Kearney IRRV Trust v. Kenneth Potashner
State Civil Lawsuit Eighth Judicial District Court, Case No. A-13-686890-B

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 6, 2021 at 11:58 PM ST (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hansen, Josh, Plaintiff
No Logo Kearney IRRV Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo PAMPT LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Prieston, George L, Plaintiff
No Logo Rakauskas, Vitie, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Potashner Kenneth F, Defendant
Unknown Role, Newport Corp
Unknown Role, Parametric Sound Corp
No Logo Boytim, Raymond, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Oakes, Grant, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Fox, Kenneth, Consolidated Case Party
No Logo Kaplan, Robert, Consolidated Case Party
No Logo Norris, Elwood G., Consolidated Case Party
Unknown Role, Parametric Sound Corp
No Logo Putterman, Seth, Consolidated Case Party
Unknown Role, Parametric Sound Corp
No Logo Stark, Juergen, Consolidated Case Party
No Logo VTB Holdings, Inc., Consolidated Case Party
No Logo Wolfe, Andrew, Consolidated Case Party
Unknown Role, Parametric Sound Corp
No Logo SG VTB Holdings, LLC, Consolidated Case Party (Participant)
Unknown Role, Parametric Sound Corp
No Logo Stripes Group LLC, Consolidated Case Party (Participant)
No Logo Voyetra Turtle Beach, Inc., Consolidated Case Party (Participant)
No Logo Weisbord, Barry, Objector (Participant)
  Entries (569) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 569 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021 Certification
Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Certification of Additional Efforts at Compliance per Order dated May 28, 2021
    Blank 568 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021 Declaration
    Second Declaration of Ryan M. Moore In Support of Defendants' First Motion For Summary Judgment
      Blank 567 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021 Reply in Support
      Reply In Support of Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment
        Blank 566 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
        Motion to Seal/Redact Records: Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 AM; Result: Motion Granted; Comment: Motion to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Redact Portions of Defendants Motion to Compel Compliance with This Court's March 27, 2021 Order Compelling Production of Documents and For Sanctions Pursuant
          Blank 565 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
          Notice of Entry of Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with this Court's March 27, 2021 Order Compelling Production of Documents and for Sanctions
            Blank 564 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Order
            Order re Motion to Compel Compliance 05.25.21
              Blank 563 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Appendix
              Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants Second Motion for Summary Judgment (Standing), Volume 1
                Legal Document 562 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Opposition to Motion
                Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants Second Motion for Summary Judgment (Standing)
                  Legal Document 561 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Appendix
                  Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants First Motion for Summary Judgment, Volume 4
                    Legal Document 560 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Appendix
                    Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants First Motion for Summary Judgment, Volume 3
                      Legal Document 559 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Appendix
                      Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants First Motion for Summary Judgment, Volume 2
                        Legal Document 558 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Appendix
                        Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants First Motion for Summary Judgment, Volume 1
                          Blank 557 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Declaration
                          Declaration of Adam M. Apton, Esq., in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Opposition to Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment
                            Legal Document 556 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Opposition to Motion
                            Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants First Motion for Summary Judgment
                              Blank 555 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021
                              At Request of Court: Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 11:45 AM; Comment: Conference Call Re.: Evidentiary Hearing
                                Blank 554 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                ERRATA TO APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (STANDING) FILED UNDER SEAL
                                  Blank 553 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                  NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS KENNETH POTASHNER, JUERGEN STARK, AND VTB HOLDINGS, INC. SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE SPOLIATION SANCTIONS
                                    Blank 552 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Order
                                    Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion Against Defendants Kenneth Potsashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdings, inc. Setting Evidentiary Hearing Re Spoilation Sanctions
                                      Blank 551 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                      Notice of Hearing
                                        Blank 550 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Motion
                                        Motion: Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
                                          Blank 549 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                          EXHIBITS A AND B TO DECLARATION OF RYAN M. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL
                                            Blank 548 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                            Motion to Seal Confidential Exhibits to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel
                                              Blank 547 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Reply in Support
                                              Reply In Support of Defendants Motion to Compel Compliance with this Court's March 26, 2021 Order Compelling Production of Documents and for Sanctions
                                                Blank 546 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Opposition To Motion To Compel
                                                Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel
                                                  Blank 545 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order
                                                  Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Extend Opposition and Reply Deadlines re Defendants' Pending Motions for Summary Judgment
                                                    Blank 544 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                    Stipulation and Order to Extend Opposition and Reply Deadlines Re Defendants' Pending Motions for Summary Judgment
                                                      Blank 543 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Status Check
                                                      Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Status Check Re: Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing Parties Present: Defendant Attorney: Peek, Joseph S. Objector: Attorney: Kay, Rory T., Attorney: Apton, Adam Marc Consolidated Case Party: Attorney: Peek, Joseph S. Consolidated Case Party: Attorney: Peek, Joseph S. Consolidated Case Party: Attorney: Peek, Joseph S. Consolidated Case Party: Attorney: Peek, Joseph S.
