American Airlines, Inc. et al v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-07050-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:00 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Globes Aviation Services Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo ICTS International NV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo The Massachuesttes Port Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "UAL Corps."

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff
US Airways Group, Inc. US Airways Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael D. Steger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Douglas Steger +1 845 727 1750 +1 845 689 2155 msteger@steger-law.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of Exhibits to Complaint re: [1] Complaint,,. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Airtran Airways, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Globes Aviation Services Corporation, Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Huntleigh USA Corp., ICTS International NV, The Boeing Company, The Massachuesttes Port Authority, The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corps., US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond)
    LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 1/9/08 re:Aviation Party Plaintiffs notified the Clerk of the Court of their failure to file the exhibits to the Complaints in cases 07cv7050 & 07cv7051 and seek permission to add the exhibits to the docket. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/9/08) (pl)
      LREF
      Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File Document
      MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality. Document filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Steger, Michael)
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims By The Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiff's Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
          LREF
          Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. i/s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/31/2011) (tro) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden.(Normand, Sarah)
                LREF
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Case Consolidation - Member
                      CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. (jeh)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Case Designation
                        Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (jeh)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Case Accepted as Related
                          CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jeh)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                            Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority.(laq)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Boeing Company.(laq)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Inksure Technologies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(laq)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying ICTS-U.S.A., Inc., ICTS International, N.V. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corp.(laq)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Securitas A.B. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globe Airport Security Services, Inc..(laq)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Securitas A.B. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globes Aviation Services Corporation.(laq)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Group 4 Securicor, plc as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.(laq)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Pinnacle Airlines Corp. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.(laq)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying US Airways Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.(laq)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Airtran Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Airtran Airways, Inc..(laq)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Barclays Global Investors, N.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.(laq)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Comair Holdings, L.L.C., Comair, Inc., Comair Services, Inc., Crown Rooms, Inc., DAL Aircraft Trading, Inc., DAL Global Services, L.L.C., DAL Moscow, Inc., Delta AirElite Business Jets, Inc., Delta Benefits Management, Inc., Delta Connection Academy, Inc., Delta Corporate Identity, Inc., Delta benefits Management Services, L.L.C., Delta Technology, L.L.C., Delta Ventures III, L.L.C., Epsilon Trading, Inc., Kappa Capital management, Inc., Song, L.L.C. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.(laq)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by US Airways Group, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by UAL Corps..(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying UAL Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMR Corporation.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany). Modified on 8/23/2007 (lb).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying AMR Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden, United Airlines, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 623130)Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Airtran Airways, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Globes Aviation Services Corporation, Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Huntleigh USA Corp., ICTS International NV, The Boeing Company, The Massachuesttes Port Authority, The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, UAL Corps., US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc..(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                  Case Designated ECF. (jeh)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                    CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:21-mc-97. (laq)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (laq)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?