Peralta-Jimenez v. U.S.C.I.S.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-07386-GBD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nidia Peralta-Jimenez, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Uscis, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Serrin Andrew Turner +1 212 637 2701 +1 212 637 2686 serrin.turner@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/20/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 1/16/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PRO-SE
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Serrin Turner dated 1/15/08 re: Counsel for defendant has enclosed a stipulation and requests that it be so ordered by the Court. In light of the stipulation, I further request that the status conference scheduled for this matter on March 13, 2008 be adjourned. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/17/08) (js)
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL: that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, dismissed, without costs or attorney's fees to any party, subject to petitioner's right to reinstate the action within 90 days of the entry of this Stipulation and Order, by written notice to the Court, upon 10 days' prior to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the S.D.N.Y., if the CIS has not approved her application for naturalization. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/16/08) (tro)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Pretrial Conference - Initial
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/11/2007. Plaintiff and defendant counsel (AUSA Serrin Turner) present. AUSA expects 60 days for discovery. AUSA must send letter to the Court 30 days in advance of the next conference to update status. Next conference is set for 3/13/08 at 9:30 a.m. (dle)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Serrin Turner dated 11/8/07 re: Counsel for defendants requests that the initial conference be adjourned to a date after December 6, 2007. Counsel has been advised by Your Honor's chambers that an alternate time for the conference is available on December 11, 2007, at 9:45 a.m. It is requested that the initial conference be adjourned until that time. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/14/07) (js)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Serrin Turner dated 10/31/07 re: Counsel for defendants request an adjournment of the initial conference scheduled for November 1, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to December 4, 2007 at 9:45 a.m. Initial Conference set for 12/4/2007 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/5/07) (tro)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Response to Petition (Other)
            RESPONSE to Petition (Other). Document filed by U.S.C.I.S..(Turner, Serrin)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
              PRO SE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: A Pro Se Petrial Conference set for 11/1/2007 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/30/2007) (jar)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Serrin Andrew Turner on behalf of U.S.C.I.S. (Turner, Serrin)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Petition - other
                  PETITION FOR NATURALIZATION. Document filed by Nidia Peralta-Jimenez.(laq)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Case Designation
                    Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (laq)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 70 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?