                                                        Legal Document 542 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Motion for Sanctions
                                                        Order Shortening Time on Hearing Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdings, Inc. 4843-8092-0551 v.2
                                                          Blank 541 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document and Curative Action
                                                          Clerk's Notice of Amended Curative Action
                                                            Blank 540 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                            Notice of Hearing
                                                              Blank 539 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document and Curative Action
                                                              Clerk's Notice of Curative Action
                                                                Blank 538 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                DEFENDANTS FIRST MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                  Blank 537 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document
                                                                  Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document
                                                                    Blank 536 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                                    Notice of Hearing
                                                                      Blank 535 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                                      Notice of Hearing
                                                                        Blank 534 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                        Appendix of Exhibits to Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment (Standing)
                                                                          Blank 533 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                          DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (STANDING)
                                                                            Blank 532 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                            APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                              Blank 531 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                              DEFENDANTS FIRST MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                Blank 530 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                Motion to Redact and Seal Confidential Exhibits Regarding Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment
                                                                                  Blank 529 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                  Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment (Standing)
                                                                                    Blank 528 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                    Defendants First Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                                      Blank 527 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                      NOTICE OF ENTRY OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME
                                                                                        Blank 526 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                        NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS AND REDACT PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR WILLFUL SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE
                                                                                          Blank 525 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Order
                                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Redact Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintitff's Motion for Sanctions for Willful Spoliation of Evidence
                                                                                            Blank 524 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 ORDER shortening time
                                                                                            Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
                                                                                              Blank 523 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                                                              Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                Blank 522 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                  Blank 521 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                                                  DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT S MARCH 27, 2021 ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                    Blank 520 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                                                    EXHIBITS B-E, G, I-J, L-N TO DECLARATION OF RYAN M. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT S MARCH 27, 2021 ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                      Blank 519 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                      Motion to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Redact Portions of Defendants Motion to Compel Compliance with This Court S March 27, 2021 Order Compelling Production of Documents and For Sanctions Pursuant
                                                                                                        Blank 518 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Declaration
                                                                                                        Declaration of Ryan M. Moore in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with This Court's March 27, 2021 Order Compelling Production of Documents and for Sanctions
                                                                                                          Blank 517 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                          Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with this Court's March 27, 2021 Order Compelling Production of Documents and for Sanctions
                                                                                                            Blank 516 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Order Granting Order Shortening Time on Hearing Regarding Plaintiff s Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdings, Inc. for Willful Spoliation of Evidence; and Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                              Blank 515 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 ORDER shortening time
                                                                                                              Order Shortening Time on Hearing Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdin~ 4843-8092-0551 v.2
                                                                                                                Blank 514 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL
                                                                                                                  Blank 513 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Order
                                                                                                                  Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                    Blank 512 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS AND REDACT PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR WILLFUL SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE
                                                                                                                      Blank 511 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 All Pending Motions
                                                                                                                      Matter Heard
                                                                                                                        Blank 510 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                        Motion to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Redact Portions of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions for Willful Spoliation of Evidence
                                                                                                                          Blank 509 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Status Check
                                                                                                                          Matter Heard
                                                                                                                            Blank 508 Filed: 4/18/2021, Entered: 4/18/2021 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Redact Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions for Willful Spoliation of Evidence
                                                                                                                              Blank 507 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Status Report
                                                                                                                              Defendants' Status Report
                                                                                                                                Blank 506 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Renewed Motion to Modify Protective Order
                                                                                                                                  Blank 505 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/15/2021 Status Report
                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Status Report
                                                                                                                                    Blank 504 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                    Minute Order requesting Status Report
                                                                                                                                      Blank 503 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                        Blank 502 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 All Pending Motions
