Beverly v. Plug Power Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-02004-ER
District Judge Edgardo Ramos, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 24, 2021 at 11:43 AM DT (2.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dawn Beverly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Bradley Linkh +1 646 722 4180 glinkh@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo Andrew Marsh, Defendant
No Logo Paul B. Middleton, Defendant
No Logo Plug Power, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 3/8/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 Summons issued
    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc...(jgo)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Case Designated ECF.
        Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Case Designation
            Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dawn Beverly. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PLUG POWER INC., ANDREW MARSH, and PAUL B. MIDDLETON, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Dawn Beverly..(Linkh, Gregory)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Civil Cover Sheet
                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24221592)Document filed by Dawn Beverly..(Linkh, Gregory)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 88 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?