Five Star Academy, Inc. et al v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 6:21-cv-00011-EKD

Tags
Last Updated June 25, 2021 at 12:32 PM DT (2.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Five Star Academy, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Tony DeMarco West, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Motion Hearing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None State Court Records - Electronic
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Compel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Order Requesting State Court Record
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                          Oral ORDER. Senior Judge Norman Moon is no longer assigned to this case. The Clerk of Court shall reassign the case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/12/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(al)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 notice of removal
                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lynchburg Circuit Court, case number CL21000116-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $402, Receipt No. AVAWDC-3647823), filed by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- State Court Summons & Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B-Tesla Motors, Inc. Entity Information, # (3) Exhibit C-Five Star Academy, Inc. Entity Information, # (4) Exhibit D-Retail Installment Sale Contract, # (5) Civil Cover Sheet)(al) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/9/2021) (al). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/9/2021) (al). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/9/2021) (al). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/9/2021) (al). Modified on 3/9/2021 Attachments replaced with flattened version (al).
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 147 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?