USA v. DZHAMGAROVA
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00058-MKV-1

Tags
Last Updated September 14, 2021 at 6:20 PM DT (3.8 days ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Russell Felton +1 914 993 1908 David.Felton@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Rebold +1 212 637 2512 jonathan.rebold@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Ilona Dzhamgarova, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Aidala & Bertuna, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur Louis Aidala +1 718 238 9898 +1 718 921 3292 aidalaesq@aidalalaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Ilona Dzhamgarova (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/26/2021
County Bronx
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT IMMIGRATION FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order
      LREF
      Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order
        LREF
        Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Order
          LREF
          Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
            LREF
            Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Bond
              LREF
              Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                LREF
                Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Order to Continue - Speedy TrialCourt Filing
                            ORDER as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 1, 2021, at 10:00 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all time under the Speedy Trial Act be excluded from March 8, 2021, to July 1, 2021. Given the anticipated voluminous discovery productions by the Government; the need for Defendants to review discovery, meet with counsel, analyze and discuss motion practice, explore potential resolution of the charges, and/or prepare for trial; and Defendants' consent to exclude time; the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding all time from March 8, 2021, to July 1, 2021, outweigh the interest of the public and Defendants in a speedy trial. Time excluded from 3/8/2021 until 7/1/2021. (Status Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/9/2021) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                              WAIVER OF RIGHT TO BE PRESENT AT CRIMINAL PROCEEDING as to Ilona Dzhamgarova. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (ap)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                CONSENT TO PROCEED BY VIDEO CONFERENCE OR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE as to Ilona Dzhamgarova. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (ap)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Plea Entered
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Plea entered by Ilona Dzhamgarova (1) Count 1 and Igor Reznik (2) Count 1 and Arthur Arcadian (3) Count 1 Not Guilty. (ap)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  arraignment
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Arraignment as to Ilona Dzhamgarova (1) Count 1 and Igor Reznik (2) Count 1 and Arthur Arcadian (3) Count 1 held on 3/8/2021. Arraignment and initial conference as to all defendants. AUSA Jonathan Rebold and David Felton appeared for the government. Arthur Aidala, Michael Fineman and Lance Lazarro appeared on behalf of the defendants. All defendants entered a plea of not guilty. Next status conference scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 10am. In the interest of justice all time is to be excluded from today until 7/1/21. [SEE TRANSCRIPT FOR FULL DETAILS]. (Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Court Reporter Lisa Franco) (ap)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Russell Felton appearing for USA. (Felton, David)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 RemarkCourt Filing
                                          CONSENT TO PROCEED BY VIDEO OR TELE CONFERENCE as to Ilona Dzhamgarova. This proceeding was conducted by reliable video or telephone conferencing technology. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/4/2021) (bw)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 RemarkCourt Filing
                                            WAIVER OF RIGHT TO BE PRESENT AT CRIMINAL PROCEEDING as to Ilona Dzhamgarova. Accepted: (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/4/2021) (bw)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Initial Appearance as to Ilona Dzhamgarova held on 3/4/2021. Detention Hearing as to Ilona Dzhamgarova held on 3/4/2021. Proceeding via AT&T. AUSA Jonathan Rebold. Defense Counsel Arthur Aidala. Proceeding: Initial Presentment. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $250,000 PRB; 2 FRP; Secured by $10,000 cash/property; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/ and can seek PTS permission to travel to homes in SDFla and EDPa; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Defendant to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by 3/11/2021*; *surrender passport by 3/5/2021. D shall not perform any immigration services, practice immigration law, provide immigration consultations/advice (i.e., conduct that is at the core of the indictment, which charges to commit immigration fraud), except D may sign/submit form I4130s for clients' children abroad. The two FRP must also be of moral suasion. -- Defendant advised by the Court of the right to be present, and consented to proceed by remote means. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Conference before District Judge on March 8, 2021. (bw); (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/4/2021) (bw). Modified on 3/4/2021 (bw).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Arthur Louis Aidala appearing for Ilona Dzhamgarova. Appearance Type: Retained. (Aidala, Arthur)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                  Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Arthur Arcadian from the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (jm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                    Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/18/21)(jm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                      Arrest of Ilona Dzhamgarova, Arthur Arcadian in the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (jm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                        Attorney update in case as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. Attorney Jonathan Rebold for USA added. (jm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                          Case as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian ASSIGNED to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (jm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                            Case Designated ECF as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. (jm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                              INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. (jm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021 Sealed document
                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jus)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                  SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1. (jm)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 783 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?