USA v. DZHAMGAROVA
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00058-MKV-3

Tags
Last Updated January 12, 2022 at 1:28 PM EST (2.2 weeks ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Russell Felton +1 914 993 1908 David.Felton@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan Rebold +1 212 637 2512 jonathan.rebold@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Arthur Arcadian, Defendant

Represented by Lazzaro Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Andrew Kilduff +1 718 488 1900 +1 718 488 1927 lazzarolaw@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Arthur Arcadian (3)
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/26/2021
County Bronx
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT IMMIGRATION FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 73 Filed: 1/12/2022, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
    LREF
    Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/11/2022, Entered: None Letter Motion
      LREF
      Legal Document 69 Filed: 12/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
        LREF
        Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/29/2021, Entered: None Modify Conditions of Release
          LREF
          Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order
            LREF
            Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order
              LREF
              Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
                LREF
                Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Travel
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Order to Continue - Speedy TrialCourt Filing
                        ORDER as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 1, 2021, at 10:00 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all time under the Speedy Trial Act be excluded from March 8, 2021, to July 1, 2021. Given the anticipated voluminous discovery productions by the Government; the need for Defendants to review discovery, meet with counsel, analyze and discuss motion practice, explore potential resolution of the charges, and/or prepare for trial; and Defendants' consent to exclude time; the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding all time from March 8, 2021, to July 1, 2021, outweigh the interest of the public and Defendants in a speedy trial. Time excluded from 3/8/2021 until 7/1/2021. (Status Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/9/2021) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                          CONSENT TO PROCEED BY VIDEO OR TELE CONFERENCE as to Arthur Arcadian. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (ap)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                            WAIVER OF RIGHT TO BE PRESENT AT CRIMINAL PROCEEDING as to Arthur Arcadian. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (ap)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/8/2021) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Plea Entered
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Plea entered by Ilona Dzhamgarova (1) Count 1 and Igor Reznik (2) Count 1 and Arthur Arcadian (3) Count 1 Not Guilty. (ap)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  arraignment
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Arraignment as to Ilona Dzhamgarova (1) Count 1 and Igor Reznik (2) Count 1 and Arthur Arcadian (3) Count 1 held on 3/8/2021. Arraignment and initial conference as to all defendants. AUSA Jonathan Rebold and David Felton appeared for the government. Arthur Aidala, Michael Fineman and Lance Lazarro appeared on behalf of the defendants. All defendants entered a plea of not guilty. Next status conference scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 10am. In the interest of justice all time is to be excluded from today until 7/1/21. [SEE TRANSCRIPT FOR FULL DETAILS]. (Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Court Reporter Lisa Franco) (ap)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Russell Felton appearing for USA. (Felton, David)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 RemarkCourt Filing
                                      CONSENT TO PROCEED BY VIDEO OR TELE CONFERENCE as to Arthur Arcadian. This proceeding was conducted by reliable video or telephone conferencing technology. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/4/2021) (bw)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Initial Appearance as to Arthur Arcadian held on 3/4/2021. Detention Hearing as to Arthur Arcadian held on 3/4/2021. Proceeding via AT&T. AUSA Jonathan Rebold. Defense Counsel Lance Lazzaro. Proceeding: Initial Presentment. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $250,000 PRB; 2 FRP; Secured by $10,000 cash/property; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/ and can seek PTS permission to travel to homes in SDFl and EDPa; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Defendant to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by 3/11/2021*; *surrender passport by 3/5/2021. D shall not perform any immigration services, practice immigration law, provide immigration consultations/advice (i.e. conduct that is at the core of the indictment, which charges to commit immigration fraud), except D may sign/submit form I4130s for clients' children abroad. The two FRP must also be of moral suasion. -- Defendant advised by the Court of the right to be present, and consented to proceed by remote means. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Conference before District Judge on March 8, 2021. (bw); (Main Document 15 replaced on 3/4/2021) (bw). Modified on 3/4/2021 (bw).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                          Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Arthur Arcadian from the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (jm)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lance Lazzaro appearing for Arthur Arcadian. Appearance Type: Retained. (Lazzaro, Lance)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                              Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/18/21)(jm)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                Arrest of Ilona Dzhamgarova, Arthur Arcadian in the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (jm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                  Attorney update in case as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. Attorney Jonathan Rebold for USA added. (jm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                    Case as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian ASSIGNED to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (jm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                      Case Designated ECF as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. (jm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                        INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Ilona Dzhamgarova, Igor Reznik, Arthur Arcadian. (jm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1. (jm)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 365 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?