In re: iFINEX INC. v. Pinnacle Bancorp
Federal Court Proceeding Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:20-mc-00063-CMA
District Judge Christine M. Arguello, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2021 at 4:49 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo iFinex Inc., In Re

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Beal +1 858 638 1400 cbeal@dmalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Wells Stevenson +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 shannon.stevenson@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by mjllaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Jason Lee +1 949 551 1575 +1 214 800 5107 michael@mjllaw.com
No Logo Pinnacle Bancorp, ThirdParty Defendant
Office Denver
Filed 4/13/2020
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Assistance to foreign & international tribunals & litigants
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County Adams
Terminated 7/28/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Subpoena issued
SUBPOENA issued by Clerk. (evana, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Order
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher James Beal on behalf of iFINEX INC.Attorney Christopher James Beal added to party iFINEX INC.(pty:inre) (Beal, Christopher)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Jason Lee on behalf of iFINEX INC.Attorney Michael Jason Lee added to party iFINEX INC.(pty:inre) (Lee, Michael)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
          Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Petition/Application
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?