                                                                                                                                        Granted
                                                                                                                                          Blank 501 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                          Motion to Seal Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Ryan M. Moore in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                            Blank 500 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdings, Inc. for Willful Spoliation of Evidence; and Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                              Blank 499 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Motion to file Plaintiff s Motion for Sanctions against Defendants Kenneth Potashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdings, Inc. for Willful Spoliation of Evidence; and Memorandum of Law in Support and Attached Exhibit Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                Blank 498 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 497 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC S Motion to Compel Discovery, Volume 4
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 496 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                    Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC S Motion to Compel Discovery, Volume 3
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 495 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC S Motion to Compel Discovery, Volume 2
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 494 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                        Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff PAMTP LLC S Motion to Compel Discovery, Volume 1
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 493 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 492 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 491 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Temporary Seal Pending Court Approval
                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS B THROUGH H TO DECLARATION OF RYAN M. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 490 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF RYAN M. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 489 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION OF RYAN M. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 488 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 487 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdings, Inc. for Willful Spoliation of Evidence; and Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 486 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Motion to file Plaintiff s Motion for Sanctions against Defendants Kenneth Potashner, Juergen Stark, and VTB Holdings, Inc. for Willful Spoliation of Evidence; and Memorandum of Law in Support and Attached Exhibit Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 485 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: 3/3/2021 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 484 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 483 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                              (A815308) Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for Attorney's Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 482 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: 2/17/2021 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 481 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 480 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 479 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Check: Application for Attorney's Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 478 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                        Errata to Notice of Filing Declarations Pursuant to January 7, 2021 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 477 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Declarations Pursuant to January 7, 2021 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 476 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Order Granting in Part Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Motion To Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 475 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting in Part Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Motion to Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 474 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 motion to enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery on Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 473 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff PAMTP LLC S Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 472 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of George S. Howard Jr. In Opposition to Plaintiff Pamtp LLC's Motion to Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 471 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Brian Raphel In Opposition to Plaintiff Pamtp LLC's Motion to Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 470 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Non-Party Turtle Beach Corporation's Oppostion to Plaintiff Pamtp's Motion to Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 469 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Order Shortening Time;
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Motion to Enforce Court Order and Compel Discovery and Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 468 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Strike Jury Demand and Plaintiff's Motion to File Redacted Brief and Exhibits Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 467 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Defendants Motion to Strike Jury Demand and Plaintiff s Motion to File Redacted Brief and Attached Exhibits Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 466 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Commission Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Commission to Take Deposition and Receive Documents Outside the State of Nevada
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 465 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Application for Issuance of Commission to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Issuance of Commission to Take Deposition and Receive Documents Outside the State of Nevada of Joshua N. Weisbord
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 464 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of proceedings: Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 463 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Strike Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 462 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020 Scheduling and Trial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Business Court Scheduling Order and Order Setting Civil Jury Trial, Calendar Call and Pre-Trial Conference 08-02-21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 461 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: 10/12/2020 Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Time: 9:00 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 460 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: 10/12/2020 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Order Advancing Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Motion to File Redacted Brief and Attached Exhibits Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 459 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PER ORDER 11/12/20 Exhibits "1" Through "6" to Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Filed Under Seal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 458 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PER ORDER 11/12/20 Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Filed Under Seal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 457 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Redacted)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 456 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Motion to File Redacted Brief and Attached Exhibits Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 455 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Modify Protective Order and Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 454 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Order Denying Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 453 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Modify Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 452 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (A815308) Answer to Plaintiff Pamtp's LLC Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 451 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Director Defendants Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 450 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Modify Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 449 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26(h)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 448 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26(H)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 447 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: 8/27/2020 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Motion to Modify Protective Order and Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 446 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020 Order Shortening Time;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants Motion to Modify Protective Order and Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 445 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 444 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: 8/20/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Order Denying Defendants Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff s Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 443 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: 8/20/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 442 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 Notice of Submission of Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Submission Competing Order on Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 441 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff PAMTP LLC s Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26(h)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 440 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 439 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 438 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply In Support of Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC, SG VTB Holdings, LLC, Kenneth Fox, and Juergen Stark's Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 