US DOMINION, INC. et al v. MY PILLOW, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-00445-CJN
District Judge Carl J. Nichols, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 24, 2021 at 10:30 AM DT (1.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dominion Voting Systems Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Megan A. Meier (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Arthur Clare +1 202 682 7400 +1 202 879 5200 file@clarelocke.com
Space Megan A. Meier megan@clarelocke.com
Space Dustin Andrew Pusch +1 202 628 7406 dustin@clarelocke.com
No Logo Dominion Voting Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Megan A. Meier (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Arthur Clare +1 202 682 7400 +1 202 879 5200 file@clarelocke.com
Space Megan A. Meier megan@clarelocke.com
Space Dustin Andrew Pusch +1 202 628 7406 dustin@clarelocke.com
No Logo US DOMINION, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Megan A. Meier (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Arthur Clare +1 202 682 7400 +1 202 879 5200 file@clarelocke.com
Space Megan A. Meier megan@clarelocke.com
Space Dustin Andrew Pusch +1 202 628 7406 dustin@clarelocke.com
v.
No Logo MICHAEL J. LINDELL, Defendant
No Logo My Pillow, Inc., Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/22/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1303470000
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
121-cv-00213-CJN
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags JURY,TYPE-B
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                    LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (Clare, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-00213. (Clare, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-00040. (Clare, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Andrew Pusch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pusch, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Lambart Meier on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Meier, Megan)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. re [1] Complaint, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 9, # (5) Exhibit 10, # (6) Exhibit 11, # (7) Exhibit 12, # (8) Exhibit 13, # (9) Exhibit 14, # (10) Exhibit 15, # (11) Exhibit 16, # (12) Exhibit 17, # (13) Exhibit 18, # (14) Exhibit 19, # (15) Exhibit 42, # (16) Exhibit 43, # (17) Exhibit 44, # (18) Exhibit 47, # (19) Exhibit 56, # (20) Exhibit 57, # (21) Exhibit 58, # (22) Exhibit 59, # (23) Exhibit 129, # (24) Exhibit 141, # (25) Exhibit 154, # (26) Exhibit 167, # (27) Exhibit 168, # (28) Exhibit 169, # (29) Exhibit 219, # (30) Exhibit 228, # (31) Exhibit 230, # (32) Exhibit 231, # (33) Exhibit 232, # (34) Exhibit 233, # (35) Exhibit 234, # (36) Exhibit 235, # (37) Exhibit 236, # (38) Exhibit 237, # (39) Exhibit 238, # (40) Exhibit 239, # (41) Exhibit 240, # (42) Exhibit 241, # (43) Exhibit 242, # (44) Exhibit 243, # (45) Exhibit 244, # (46) Exhibit 245, # (47) Exhibit 246, # (48) Exhibit 247, # (49) Exhibit 248, # (50) Exhibit 249, # (51) Exhibit 252, # (52) Exhibit 253, # (53) Exhibit 254, # (54) Exhibit 255, # (55) Exhibit 256, # (56) Exhibit 257, # (57) Exhibit 258, # (58) Exhibit 259, # (59) Exhibit 260, # (60) Exhibit 261, # (61) Exhibit 262, # (62) Exhibit 263, # (63) Exhibit 264, # (64) Exhibit 265, # (65) Exhibit 266, # (66) Exhibit 267, # (67) Exhibit 268, # (68) Exhibit 269, # (69) Exhibit 270, # (70) Exhibit 271, # (71) Exhibit 272, # (72) Exhibit 273, # (73) Exhibit 274, # (74) Exhibit 275, # (75) Exhibit 276, # (76) Exhibit 277, # (77) Exhibit 278, # (78) Exhibit 279, # (79) Exhibit 280, # (80) Exhibit 281, # (81) Exhibit 282, # (82) Exhibit 283, # (83) Exhibit 284, # (84) Exhibit 285, # (85) Exhibit 286, # (86) Exhibit 287, # (87) Exhibit 288, # (88) Exhibit 289, # (89) Exhibit 290, # (90) Exhibit 291, # (91) Exhibit 292, # (92) Exhibit 293, # (93) Exhibit 294, # (94) Exhibit 295, # (95) Exhibit 296, # (96) Exhibit 297, # (97) Exhibit 298, # (98) Exhibit 299, # (99) Exhibit 300, # (100) Exhibit 301, # (101) Exhibit 302, # (102) Exhibit 303, # (103) Exhibit 304, # (104) Exhibit 305, # (105) Exhibit 306, # (106) Exhibit 307, # (107) Exhibit 308, # (108) Exhibit 309, # (109) Exhibit 310, # (110) Exhibit 311, # (111) Exhibit 312, # (112) Exhibit 313, # (113) Exhibit 314, # (114) Exhibit 315, # (115) Exhibit 316, # (116) Exhibit 317, # (117) Exhibit 318, # (118) Exhibit 319, # (119) Exhibit 320, # (120) Exhibit 321, # (121) Exhibit 322, # (122) Exhibit 323, # (123) Exhibit 324, # (124) Exhibit 325, # (125) Exhibit 326, # (126) Exhibit 327, # (127) Exhibit 328, # (128) Exhibit 329, # (129) Exhibit 330, # (130) Exhibit 331, # (131) Exhibit 332, # (132) Exhibit 333, # (133) Exhibit 334, # (134) Exhibit 335, # (135) Exhibit 336, # (136) Exhibit 337, # (137) Exhibit 338, # (138) Exhibit 339, # (139) Exhibit 340, # (140) Exhibit 341, # (141) Exhibit 342, # (142) Exhibit 343, # (143) Exhibit 344, # (144) Exhibit 345, # (145) Exhibit 346, # (146) Exhibit 347, # (147) Exhibit 348)(Clare, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8223832) filed by US DOMINION, INC., DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Summons to My Pillow, Inc., # (2) Summons to Michael Lindell, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Clare, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Summons Not Issued
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Not Issued as to MICHAEL J. LINDELL, MY PILLOW, INC. (adh, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                        Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice of QC- New Case
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ERROR re [1] Complaint; emailed to tom@clarelocke.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (adh, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?