Westward Investment Properties, L.L.C. et al v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 6:21-cv-00012-EKD
District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon, presiding

Tags
Last Updated March 26, 2021 at 4:14 PM DT (3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony DeMarco West, Plaintiff
No Logo Westward Investment Properties LLC, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None State Court Records - Electronic
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Compel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Order Requesting State Court Record
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                Oral ORDER. Senior Judge Norman Moon is no longer assigned to this case. The Clerk of Court shall reassign the case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/12/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(al)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 notice of removal
                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lynchburg Circuit Court, Case Number CL21000115-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $402.00, Receipt No. AVAWDC-3647878), filed by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B - Tesla Motors, Inc. Entity Information, # (3) Exhibit C - Westward Investment Properties, L.L.C. Entity Information, # (4) Exhibit D - Retail Installment Sale Contract, # (5) Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 84 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?