437 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order Continuing Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 436 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Opposition To Motion To Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The Dismissed Plaintiffs' Opposition to Plaintiff PAMTP LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26(h)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 435 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Opposition To Motion To Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition to Plaintiff PAMTP LLC'S Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26(h)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 434 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff PAMPT LLC s Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 433 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff PAMPT LLC s Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC, SG VTB Holdings, LLC, Kenneth Fox, and Juergen Stark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 432 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff PAMPT LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26(H)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 431 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document and Curative Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice of Curative Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 430 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Dismiss On Behalf of Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC, SG VTB Holdings, LLC, Kenneth Fox, and Juergen Stark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 429 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 428 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 427 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Dismiss ON BEHALF OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS STRIPES GROUP LLC, SG VTB HOLDINGS LLC, KENNETH FOX, AND JUERGEN STARK
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 426 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: 6/24/2020 Amended Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 425 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/23/2020 Demand for Prior Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff PAMTP LLC S Demand For Prior Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 424 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/23/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Consolidate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 423 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/23/2020 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Consolidate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 422 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 Business Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Business Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 421 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff PAMPT LLC s Response to Defendants Motion to Consolidate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 420 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 Motion to Consolidate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Motion to Consolidate and Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 419 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Related Case (A815308)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 418 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Order to Statistically Close Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Civil Order to Statistically Close Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 417 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 416 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 415 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Order Approving Plan of Allocation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 414 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 413 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Approving Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 412 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Approving Plan of Allocation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 411 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Time: 9:00 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 410 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020 Notice Of Non-opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Non-Opposition and Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation, and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 409 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Joinder to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Defendants' Limited Jointer to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Approval of Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation and an Award of Attorneys' Fees amd Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 408 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Joinder to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Director Defendants' Limited Joinder to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation, and an award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 407 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Check: Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 406 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ross D. Murray regarding Notice Dissemination, Publication and Requests for Exclusion Received to Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 405 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Stephen L. Kearny
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 404 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service- Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval and Supporting Declarations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 403 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Joshua E. Fruchter filed on behalf of Wohl & Fruchter LLP in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 402 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of David A. Knotts on behalf of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 401 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Richard A. Maniskas filed on behalf of RM Law, P.C. in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 400 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of David C. O'Mara filed on behalf of The O'Mara Law Firm, P.C., in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 399 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Adam D. Warden filed on behalf of Saxena White P.A. in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 398 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Lance M. Mykita
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 397 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Declaration of David A. Knotts and Adam D. Warden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 396 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 395 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 394 Filed: 1/18/2020, Entered: 1/18/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 393 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 392 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Associate Attorney Adam M. Apton
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 391 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion to Associate Attorney Adam M. Apton
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 390 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 389 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Associate Attorney Adam M. Apton on Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 388 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Response to Objector Barry Weisbord;s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 387 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 386 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 385 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: 12/26/2019 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Errata to Objector Barry Weisbord's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 384 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objector Barry Weisbord's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 383 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 382 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 381 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Telephonic Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Telephonic Conference at Request of Counsel to Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 380 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Joint Response to Purported Shareholders' Correspondence of December 6, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 379 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Bench Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Time: 1:30 PM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 378 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 377 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 376 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Check: Motion for Preliminary Approval
