DURKIN et al v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:21-cv-01079

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2021 at 9:05 AM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Settlement Conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Report Of
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Complaint (Attorney)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?