Earnest v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21089374

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:35 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Earnest, Michael, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bradley, Marcus J., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conference 05/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 21 (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 5 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None ?
    Complex Determination Hearing 04/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
      Blank 4 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ?
      Complex Designation Requested
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ?
        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Earnest (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ?
          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ?
            Complaint - Other Employment Filed (23 Pages)

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 21 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?