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 375 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Calendar Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Time: 9:30 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 374 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents and Declaration of David C. O'Mara in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 373 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Motion For Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner And VTB Holdings, Inc. For Willful Spoliation Of Evidence; And Memorandum Of Law IN Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 372 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Time: 9:30 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 371 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Notice of Change of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 370 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and Motion to Seal Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 369 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 368 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings to Produce Documents, Declaration in Support and Appendix Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 367 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings to Produce Documents (Redacted Version)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 366 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of David C O'Mara in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents 10/02/19 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 365 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents 10/02/19 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 364 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 363 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents and Declaration of David C. O'Mara in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 362 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix of Exhibits to Director Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Concerning Certain Stock Options Granted in the Hypersound Health, Inc. Subsidiary of Parametric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 361 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Exhibits to the Director Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the First and Third Causes of Action in the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint (Volume 4 of 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 360 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix of Exhibits to the Director Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the First and Third Causes of Action in the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint (Volume 3 of 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 359 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Exhibits to the Director Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the First and Third Causes of Action in the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint (Volume 2 of 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 358 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix of Exhibits to the Director Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the First and Third Causes of Action in the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint (Volume 1 of 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 357 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner and VTB Holdings Inc for Willful Spoliationof Evidence 12/10/13 - Stipulated Confidentialy Agreemtn and Protective order Regarding the Sealing of Court Records 9/27/19 Motion to Seal Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 356 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Kenneth Potashner and VTB Holdings Inc for Willful Spoliation of Eidence; and memorandum of Law in Support 12/10/13 - Stipulated Confidentialy Agreemtn and Protective order Regarding the Sealing of Court Records 9/27/19 Motion to Seal Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 355 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix of Exhibits to Director Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence Concerning Discussions Regarding a Potential Bonus Payment to the Independent Directors of Parametric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 354 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Director Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Reference to Other Litigation Involving Kenneth Potashner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 353 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 352 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Wayne Marino
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 351 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 350 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc. and Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 349 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 ~Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Joint Summary Judgment Motion In Excess of Page Limitations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 348 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix of Exhibits to Defendants' Motion In Limine to Exclude All Reference, Evidence, and Testimony Regarding Post-Merger Stock Performance foTurtle Beach Corp.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 347 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defenants' Motion In Limine to Exclude All Reference, Evidence, and Testimony Regarding Post-Merger Stock Performance of Turtle Beach Corp.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 346 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc. and Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Motion In Limine to Exclude All Reference, Evidence, and Testimony Regarding Post-Merger Stock Performance of Turtle Beach Corp.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 345 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendants' Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Damages Not Addressed In Plaintiffs' Expert's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 344 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendants' Motoin In Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Damages Not Addressed In Plaintiffs' Expert's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 343 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Damages Not Addressed In Plaintiffs' Expert's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 342 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Seal Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Kenneth Potashner and VTB Holdings, Inc. for Willful Spoliation of Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 341 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendants' Motion In Limine to Exclude the Opinions, Testimony,and Reports of J.T. Atkins
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 340 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendants' Motion In Limine to Exclude the Opinions, Testimony, and Reports of JT Atkins
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 339 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Opinions, Testimony, and Reports of J.T. Atkins
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 338 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Director Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Non-Party John Todd's Prior Litigation And Settlement With the SEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 337 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Director Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence Concerning Discussions Regarding A Potential Bonus Payment to the Independent Directors of Parametric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 336 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Director Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Concerning Certain Stock Options Granted in the Hypersound Health, Inc. Subsidiary of Parametric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 335 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Director Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the First and Third Causes of Action in The Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 334 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix of Exhibits to the Director Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the First Cause of Action in the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 333 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Director Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the First Cause of Action in the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 332 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on the Motions to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 331 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on the Motion s to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 330 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Joshua D.N. Hess In Support of Turtle Beach Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 329 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Turtle Beach's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 328 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix of Exhibits for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents (Per 9/4/19 Motion to Seal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 327 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of David C O'Mara in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents (Per 9/4/19 Motion to Seal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 326 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents (Per 9/4/19 Motion to Seal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 325 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 324 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents (Redacted Version)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 323 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix of Exhibits for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents (Redacted Version)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 322 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix of Exhibits for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Turtle Beach to Produce or Allow the Production of Weisbord Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 321 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Brian C. Raphel in Support of Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 320 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Opposition To Motion To Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTBH Holdings, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 319 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Exhibits for Motion to Compel Defendant's Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings to Produce Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 318 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of David C. O'mara in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 317 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Compel Defendant's Stripes Group LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC to Produce Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 316 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Time: 9:00 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 315 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings to Produce Documents, Declaration in Support and Appendix Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 314 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix to Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings to Produce Documents (Public Redacted Version)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 313 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of David C. O'Mara in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings to Produce Documents (Public Redacted Version)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 312 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Compel Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings to Produce Documents (Redacted Version)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 311 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Order Admitting to Practice (Maxwell Ralph Huffman, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 310 