In Re: WorldCom, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-07414-BSJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 11:21 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Appellant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
Worldcom, Inc. Worldcom, Inc., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfredo Rey Perez +1 713 546 5040 +1 713 224 9511 alfredo.perez@weil.com
Worldcom, Inc. Worldcom, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Grogan +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/21/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 02-B-13533 (AJG)[USBC-SDNY]
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 9/8/2008 re: AUSA writes requesting that the Court permit the government to file a reply brief not exceeding 25 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 9/8/2008) (tve)
    LREF
    Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Declaration
    DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (formerly sealed documents) Part 7. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (S1838-1858), # (2) Record on Appeal (S1859-1883), # (3) Record on Appeal (S1884-1913), # (4) Record on Appeal (S1914-1950))(Torrance, Benjamin)
      LREF
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Declaration
      DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (formerly sealed documents) Part 6. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (S1593-1623), # (2) Record on Appeal (S1624-1654), # (3) Record on Appeal (S1655-1685), # (4) Record on Appeal (S1686-1716), # (5) Record on Appeal (S1717-1737), # (6) Record on Appeal (S1738-1758), # (7) Record on Appeal (S1759-1779), # (8) Record on Appeal (S1780-1800), # (9) Record on Appeal (S1801-1816), # (10) Record on Appeal (S1817-1837))(Torrance, Benjamin)
        LREF
        Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Declaration
        DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (formerly sealed documents) Part 5. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (S1293-1318), # (2) Record on Appeal (S1319-1344), # (3) Record on Appeal (S1345-1375), # (4) Record on Appeal (S1376-1406), # (5) Record on Appeal (S1407-1437), # (6) Record on Appeal (S1438-1468), # (7) Record on Appeal (S1469-1499), # (8) Record on Appeal (S1500-1530), # (9) Record on Appeal (S1531-1561), # (10) Record on Appeal (S1562-1592))(Torrance, Benjamin)
          LREF
          Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Declaration
          DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (formerly sealed documents) Part 4. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (S0888-0918), # (2) Record on Appeal (S0919-0949), # (3) Record on Appeal (S0950-0998), # (4) Record on Appeal (S0999-1137), # (5) Record on Appeal (S1138-1163), # (6) Record on Appeal (S1164-1184), # (7) Record on Appeal (S1185-1210), # (8) Record on Appeal (S1211-1236), # (9) Record on Appeal (S1237-1262), # (10) Record on Appeal (S1263-1292))(Torrance, Benjamin)
            LREF
            Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Declaration
            DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (formerly sealed documents) Part 3. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (S0629-0650), # (2) Record on Appeal (S0651-0676), # (3) Record on Appeal (S0677-0702), # (4) Record on Appeal (S0703-0728), # (5) Record on Appeal (S0729-0754), # (6) Record on Appeal (S0755-0780), # (7) Record on Appeal (S0781-0806), # (8) Record on Appeal (S0807-0832), # (9) Record on Appeal (S0833-0856), # (10) Record on Appeal (S0857-0887))(Torrance, Benjamin)
              LREF
              Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Declaration
              DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (formerly sealed documents) Part 2. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (S0371-0393), # (2) Record on Appeal (S0394-0424), # (3) Record on Appeal (S0425-0445), # (4) Record on Appeal (S0446-0470), # (5) Record on Appeal (S0471-0496), # (6) Record on Appeal (S0497-0522), # (7) Record on Appeal (S0523-0550), # (8) Record on Appeal (S0551-0581), # (9) Record on Appeal (S0582-0606), # (10) Record on Appeal (S0607-0628))(Torrance, Benjamin)
                LREF
                Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Declaration
                DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (formerly sealed documents) Part 1. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (cover/TOC), # (2) Record on Appeal (S0001-0110), # (3) Record on Appeal (S0111-0184), # (4) Record on Appeal (S0185-0215), # (5) Record on Appeal (S0216-0246), # (6) Record on Appeal (S0247-0308), # (7) Record on Appeal (S0309-0329), # (8) Record on Appeal (S0330-0349), # (9) Record on Appeal (S0350-0370))(Torrance, Benjamin)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Appellees Brief
                  Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc.. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/15/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Addendum Index, # (2) Supplement Addendum Exhibit 1, # (3) Supplement Addendum Exhibit 2, # (4) Supplement Addendum Exhibit 3, # (5) Supplement Addendum Exhibit 4, # (6) Supplement Addendum Exhibit 5)(Perez, Alfredo)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Alfredo R. Perez dated 8/22/08 re: Counsel for Verizon Business Global LLC requests that the Court enlarge the page limit established by Local Civil rule 7.1(b) and permit Appellees to file a brief not to exceed 50 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 8/26/08) (js)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER; that the Debtors in the cases 07cv7414 & 08cv3070 are directed to review the sealed portions of the record on appeal and identify those parts of the record, if any, that they believe require continued confidentiality. The parties are then directed to file the remainder in the public record. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/22/08) (pl)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Declaration
                        DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance re: [19] Appellant's Brief annexing record on appeal (publicly filed documents). Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Record on Appeal (part 1), # (2) Record on Appeal (part 2), # (3) Record on Appeal (part 3), # (4) Record on Appeal (part 4))(Torrance, Benjamin)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Appellants Brief
