USA v. AISPURO
Federal Court Proceeding District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-mj-00240-GMH

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 4:32 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony John Nardozzi +1 202 598 6481 anthony.nardozzi@usdoj.gov
Space Katharine Ann Wagner +1 202 598 2417 +1 202 617 2547 katharine.wagner@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo EMMA CORONEL AISPURO, Defendant
EMMA CORONEL AISPURO (1)
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/17/2021
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Complaint
Citation
Offense Level 4
COMPLAINT in Violation of 21959(a), 960, 963 and 182
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021 notice of attorney appearance - USA
              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Katharine Ann Wagner appearing for USA. (Wagner, Katharine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [5] Motion to Unseal Case as to EMMA CORONEL AISPURO (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 02/22/2021. (zstd)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021, Terminated: 2/22/2021 Motion to Unseal Case
                  MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to EMMA CORONEL AISPURO. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(zstd)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Case Unsealed
                    Case unsealed as to EMMA CORONEL AISPURO (zstd)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [3] Motion to Seal Case as to EMMA CORONEL AISPURO (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 02/17/2021. (zstd)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Motion to Seal Case
                        MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to EMMA CORONEL AISPURO. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(zstd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Complaint (Sealed)
                          SEALED COMPLAINT as to EMMA CORONEL AISPURO (1). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support) (zstd)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 275 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?