State of California, Department of Transporta v. Woldamanuel
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21086029

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 12:23 AM ST (4.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Aki Parking, Defendant
No Logo Woldamanuel, Aklilu, Defendant
No Logo Guzman, Alina, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None ?
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aklilu Woldamanuel Filed (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None ?
    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aki Parking Filed (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?
        Initial Case Management Conference 05/28/2021 02:30 PM D- 518 (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State of California, Department of Transportation (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
              Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (28 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?