COUBALY et al v. CARGILL, INCORPORATED et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-00386

Tags
Last Updated September 28, 2021 at 11:25 AM DT (3.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AURONA BALLO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
No Logo ISSOUF BAGAYOKO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
No Logo ISSOUF COUBALY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
No Logo MOHAMED TRAORE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
No Logo OUDOU OUATTARA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
No Logo OUSMANE OUATTARA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
No Logo SIDIKI BAMBA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
No Logo TENIMBA DJAMOUTENE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by iradvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
v.
No Logo Barry Callebaut U.s.a., LLC, Defendant
No Logo CARGILL COCOA, Defendant
No Logo Cargill Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Hershey Company, Defendant
No Logo Mars, Incorporated,, Defendant
No Logo MARS WRIGLEY CONFECTIONARY, Defendant
No Logo MONDALEZ INTERNATIONL, INC., Defendant
Nestle USA, Inc. Nestle USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo OLAM AMERICAS, INC., Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/12/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $80000000
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags JURY,TYPE-B
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8193160) filed by SIDIKI BAMBA, MOHAMED TRAORE, AURONA BALLO, OUDOU OUATTARA, TENIMBA DJAMOUTENE, ISSOUF BAGAYOKO, OUSMANE OUATTARA, ISSOUF COUBALY. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons CARGILL INC., # (3) Summons BARRY CALLEBAUT, # (4) Summons CARGILL COCOA, # (5) Summons HERSHEY, # (6) Summons MARS WRIGLEY, # (7) Summons MONDELEZ, # (8) Summons MARS INC, # (9) Summons NESTLE USA, # (10) Summons OLAM)(Collingsworth, Terrence) (adh, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Notice of QC- New Case
                                                                    NOTICE OF ERROR re [1] Complaint; emailed to tc@iradvocates.org, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Space Space

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?