #002) Ex Parte Order - Allen
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                        A (Motion #002) Ex Parte Order - Edelstein
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                          Michael Affirmation in Support of OSC
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 5/5/2019, Entered: 5/5/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memorandum in Further Support of OSC
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                              D (Motion #002) Detention Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                C (Motion #002) SDNY Press Release
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                  B (Motion #002) 354 Memo of Law (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                    A (Motion #002) 354 Petition and Exhibits (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 AFFIRMATION (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Appearance Of David I. Miller For Respondents
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Appearance Of Zoe Phillips For Respondents
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                                                Respondents Memo of Law in Support of OSC
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                  17 (Motion #002) Ex. 17 - Steptoe Email re Present Application
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                    16 (Motion #002) Ex. 16 - NYAG Press Release re Ex Parte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                      15 (Motion #002) Ex. 15 - NYAG Email re Ex Parte Order (2 of 2)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                        14 (Motion #002) Ex. 14 - NYAG Email re Ex Parte Order (1 of 2)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                          13 (Motion #002) Ex. 13 - Stepoe Email re Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                            12 (Motion #002) Ex. 12 - Steptoe Letter to NYAG
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                              11 (Motion #002) Ex. 11 - NYAG Letter to Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                10 (Motion #002) Ex. 10 - Emails with NYAG
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  9 (Motion #002) Ex 9. - Email to NYAG re Addl Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    8 (Motion #002) Ex. 8 - Emails with NYAG and SJ
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      7 (Motion #002) Ex. 7 - NYAG Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        6 (Motion #002) Ex. 6 - Email to NYAG
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          5 (Motion #002) Ex. 5 - Emails re Outage
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            4 (Motion #002) Ex. 4 - Emails re Outage
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              3 (Motion #002) Ex. 3 - NYAG Email to Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                2 (Motion #002) Ex. 2 - Email to NYAG
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  1 (Motion #002) Ex. 1 - April 24, 2019 Ex Parte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Weinstein Affirmation in Support of OSC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      I (Motion #002) Ex. I - CNBC Article
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        H (Motion #002) Ex. H - WSJ Article re NYAG Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          G (Motion #002) Ex G - Federal Reserve Website
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            F (Motion #002) Ex. F - USD-USDT Exchange Rates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E (Motion #002) Ex. E - Marketwatch Article
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                D (Motion #002) Ex. D - Bitcoin Magazine Article
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  C (Motion #002) Ex. C - Tether Risk Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    B (Motion #002) Ex. B - Tether Terms of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      A (Motion #002) Ex. A - Bloomberg Article
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hoegner Affirmation in Support of OSC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Commercial Division Addendum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 NOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING (Motion #001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Castiglione Affirmation of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    M (Motion #001) Facility Agreement (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      L (Motion #001) Line of Credit Written Resolutions (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        K (Motion #001) Register of Directors (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          J (Motion #001) OAG Letter (Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            I (Motion #001) Bitfinex Deposit Announcement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              H (Motion #001) Bitfinex Fiat Announcement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                G (Motion #001) Tether Banking Relationship
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  F (Motion #001) iFinex Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E (Motion #001) Tether Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      GBL Sec. 354 Proceeding
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        D iFinex Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          C Tether Screenshot 3/4/19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            B Tether Screeshot 2/19/19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              A CFTC Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed GBL 354 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affirmation

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?