United States of America v. All Funds Previously Seized from Binance Holdings Limited Account Bearing User ID 39177039, and Associated with The Email Address TANYAGLUSHK099@GMAIL.COM
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:21-cv-00418-SDM-TGW
District Judge Steven D. Merryday, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 12, 2021 at 10:44 PM DT (1.6 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Suzanne C. Nebesky +1 813 274 6000 suzanne.nebesky@usdoj.gov
v.
Binance Holdings Limited Binance Holdings Limited, Defendant
Officially listed as "All Funds Previously Seized from Binance Holdings Limited Account Bearing User ID 39177039, and Associated with The Email Address TANYAGLUSHK099@GMAIL.COM"
Office Tampa
Filed 2/22/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 983 Civil Forfeiture Proceedings
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Hillsborough
Terminated 6/1/2021
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Default -Judgment
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against All Funds Previously Seized from Binance Holdings Limited Account Bearing User ID 39177039, and Associated with The Email Address TANYAGLUSHK099@GMAIL.COM Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/1/2021. (MCB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [9]--motion for default judgment; condemning and forfeiting to the United States all money seized from the Binance Holdings account; directing the clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT by default for the United States and against the Binance Holdings account, to TERMINATE any pending motion, and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/1/2021. (BK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021, Terminated: 6/1/2021 Motion for Default Judgment
      MOTION for Default Judgment against All Funds Previously Seized from Binance Holdings Limited Account Bearing User ID 39177039, and Associated with The Email Address TANYAGLUSHK099@GMAIL.COM by United States of America. (Nebesky, Suzanne)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Clerks Entry of Default*
        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Funds Previously Seized from Binance Holdings Limited Account Bearing User ID 39177039, and Associated with The Email Address TANYAGLUSHK099@GMAIL.COM (CTR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021, Terminated: 4/8/2021 Motion for Clerks DefaultCourt Filing
          MOTION for Clerk's Default against All Funds Previously Seized from Binance Holdings Limited Account Bearing User ID 39177039, and Associated with The Email Address TANYAGLUSHK099@GMAIL.COM by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Nebesky, Suzanne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Proof of publication
            PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: Official Government Internet Site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication 30 consecutive days from February 24, 2021 through March 25, 2021. (Nebesky, Suzanne)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in remCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [2] Motion for Issuance of Warrant In Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/26/2021. (DMS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/5/2021. (KR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021, Terminated: 3/1/2021 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in remCourt Filing
                  MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. (Nebesky, Suzanne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against All Funds Previously Seized from Binance Holdings Limited Account Bearing User ID 39177039, and Associated with The Email Address TANYAGLUSHK099@GMAIL.COM filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 198 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?