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Order Admitting to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Admitting to Practice (Maxwell Ralph Huffman, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 309 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Associate Counsel on Order Shortening Time (Maxwell Ralph Huffman, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 308 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Notice Of Non-opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Defendants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Associate Counsel on Order Shortening Time (Maxwell Ralph Huffman, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 307 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The Director Defendants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Associate Counsel on Order Shortening Time (Maxwell Ralph Huffman, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 306 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Motion to Appear as Out of State Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Associate Counsel on Order Shortening Time (Maxwell Ralph Huffman, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 305 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Order Granting VTB Holdings, Inc.'s and Specially Appearing Defendant Stripes Group LLC's and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Motion to Strike Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 304 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order Admitting to Practice (David A. Kotler, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 303 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Order Admitting to Practice (Ryan Martin Moore, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 302 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc.'s and Specially Appearing Defendant Stripes Group LLC's and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Motion to Strike Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 301 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Order Admitting to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Admitting to Practice (Ryan Martin Moore, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 300 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Order Admitting to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Admitting to Practice (David A. Kotler, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 299 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Associate Counsel (David A. Kotler) on an Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 298 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Associate Counsel (Ryan Martin Moore) on an Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 297 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Associate Counsel (Ryan Martin Moore) On An Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 296 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Associate Counsel (David A. Kotler) On An Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 295 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Order Admitting to Practice (Nicole C. Delgado, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 294 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Admitting to Practice (Nicole C. Delgado, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 293 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Associate Counsel (Nicole C. Delgado) On An Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 292 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Notice Of Non-opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Associate Counsel (Nicole C. Delgado) on and Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 291 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motoin to Associate Coiunsel (Nicole C. Delgado) On an Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 290 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Time: 09:49 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 289 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Jury Demand and Notice of Withdrawal of Prior Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 288 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 Notice of withdrawal of attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Timothy Z. LaComb, Esq.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 287 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 Clerk's Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 286 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' Motion to Strike Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 285 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and Order for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of James L. Honore Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 284 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: 4/19/2019 Application for Issuance of Commission to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Issuance of Commission to Take Deposition Outside the State of Nevada
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 283 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 282 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Order Regarding Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 281 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Regarding Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 280 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Check: Draft Order Granting Class Certification, including Notice Provisions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 279 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Submission of Defendants' Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 278 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings: Motion for Class Certifications
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 277 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Seal Exhibit "G" to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 276 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Seal Exhibit "G" to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 275 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 274 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Seal Exhibit "G" to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 273 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Order Regarding Search Terms and Custodian Dispute
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 272 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Regarding Search Terms and Custodian Dispute
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 271 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 270 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Seal Exhibit "G" to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 269 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 267 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings: Status Check and Hearing on Motions Re Search Terms
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 266 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs and Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Joint Motion for Hearing Regarding Search Term Dispute on Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 265 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing on the Joint Motion for Hearing regarding Search Terms Dispute on Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 264 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel (Alejandro E. Moreno)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 263 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to the Stripes Defendants' Supplemental Brief Regarding Search Terms
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 262 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Order Shortening Time Re Joint Motion On Pending Search Term Dispute
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 261 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Supplemental Brief Regarding Search Terms
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 260 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Shortening Time Re Joint Motion On Pending Search Term dispute
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 259 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Motion For Hearing Regarding Search Term Dispute On Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 258 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel (Alejandro E. Moreno)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 257 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 All Pending Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Time: 9:00 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 256 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Motion to Associate Counsel (Alejandro E Moreno)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 255 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Check: Discovery Search Terms
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 254 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Exparte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening TIme and Order Thereon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 253 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Associate Counsel (Alejandro E. Moreno)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 252 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Stipulation to Set Hearing on Discovery Search Terms
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 251 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation to Set Hearing On Discovery Search Terms
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 250 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel (Tim Lacomb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 249 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Business Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  1st Amended Business Court Scheduling Order and Order Setting Civil Jury Trial, Pre-Trial and Calendar Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 248 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC's and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Notice Regarding Search Terms and Custodians
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 247 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Search Terms and Custodian Dispute with Stripes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 246 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Dispute Regarding Search Terms
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 245 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 244 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Order Denying
