Superior Appellate Supreme
State
Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York NY Supreme Court

In the Matter of the Inquiry by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York v. iFinex Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Case No. 2019-03341

Tags
Last Updated February 16, 2021 at 11:10 AM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BFXNA Inc., Respondent-Appellant
No Logo BFXWW Inc., Respondent-Appellant
No Logo iFinex Inc., Respondent-Appellant
No Logo Tether Holdings Limited, Respondent-Appellant
No Logo Tether International Limited, Respondent-Appellant
No Logo Tether Limited, Respondent-Appellant
No Logo Tether Operations Limited, Respondent-Appellant
No Logo In the Matter of the Inquiry by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, Petitioner-Respondent
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Decision and Order
Confirmation Notice
    Blank 15 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 LETTER OF UNAVAILABILITY
    from Charles Michael for Respondent-Appellants
      Blank 14 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Appellants Reply Brief
        Blank 13 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 LETTER OF UNAVAILABILITY
        from Charles Michael for Respondent-Appellants
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Respondent's Brief
          .
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 appellant's brief
              Blank 10 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 NOTE OF ISSUE
                Blank 9 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Record on Appeal
                vol 2 of 2
                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Record on Appeal
                  vol 1 of 2
                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #7041)
                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #7041)
                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTIFICATION OF CASE NUMBER
                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 NOTICE OF MOTION W/SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS INCLUDING EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #7041) *Corrected*
                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE *Corrected*
                            Notice Of Appearance Of Zoe Phillips For Respondent-Appellants
                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE *Corrected*
                              Notice Of Appearance Of David I. Miller For Respondent-Appellants
                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 COPY OF NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH PROOF OF FILING / INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT / ORDER OR JDMT APPEALED FROM

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?