American Airlines, Inc. et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigations, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-07051-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Globes Aviation Services Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo ICTS International NV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo The Massachuesttes Port Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "UAL Corps."

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
US Airways Group, Inc. US Airways Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Robert S. Mueller, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael D. Steger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Douglas Steger +1 845 727 1750 +1 845 689 2155 msteger@steger-law.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Joinder
JOINDER to join re: [53] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs.(Granito, Frank)
    LREF
    Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [42] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment Upholding the Department of Justice's Final Determinations Declining to Authorize the Testimony of Five Current and Former FBI Agents in the September 11 Litigation.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, formerly known as 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Powell, Alexander)
      LREF
      Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
      REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Sarah S. Normand in Support re: [42] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment Upholding the Department of Justice's Final Determinations Declining to Authorize the Testimony of Five Current and Former FBI Agents in the September 11 Litigation.. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Joint Letter from Liaison Counsel to the Court)(Normand, Sarah)
        LREF
        Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Response in Support of Motion
        RESPONSE in Support re: [42] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment Upholding the Department of Justice's Final Determinations Declining to Authorize the Testimony of Five Current and Former FBI Agents in the September 11 Litigation. Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Normand, Sarah)
          LREF
          Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Affidavit of Service Other
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
            LREF
            Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Response
            RESPONSE to the Government's Counterstatement of Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
              LREF
              Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
              DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 38, # (2) Exhibit 39, # (3) Exhibit 40, # (4) Exhibit 41, # (5) Exhibit 42, # (6) Exhibit 43, # (7) Exhibit 44, # (8) Exhibit 45, # (9) Exhibit 46, # (10) Exhibit 47, # (11) Exhibit 48, # (12) Exhibit 49, # (13) Exhibit 50, # (14) Exhibit 51, # (15) Exhibit 52, # (16) Exhibit 53, # (17) Exhibit 54, # (18) Exhibit 55, # (19) Exhibit 56, # (20) Exhibit 57, # (21) Exhibit 58, # (22) Exhibit 59, # (23) Exhibit 60, # (24) Exhibit 61)(Barry, Desmond)
                LREF
                Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 6/27/08 re: Request to file exhibits in hard copy format. ENDORSEMENT: "So Ordered." This document relates to 21mc101 and 07cv7051. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/27/08) (rjm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                    DECLARATION of Sarah S. Normand in Support re: [42] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment Upholding the Department of Justice's Final Determinations Declining to Authorize the Testimony of Five Current and Former FBI Agents in the September 11 Litigation.. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit N to Normand Declaration Part 1, # (2) Exhibit N to Normand Declaration Part 2, # (3) Exhibit P to Normand Declaration Part 1, # (4) Exhibit P to Normand Declaration Part 2, # (5) Exhibit P to Normand Declaration to Part 3, # (6) Exhibit P to Normand Declaration Part 4, # (7) Exhibit P to Normand Declaration Part 5, # (8) Exhibit P to Normand Declaration Part 6, # (9) Exhibit P to Normand Declaration Part 7, # (10) Exhibit V to Normand Declaration Part 1, # (11) Exhibit V to Normand Declaration Part 2)(Vargas, Jeannette)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Joinder
                      JOINDER to join re: [38] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, Joinder in the Opposition to the Aviation Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses. Document filed by 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs.(Pepe, Douglas)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [42] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment Upholding the Department of Justice's Final Determinations Declining to Authorize the Testimony of Five Current and Former FBI Agents in the September 11 Litigation. and in Opposition to Aviation Parties' Motion for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the FBI's Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Chart)(Vargas, Jeannette)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                          CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment Upholding the Department of Justice's Final Determinations Declining to Authorize the Testimony of Five Current and Former FBI Agents in the September 11 Litigation. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # (1) Counterstatement Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1, # (2) Affidavit of Michael J. Heimbach, # (3) Exhibit A to Heimbach Declaration, # (4) Affidavit B to Heimbach Declaration, # (5) Exhibit C to Heimbach Declaration, # (6) Affidavit of Sarah S. Normand, # (7) Exhibit A to Normand Declaration, # (8) Exhibit B to Normand Declaration, # (9) Exhibit C to Normand Declaration, # (10) Exhibit D to Normand Declaration, # (11) Exhibit E to Normand Declaration, # (12) Exhibit f to Normand Declaration, # (13) Exhibit G to Normand Declaration, # (14) Exhibit H to Normand Declaration, # (15) Exhibit I to Normand Declaration, # (16) Exhibit J to Normand Declaration, # (17) Exhibit K to Normand Declaration, # (18) Exhibit L to Normand Declaration, # (19) Exhibit M to Normand Declaration, # (20) Exhibit O to Normand Declaration, # (21) Exhibit Q to Normand Declaration, # (22) Exhibit R to Normand Declaration, # (23) Affidavit S to Normand Declaration, # (24) Exhibit T to Normand Declaration, # (25) Exhibit U to Normand Declaration)(Vargas, Jeannette)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                            DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, formerly known as 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit Exhibit 58)(Powell, Alexander)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                            COUNTER STATEMENT TO [32] Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, formerly known as 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC. (Powell, Alexander)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, formerly known as 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P..(Powell, Alexander)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, formerly known as 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Powell, Alexander)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                  DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37)(Barry, Desmond)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                                        ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr. to RE-FILE Document [34] Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Link to incorrect filing of document #30. (KA)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                                          ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Desond Thomas Barry, Jr. to RE-FILE Document [31] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Link to incorrect filing of document#30. (KA)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - PDF Error