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Denying Defendatns' Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 243 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Motion for class certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 242 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay and Plaintiff's Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 241 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 240 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 239 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Motion to Associate Counsel (Timothy Zimmer Lacomb, Esq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 238 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 237 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Business Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Business Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 236 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 235 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Motion to Set a Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 234 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set a Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 233 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 232 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 231 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Associate Counsel (Timothy Zimmer Lacomb, Esq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 230 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Set a Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 229 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Director Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 228 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer to Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 227 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Order Denying Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 226 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Submittal of Competing Order on Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 225 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing on Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 224 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 223 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Order Granting the Motion to Unseal the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 222 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Errata to Reply In Support of Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc. and Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 221 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Director Defendants' Reply Brief In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 220 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Suppplemental Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc. and Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 219 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply In Support of Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc. and Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting the Motion to Unseal the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 217 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 216 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 215 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal the Accompanying Motion to Unseal the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 214 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Brian C. Raphel In Support of Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc. and Specially Appearaing Defendants Stripes Groupo, LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 213 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant VTB Holdings, Inc. and Specially Appearing Defendants Stripes Group, LLC and SG VTB Holdings LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 212 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 211 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Unseal the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 210 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to File Under Seal the Accompanying Motion to Unseal the Amended Class Action and Derivative Compliant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 209 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNSEALED PER MINUTE ORDER 02/02/18 Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint Demand for Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 208 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to File the Amended Class Action and Derivative Complaint Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 207 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Order Following Writ Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 206 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Following Writ Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 205 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Response to Notice of Submission of Defendant's Proposed ORder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 204 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Submission of Defendants' Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 203 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings: Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 202 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Check: Further Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Order Setting Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 200 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Response to Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Time: 1:30 PM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Calendar Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Time: 8:45 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal William M. O'Mara as Counsel and for Removal from CM/ECF List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Time: 8:30 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Reporters Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings: Motion to Extend Stay May 13, 2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Order Denying Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Proposed) Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Extend Stay Pending Consideration By the Nevada Supreme Court and Request For an Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Motion for Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants' Motion to Extend Stay Pending Consideration By the Nevada Supreme Court and Request For an Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 191 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Motion to Extend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Motion to Extend Stay Pending Consideration By the Nevada Supreme Court and Request For an Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 190 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Order Associating Adam David Warden to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Order Admitting to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Associating Adam David Warden to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Check: Supreme Court Decision / Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Reporters Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings: Status Check February 17, 2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs, Raymond Boytim and Grant Oaks' Motion to Associate Counsel (Adam David Warden, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Defendants' Motion to Stay Action Pending Consideration of Writ Petition by the Nevada Supreme Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Associate Counsel (Adam David Warden, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Re ESI Protocol
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Director Defendants' Status Report Regarding the Parties' Search Term Discussions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Status Report on Search Term Discussions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Check: ESI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: 12/30/2014 Order Setting Civil Jury Trial, Pre-Trial, and Calendar Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Business Court Scheduling Order and Order Setting Civil Jury Trial, Pre-Trial and Calendar Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Reporters Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing Re Defendants' Motion to Stay and Proposed ESI Protocol
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 All Pending Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Time: 8:00 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing re: Proposed ESI Protocol
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Consideration by the Nevada Supreme Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Business Court Scheduling Order and Trial Setting Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deendants' Motion to Stay Pending Consideration by the Nevada Supreme Court on an Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Business Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Business Court Scheduling Order and Trial Setting Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Raymond Boytim as a Proposed Class Representative, Pursuant to NRCP 41(a)(2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants' Joint Notice of Submission of Proposed ESI Protocol
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Subpoena Decus Tecum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Check: ESI Protocol - Draft of Agreed Protocol or Competing Versions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Application for Issuance of Commission to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Issuance of Commission to Take Deposition and Receive Documents Outside the State of Nevada
