District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Maryland District Court Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit United States Supreme Court

US v. Philip Kuforiji
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 99-4815

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 14, 2021 at 9:57 PM ST (8.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, A/k/a George Hohman, A/k/a Lade Phillips, A/k/a Philip Olukayode, A/k/a Charles Onojaife, A/k/a Charles Onojafe, A/k/a Biane Charles Egbarin, A/k/a Philip Kuto, A/k/a Philip Kifo, A/k/a Omolade D. Kassim, A/k/a Philip Kutori, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randolph O Gregory, Sr +1 410 727 7654 +1 410 528 9741 randolphgregory@aol.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 260 1565

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara S Sale +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 3124 barbara.sale@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit
Case Type Criminal
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=CR-96-177-CCB
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=CR-96-177-CCB
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None ?
Archival information. Item archived: Briefs/Appendices. Accession Number: 276020004. Box: 233 of 241. Location number: A2502136. [99-4808, 99-4809, 99-4810, 99-4815, 99-4816, 99-4817, 99-4819, 99-4820, 99-4821, 99-4822, 99-4826, 99-4827, 99-4828, 99-4829, 99-4840] TS
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: None ?
    Criminal Justice Act 20 voucher certified for payment to Randolph O'Neil Gregory. [99-4815] PL
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: None ?
      Criminal Justice Act 21 voucher certified for payment to The Lex Group. Different Than Amount Requested? (Y/N): N. . [99-4815] PL
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None ?
        Mandate issued. [99-4815] MR
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None ?
          CJA 21 Voucher received from The Lex Group. [99-4815] PL
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: None ?
            CJA 20 voucher issued to Randolph O'Neil Gregory. [99-4815] MR
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: None ?
              Judgment order filed. Decision: affirmed. EOD Date: 9/8/00. [99-4815] MR
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: None ?
                Unpublished per curiam opinion filed. [99-4815] MR
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: None ?
                  Brief filed by Appellee US. Type of Service: PM Copies: 8 # brf pages: 18. Sufficient [Y/N]: Y. .. [99-4815] LDJ
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None ?
                    A portion of the appendix filed by Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji placed under seal . Volume: two [99-4815] MFT
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None ?
                      CLERK ORDER FILED granting certificate to pl port of apx under seal [36] [99-4815] Copies to all counsel. [99-4815] MFT
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None ?
                        Certificate filed by Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to place a portion vol. 2 of the appendix under seal [36]. [99-4815] [99-4815] MFT
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: None ?
                          Brief joint appendix filed by Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. Type of Service: HD Copies of brief: 6 # brf pages: 13 Copies of apx: 6 of vol. 1, 4 of vol. 2 UNDER SEAL # apx pages: 349 Sufficient?[Y/N]: y 2-sided copying: y SEALED?[Y/N]: y [99-4815] Appellee brief due 6/27/00 for US. MFT
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: None ?
                            Supplemental certification of ROA complete and retained in district court. [99-4815] MR
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None ?
                              Briefing order filed. [99-4815] Appellant(s) brief/joint appendix due 6/7/00 for Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. MFT
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None ?
                                Certification transcript filed in district court by Alexis Callahan on 3/14/00. [99-4815] MFT
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: None ?
                                  Transcript order acknowledgment filed. Transcript due on 4/3/00 for Alexis Callahan. T/S certification due on 4/3/00 for Alexis Callahan. [99-4815] MFT
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: None ?
                                    Transcript order filed for Alexis Callahan. What is being ordered: sentencing 10/21/99 . [99-4815] MFT
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: None ?
                                      CLERK ORDER FILED granting motion to rescind br.o due to ts [26] Copies to all counsel. [99-4815] MFT
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: None ?
                                        Motion filed by Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji [26] to rescind briefing order dated 12/28/99 due to outstanding transcript. [99-4815] MFT
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: None ?
                                          Appearance form filed by Randolph O'Neil Gregory for Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. [99-4815] MFT
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None ?
                                            CLERK ORDER FILED denying motion to rescind br.o due to ts without prejudice to refile motion with transcript purchase order attached.[19] Copies to all counsel. [99-4815] MFT
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None ?
                                              Motion filed by Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji [19] to rescind briefing order dated 12/28/99 due to outstanding transcript. [99-4815] MFT
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: None ?
                                                CLERK ORDER FILED granting motion to ext time to file a's br/apx [16] Appellant(s) brief/joint appendix now due 2/18/00 for Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. Conf aty recomm?: n. Number of days granted: 17. Copies to all counsel. [99-4815] MFT
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: None ?
                                                  Motion filed by Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to extend time to file appellant(s) brief/appendix until 3/1/00 [16]. [99-4815] MFT
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None ?
                                                    Certification of ROA complete and retained in the District Court. [99-4815] DAD
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                      Briefing order filed. [99-4815] Appellant(s) brief/joint appendix due 2/1/00 for Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. MFT
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                        Transcript order acknowledgment filed. Transcript due on 12/27/99 for Paul Mackaro. T/S certification due on 12/27/99 for Paul Mackaro. [99-4815] MFT
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                          Transcript order filed for Paul Mackaro. [99-4815] MFT
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                            Docketing statement filed by Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji [6] T/S needed [Y/N]: y T/S already on file?: n. [99-4815] MFT
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                              Counsel of record form filed by Barbara Slaymaker Sale for Appellee US. DAD
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                                Docketing notice issued. [99-4815] MFT
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                                  CLERK ORDER FILED appointing Randolph Gregory as CJA counsel for Appellant Philip Olukayod Kuforiji [2]. Nunc Pro Tunc Date: 10/20/99. Copies to all counsel. [99-4815] MFT
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Criminal case docketed. MFT
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Space Space

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?