                          Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. Appellee Brief due by 8/29/2008. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 7/16/2008 re: AUSA writes to respectfully request that the Court permit the government to file a brief not exceeding 50 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/16/2008) (tve)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Danna Drori dated 3/28/2008 re: In light of the overlapping nature of these matters, the parties now jointly request that this Court accept the Second Appeal as related to the First Appeal and consolidate the matters. In addition, the parties request that the briefing schedule for both appeals be set as follows: Appellant Moving Brief: July 18, 2008; Appellee August 29/2008; Appellant Reply Brief: September 15, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted SO ORDERED., ( Appellant Brief due by 4/18/2008., Appellee Brief due by 8/29/2008., Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/15/2008.) (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 3/28/2008) (jmi)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Declaration in Support
                                DECLARATION of Alfredo R. Perez in Support re: [15] Reply, [5] Memorandum of Law in Support, [6] Declaration in Support, [4] Notice (Other). Document filed by WorldCom, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1 - Exhibits# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3# (5) Exhibit 4# (6) Exhibit 5# (7) Exhibit 6# (8) Exhibit 7# (9) Exhibit 8# (10) Exhibit 9# (11) Exhibit 10# (12) Exhibit 11# (13) Appendix Part 2 - Index of Statutes# (14) Exhibit A# (15) Exhibit B# (16) Exhibit C# (17) Exhibit D# (18) Exhibit E# (19) Exhibit F# (20) Exhibit G# (21) Exhibit H# (22) Exhibit I# (23) Exhibit J# (24) Exhibit K)(Perez, Alfredo)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Reply
                                REPLY re: [11] Memorandum of Law in Opposition, [12] Declaration in Support Reorganized Debtors' Reply to the Internal Revenue Service's Opposition to Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal or For An Order Denying the Internal Revenue Service Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Barbara S. Jones. Judge Denise L. Cote is no longer assigned to the case. (js)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [10] Motion for James T. Grogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/13/2007) (jmi)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Mail Notice to Attorney(s)
                                      Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (js)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
                                        Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: [13] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Cashiers Remark
                                          CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [10] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/10/2007, Receipt Number 626465. (jd)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Declaration in Support
                                            DECLARATION of Danna Drori in Support re: [11] Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Drori, Danna)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [4] Notice (Other). Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Drori, Danna)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007, Terminated: 9/14/2007 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                              MOTION for James T. Grogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc. (jco)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Verizon Communications Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc..(Perez, Alfredo)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Jduge Denise L. Cote from Alfredo R. Perez dated 8/30/07 re: Verizon Business Global LLC, successor by merger to reorganized debtor World Com, Inc. request that in light of the pending motion to dismiss, and the approaching deadlines in the Bankruptcy Court, the Reorganized Debtors respectfully request that Your Honor toll the briefing schedule on the appeal pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. The Reorganized Debtors have conferred with counsel for the govt and have been informed that the IRS does not object to this request. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/31/07) (pl)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Rene A. Olvera (related documents 4, 5, 6). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                      DECLARATION of Alfredo R. Perez in Support of Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal or for an Order Denying the IRS Leave to File and Interlocutory Appeal in Support re: [4] Notice (Other), [5] Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [4] Notice (Other) / Reorganized Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal or for an Order Denying the IRS Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE of Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal or for an Order Denying the IRS Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal. Document filed by WorldCom, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Mail Notice to Attorney(s)
                                                            Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Mail Letter of Notification to Bankruptcy Court
                                                              Mailed letter to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York as notification of filing of Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal (Case Number: 02-B-13533 (AJG).) with the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y. and the assignment of S.D.N.Y. Case Number: 07-cv-7414 (DLC). (laq)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee WorldCom, Inc.. (bkle)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                  DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: [1] Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Internal Revenue Service. (bkle)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Bankruptcy AppealCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez dated June 22, 2007. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 02-B-13533 (AJG). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Internal Revenue Service.Appellant Brief due by 9/10/2007.(bkle)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (bkle)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Case Designation
                                                                        Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (bkle)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?