Klenikov et al v. Gonzales et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-07441-HB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elena Dronova, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ix.netcom.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moseley +1 973 622 8176 +1 973 645 9493 moselaw@ix.netcom.com
No Logo Vladislav Klenikov, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ix.netcom.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moseley +1 973 622 8176 +1 973 645 9493 moselaw@ix.netcom.com
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Andrea Quarantillo, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Emilio Gonzalez, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Paul Novak, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Foley Square
Filed 8/22/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 12/12/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: that this action is dismissed as moot, without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/12/07) (dle)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from John D. Clopper dated 11/20/07 re: Counsel for Government defendant requests a 30 day extension of time to answer the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to 12/26/07 to answer Granted on Consent. SO ORDERED. Robert Mueller answer due 12/26/2007; Michael Hayden answer due 12/26/2007; Andrea Quarantillo answer due 12/26/2007; Department of Homeland Security answer due 12/26/2007; United States Citizenship & Immigration Services answer due 12/26/2007; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 12/26/2007; Central Intelligence Agency answer due 12/26/2007; Alberto Gonzales answer due 12/26/2007; Michael Chertoff answer due 12/26/2007; Emilio Gonzalez answer due 12/26/2007; Paul Novak answer due 12/26/2007. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/27/07) (db)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from John Clopper dated 10/23/07 re: The Government's request to adjourn the pretrial conference set for 10/25/07. ENDORSEMENT: 12/27/07 at 3:00 pm. Pretrial Conference reset for 12/27/2007 at 03:00 PM before Judge Harold Baer. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/24/07) (cd)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from John D. Clopper dated 10/12/07 re: counsel for the Government requests a 60 day extension of time -until December 21, 2007- to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: This is entirely too long answer or move w/in or by November 26, 07. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/22/07) (dle)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Dalton Clopper on behalf of Robert Mueller, Michael Hayden, Andrea Quarantillo, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency, Alberto Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak (Clopper, John)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 LetterCourt Filing
            LETTER addressed to Thomas Moseley from Linda Eckhouse, Judicial Asst. to Judge harold Baer, Jr. dated 8/28/2007 re: There will be a Pre-Trial Conference on 10/25/2007 at 4:15 in Room 2230.(jar)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2007 at 04:15 PM before Judge Harold Baer in Room 2230. (jar)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
                PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Robert Mueller, Michael Hayden, Andrea Quarantillo, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency, Alberto Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 625136).Document filed by Vladislav Klenikov, Elena Dronova.(mbe)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                  Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Case Designation
                    Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (mbe)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 180 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?