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Director Defendants' Answer To plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Reporters Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings: Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Time: 8:30 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting The Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Their Unredacted Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention and Exhibit "A" Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  The Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Their Unredacted Answer to Class Action Complaint in Intervention.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants Turtle Beach Corporation and VTB Holdings, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Answer (Business Court)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Director Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Order Denying Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Order Denying Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Denying Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Reporters Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing on Motions to Dismiss Auguest 28, 2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Check Re: Unsealing the Complaint filed 2/28/14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 All Pending Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Time: 8:30 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting The Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Their Unredacted Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention and Certain Exhibits Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Director Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action in Complain in Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants Turtle Beach Corporation and VTB Holdings, Inc.'s Reply Supporting Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Director Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss The First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Their Unredacted Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention and Exhibit "A" Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed Under Seal - The Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action COmplin Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed Under Seal - Appendix of Exhibits Referenced in the DIrector Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the FIrst Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs Boytim and Oakes' Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      THe Director Defendants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File A Single 45 Page "Omnibus" Brief In Response to Two Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Exparte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Single 45 Page "Omnibus" Brief in Response to Two Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and Consent to Service by Electronic Means Through E-Filing Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix of Exhibits Referenced in the Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Their Unredacted Motion to Dismiss The First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention and Certain Exhibits Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants Turtle Beach Corporation and VTB Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  The Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action in Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint in Intervention (Redacted)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting the Director Defendants' Motion to Seal (1) Their Unredacted Response to The California Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plainitff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and (2) The Declaration of Andrew Wolfe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/4/2014 Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: 5/13/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Order Associating David A. Knotts to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: 5/13/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Entry of Order Associating Randall Jay Baron to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Associating David A. Knotts to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Order Granting Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Associating Randall Jay Baron to Practice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: 5/2/2014 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs, Raymond Boytim and Grant Oaks' Renewed Motion to Associate Counsel (Randall Jay Baron, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: 5/2/2014 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs, Raymond Boytim and Grant Oaks' Renewed Motion to Associate Counsel (David Anthony Knotts, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: 5/2/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Their Unredacted Response to the California Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and the Declaration of Andrew Wolfe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Order Granting in Part the Intervening Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure, and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liaison Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Order on Plaintiffs' Counsel Leadership Structure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting In Part the Intervening Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure, and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liaison Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order on Plaintiffs' Counsel Leadership Structure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Status Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Check: Leadership Structure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Reporters Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing on Plaintiffs' Boytim and Oakes Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order Granting the Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Unredacted Version of their Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting the Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Unredacted Version of Their Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs Boytim and Oakes' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liaison Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Declaration of David C. O'Mara in Further Support of Plaintiffs Boytim and Oakes' Motion to Intervene Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liason Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs Boytim and Oakes' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate, and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liason Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Renewed Motion to Associate Counsel (Randall Jay Baron, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Renewed Motion to Associate Counsel (David Anthony Knotts, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Director Defendants' Response to the California Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel Contains Confidential Information - Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Nevada Rules for Sealing and Redacting Court Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jonathan M Stein in Support of Co- Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Proposed Intervenors Boytim and Oaks Motion to Intervene Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post Close Lead and Liaison Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Director Defendants' Response to the California Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Proposed Intervenors Boytimand Oaks' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liaison Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Their Unredacted Response to the California Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and the Declaration of Andrew Wolfe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Vacate Hearing on Motions to Dismiss Pending Disposition of Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation and Order to Vacate Hearing on Motions to Dismiss Pending Disposition of Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Class Action Complaint in Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs Boytim and Oakes' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liaison Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Intervening Plaintiffs Boytim and Oakes' Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of David C. O'Mara in Support of Plaintiffs Boytim and Oakes' Motion to Intervene, Request to Vacate the Prior Plaintiff Leadership Structure and Appoint Post-Close Lead and Liaison Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendants to File in Response to Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendants to File in Response to Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Director Defendants' Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix to the Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants Parametric Sound Corp., VTB Holdings, Inc., and Paris Acquisition Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action in the Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        The Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts I and Counts II of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (REDACTED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Director Defendants' Motion to Seal Unredacted Version of their Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts I and Counts II of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Order Granting Parametric Defendants' Motion to Redact Portions of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Seal Cettain Exhibits to Appendix Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Parametric Defendants' Motion to Redact Portions of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Seal Certain Exhibits to Appendix Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Submission of Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal or Redact Court Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of G Mark Albright in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Seal or Redact Court Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed Under Seal - Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Associate Counsel (David Anthony Knotts, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Associate Counsel (Randall Jay Baron, Esq.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Motion to Seal/Redact Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Parametric Defendants' Motion to Redact Portions of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Seal Certain Exhibits to Appendix Thereto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Notice Of Firm Name Change
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Change of Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Reporters Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Allow Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation and Order to Allow Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Notice of Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Order Granting Parametric Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Order Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Parametric Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Time: 10:00 AM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Parametric Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Redacted)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion to Associate Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Associate Counsel David A Knotts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Parametric Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 185 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?