Bivens v. Tesla, INC
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21088813

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:35 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bivens, Malaisha, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Casey Jr., Edward C., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Granted (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None ?
    Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for Malaisha Bivens (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None ?
        Initial Case Management Conference 06/25/2021 02:30 PM D- 518 (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Malaisha Bivens (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
              Complaint - Other Employment Filed (15 Pages)

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 28 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?