USA v. McAfee
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00138-LGS

Tags
Last Updated May 5, 2021 at 8:42 PM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samson Aaron Enzer +1 212 637 2342 +1 212 637 2443 samson.enzer@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Anna Hanft +1 212 637 2334 Elizabeth.Hanft@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo McAfee, John David, Defendant
Officially listed as "John David McAfee"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

John David McAfee (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 3/2/2021
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
121-mj-01600-UA
Complaint
Citation
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES AND COMMODITIES FRAUD, 181349.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD, 18371.F SECURITIES AND TOUTING FRAUD CONSPIRACY, 181343.F WIRE FRAUD, 181956-F MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES (COMMODITIES AND SECURITIES FRAUD CONSPIRACY)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES (SECURITIES AND TOUTING FRAUD CONSPIRACY)
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956-4999.F MONEY LAUNDERING - FRAUD, OTHER
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
          Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant, Sealed Defendant 2.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/4/21)(jm)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
              Attorney update in case as to John David McAfee, Jimmy Gale Watson. Attorney Samson Aaron Enzer,Elizabeth Anna Hanft for USA added.. (jm)
                LREF
                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                Case as to John David McAfee, Jimmy Gale Watson ASSIGNED to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (jm)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                    Case Designated ECF as to John David McAfee, Jimmy Gale Watson. (jm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                      INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to John David McAfee, Jimmy Gale Watson. (jm)
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: 3/3/2021 Sealed document
                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jus)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Indictment (Sealed)
                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7. (jm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 ComplaintCourt Filing
                            COMPLAINT as to John David McAffe (1). In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 371, 1349, 1343, 1956 and 2 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein) (dif)[1:21-mj-01600-UA]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document  Oral Order
                              SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/10/2021)(dif)[1:21-mj-01600-UA]
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?