Castellanos v. State of California
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21088725

Tags
Last Updated August 21, 2021 at 4:14 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Castellanos, Hector, Petitioner
No Logo Delgado, Joseph, Petitioner
No Logo Okawa, Saori, Petitioner
No Logo Robinson, Michael, Petitioner
Officer/Director, Tyco Electronics Ltd.
No Logo Service Employees International Union, Petitioner
No Logo Service Employees International Union California State Council, Petitioner
No Logo Katie Hagen, Respondent
No Logo State of California, Respondent
No Logo Alarcon, Molly J., Attorney
No Logo Berzon, Stephen, Attorney
No Logo Fuentes, Reynaldo, Attorney
No Logo Herrera, Dennis J., Attorney
No Logo Hiltachk, Thomas W, Attorney
No Logo Johansen, Robin B., Attorney
No Logo Trujillo-jamison, Kenneth M., Attorney
No Logo Welch, Sean P., Attorney
No Logo Zelidon-zepeda, Jose A, Attorney
No Logo Ashar, Sameer, Third Party
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Third Party
No Logo Communities Of Color Organizations, Third Party
No Logo Communities-of-color Organizations, Third Party
No Logo Dubal, Veena, Third Party
No Logo Estlund, Cynthia, Third Party
No Logo Fisk, Catherine, Third Party
No Logo Garden, Charlotte, Third Party
No Logo Gould, William Iv, Third Party
No Logo Grodin, Joseph, Third Party
No Logo Independant Drivers Alliance Of California, Third Party
No Logo Lee, Stephen, Third Party
No Logo Partnership For Working Families, Third Party
No Logo Paul, Sanjukta, Third Party
No Logo Protect App-based Drivers And Services, Third Party
No Logo Saucedo, Leticia, Third Party
No Logo Schiller, Reuel, Third Party
No Logo Shah, Hina, Third Party
No Logo Stone, Katherine, Third Party
No Logo White, Davis, Third Party
No Logo Yandel, Keith, Third Party
No Logo Yes On 22-save App-based Jobs & Services, Third Party
No Logo Zatz, Noah D., Third Party
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Writ of Mandate
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 89 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None ?
Petition for Writ of Mandate Granted
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None ?
    Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed (3 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None ?
      Petition for Writ of Mandate Taken Under Submission (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 86 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None ?
        TR - Petition for Writ of Mandate - Parties To Appear
          Blank 85 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
          This Tentative Ruling is made by Judge Frank Roesch Parties are to appear.
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None ?
            Response To Petitioners' Evidentiary Objections Filed (4 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None ?
              Proof of Service Response Filed (3 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                Response to Intervenors Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Petition Filed (9 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Reply in Support of Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (24 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (3 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (3 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (24 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Proof of Service by Mail Filed (4 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                            Rejection Letter Issued on Other Ex Parte (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                              Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (17 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                                Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (85 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  Opposition to Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (28 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Granted (3 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (3 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                        Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Granted (3 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Granted (3 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                            Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Granted (3 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                                              Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (69 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for Service Employees International Union, Service Em (24 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                  Proof of Service by Mail Filed (6 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                    Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for Sameer Ashar, Veena Dubal, Cynthia Estlund, Cathe (26 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                      Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief (19 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                        Petition for Writ of Mandate 08/20/2021 02:00 PM D- 17
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                          Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                            Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (4 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                              Answer to Complaint Filed for State of California, Katie Hagen (10 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                Case Management Statement of Hector Castellanos, Joseph Delgado, Saori Okawa, Michael Robinson, Serv (11 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Proof of Service by Mail Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Case Management Statement of State of California Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Case Management Statement of Davis White, Keith Yandel Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Dropped
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled (3 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              This Tentative Ruling is made by Judge Frank Roesch Parties are to appear.
                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                TR - Demurrer to Complaint - Parties To Appear
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Amici Curiae Brief of Law Proffessors in Opposition to Respondents' Demurrer Filed (18 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for Independant Drivers Alliance of California (17 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Granted (2 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Proof of Service Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Reply Brief in Support of Demurrer to Petition Filed (22 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Reply Supporting Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (16 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for Communities-of-Color Organizations - Proof of Ser (29 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Petitioner (26 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for Partnership for Working Families (24 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Opposition to Demurrer Filed (28 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Proof of Personal Service on Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae As to City and County of San F (5 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for City and County of San Francisco (19 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for Partnership for Working Families
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for City and County of San Francisco (19 Pages)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Application Re: File brief Amicus Curiae Filed for Sameer Ashar, Veena Dubal, Cynthia Estlund, Cathe (27 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Proof of Service by Mail Re: Ex Parte Application Re: File Brief Amicus Curiae Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Proof of Service Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Case Management Conf Continuance 06/04/2021 09:00 AM D- 17
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Stipulation Regarding Intervention by Real Parties in Interest Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Civil Ex-Parte Hearing Dropped from dept: 17 date: 04/08/2021 time: 03:30 PM
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Answer to Complaint Filed for Protect App-Based Drivers and Services, Davis White, Keith Yandel (17 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Motion to Intervene Hearing Dropped from dept: 17 date: 06/10/2021 time: 03:30 PM
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Order Allowing Intervention by Real Parties in Interest Protect App-Based Drivers & Services, Davis (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Civil Ex-Parte 04/08/2021 03:30 PM D- 17
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service By U.S.Mail and By Electronic Service Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Re Intervention (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement of Hector Castellanos Filed (33 Pages)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement of Protect App-Based Drivers and Services, Davis White, Keith Yandel Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            Proof of Service by Mail Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Prroposed Answer in Intervene (115 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                Other Ex Parte Reservation Set for dept: 17 date: 04/08/2021 time: 03:30 PM
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Demurrer And Demurrer Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                    Demurrer to Complaint Filed by State of California (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                      Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 05/20/2021 03:30 PM D- 17
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by State of California, Katie Hagen (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Demurrer Filed (23 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 04/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 17
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Intervene Hearing Confirmed for 06/10/2021 03:30 PM D- 17
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Intervene Filed for Third Party (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Hector Castellanos, Jo (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Proof of Service of Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference 05/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 17 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                              Proof of Service by Mail Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hector Castellanos (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                  Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (28 Pages)

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?