                                            ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Note to Attorney Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr. to RE-FILE Document [30] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents. (KA)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: [30] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37)(Barry, Desmond) Modified on 4/29/2008 (KA).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Affidavit of Service Other
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [30] MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond) Modified on 4/29/2008 (KA).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond) Modified on 4/29/2008 (KA).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 3/31/08 re: Pursuant to the Court's direction at the 3/18/08 status conference, counsel for the Aviation Defendants, Government, Plaintiffs and Cross-Claim Plaintiffs have agreed to the briefing schedules set forth for the four indicated motions which we jointly ask that you approve. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., ( 3 Motions: Aviation Parties' motion for summary judgment to set aside... Aviation Defts. motion for admission of excerpts from the Final Report of the National Commission... and Aviation Defendants' motion for a determination that Khalid Sheikh Mohammed's and Ramzi Binalshibh's prior out-of-court statements... due by 4/29/2008., Responses due by 6/6/2008, Replies due by 6/20/2008). Lastly, Aviation Defendants' motion for a determination that the prior Moussaoui trial testimony of certain FBI witnesses is not subject to any hearsay-related objections: motion due 5/9/08; response due 6/16/08 and reply due 6/25/08. This Document relates to 21mc101 and 07cv7051. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/31/08) (rjm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 5/9/2008. Responses due by 6/16/2008 Replies due by 6/25/2008. (dle)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE of Exhibits to Complaint re: [1] Complaint,,. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Airtran Airways, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Globes Aviation Services Corporation, Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Huntleigh USA Corp., ICTS International NV, The Boeing Company, The Massachuesttes Port Authority, The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corps., US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 1/9/08 re:Aviation Party Plaintiffs notified the Clerk of the Court of their failure to file the exhibits to the Complaints in cases 07cv7050 & 07cv7051 and seek permission to add the exhibits to the docket. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/9/08) (pl)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality. Document filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Steger, Michael)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims By The Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiff's Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. i/s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller.(Normand, Sarah)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Case Consolidation - Member
                                                                            CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. (jeh)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Case Designation
                                                                              Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (jeh)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jeh)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                  Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Inksure Technologies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Boeing Company.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Securitas A.B. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globes Aviation Services Corporation.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Airtran Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Airtran Airways, Inc..(laq)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Pinnacles Airlines Corp. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc..(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Barclays Global Investors, N.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Comair Holdings, L.L.C., Comair, Inc., Comair Services, Inc., Comair Services, Inc., Crown Rooms, Inc., DAL Aircraft Trading, Inc.DAL Global Services, L.L.C., DAL Moscow, Inc., Delta AirElite Business Jets, Inc., Delta Benefits Management, Inc., Delta Connection Academy, Inc., Delta Corporate Identity, Inc., Delta Benefits Management Services, L.L.C., Delta Technology, L.L.C., Delta Ventures III, L.L.C., Epsilon Trading, Inc., Kappa Capital Management, Inc., Song, L.L.C. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by US Airways Group, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying US Airways Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by US Airways, Inc..(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying UAL Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by UAL Corps.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMR Corporation.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying AMR Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Securitas A.B. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globe Airport Security Services, Inc.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying ICTS-U.S.A., Inc., ICTS International, N.V. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corp.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Group 4 Securicor, plc as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc..(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 623130)Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Airtran Airways, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Globes Aviation Services Corporation, Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Huntleigh USA Corp., ICTS International NV, The Boeing Company, The Massachuesttes Port Authority, The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, UAL Corps., US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc..(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (Daniec, Chris).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:21-mc-97. (laq)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller. (laq)
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?