USA v. DZHAMGAROVA
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00058-MKV-2

Tags
Last Updated October 25, 2021 at 1:50 PM DT (2.1 days ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Russell Felton +1 914 993 1908 David.Felton@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan Rebold +1 212 637 2512 jonathan.rebold@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Igor Reznik, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dabag, Hayg-taniel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Fineman +1 212 233 4500 +1 212 233 4501 finemanm@gmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Igor Reznik (2)
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/26/2021
County Bronx
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT IMMIGRATION FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/25/2021, Entered: None Travel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order
      LREF
      Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order
        LREF
        Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Order
          LREF
          Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Reconsideration
            LREF
            Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
              LREF
              Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Travel
                LREF
                Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Bond
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Travel
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Order to Continue - Speedy TrialCourt Filing
                      ORDER as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 1, 2021, at 10:00 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all time under the Speedy Trial Act be excluded from March 8, 2021, to July 1, 2021. Given the anticipated voluminous discovery productions by the Government; the need for Defendants to review discovery, meet with counsel, analyze and discuss motion practice, explore potential resolution of the charges, and/or prepare for trial; and Defendants' consent to exclude time; the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding all time from March 8, 2021, to July 1, 2021, outweigh the interest of the public and Defendants in a speedy trial. Time excluded from 3/8/2021 until 7/1/2021. (Status Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/9/2021) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                        WAIVER OF RIGHT TO BE PRESENT AT CRIMINAL PROCEEDING as to Igor Reznik. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (ap)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                          CONSENT TO PROCEED BY VIDEO CONFERENCE OR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE as to Igor Reznik. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (ap)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Plea Entered
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Plea entered by Ilona Dzhamgarova (1) Count 1 and Igor Reznik (2) Count 1 and Arthur Arcadian (3) Count 1 Not Guilty. (ap)
                                LREF
                                Blank  arraignment
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Arraignment as to Ilona Dzhamgarova (1) Count 1 and Igor Reznik (2) Count 1 and Arthur Arcadian (3) Count 1 held on 3/8/2021. Arraignment and initial conference as to all defendants. AUSA Jonathan Rebold and David Felton appeared for the government. Arthur Aidala, Michael Fineman and Lance Lazarro appeared on behalf of the defendants. All defendants entered a plea of not guilty. Next status conference scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 10am. In the interest of justice all time is to be excluded from today until 7/1/21. [SEE TRANSCRIPT FOR FULL DETAILS]. (Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Court Reporter Lisa Franco) (ap)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Initial Appearance as to (21-Cr-58-2) Igor Reznik held on 3/4/2021. Detention Hearing as to Igor Reznik held on 3/4/2021. Proceeding via AT&T. AUSA Jonathan Rebold. Defense Counsel Michael Bradley. Russian Interpreter needed. Proceeding: Initial Presentment. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $250,000 PRB; 4 FRP and moral suasion; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DMD; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Drug testing/treatment as directed by PTS; Home detention; GPS; Defendant to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by 3/12/2021*; *Passport requirement must be met by 3/8/2021, but D represents passport has already been surrendered to DMD. D may self-install monitoring equipment at direction of PTS. D may not perform any immigration services, including but not limited to counseling, advice, translation, or otherwise. -- Defendant advised by the Court of the right to be present, and consented to proceed by remote means. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Conference before District Judge on March 8, 2021. (bw)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Russell Felton appearing for USA. (Felton, David)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Fineman appearing for Igor Reznik. Appearance Type: Retained. (Fineman, Michael)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                        Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Igor Reznik from the United States District Court - District of Maryland. (jm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                          Arrest of Igor Reznik in the United States District Court - District of Maryland. (jm)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                            Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/18/21)(jm)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                              Attorney update in case as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. Attorney Jonathan Rebold for USA added. (jm)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                Case as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian ASSIGNED to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (jm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                  Case Designated ECF as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. (jm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                    INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. (jm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                      SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1. (jm)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Space Space

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 947 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?