Warter v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG21090913

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:29 PM DT (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Warter, Richard, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Barry Esq, David N., Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 6/20/2021, Entered: None ?
Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/01/2022 10:00 AM D- 520
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None ?
        Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted (3 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None ?
          Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Statement of Richard Warter Filed (11 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
              Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (53 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 7 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 05/28/2021 02:00 PM D- 520
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                    Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Initial Case Management Conference 06/30/2021 09:30 AM D- 520 (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard Warter (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                            Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (9 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 17 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?