Escudero v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21090128

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:31 PM DT (1.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Escudero, Benjamin Maldonado, Plaintiff
No Logo Maldonado, Adriana Garcia, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Yalung, Romeo Lagman, Defendant
No Logo Yalung, Vilma, Defendant
No Logo Galvin, Vincent, Attorney
No Logo Hirsig, Peter J., Attorney
No Logo Swanson, Benjamin D, Attorney
No Logo Home Interiors Furniture LLC, Cross Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Cross Defendant
Officially listed as "Telsa, Inc"
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Auto Tort
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None ?
Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None ?
    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None ?
      Notice of Posting Of Jury Fee Filed (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None ?
        Reply supporting Filed (16 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None ?
          Re-Notice of Change Of Law Firm Filed (4 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None ?
            Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Filed (18 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None ?
              Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Telsa, Inc (7 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 28 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                Dismissal As to Cross Defendant: Home Interiors Furniture LLC Entered
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Home Interiors Furniture LLC Filed (4 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Rejection Letter Issued on Answer to Complaint (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 08/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Tesla, Inc. (99 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                            Summons on Complaint Issued (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                              First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed (6 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                                Summons on Cross Complaint Issued (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  Cross-Complaint Filed for Vilma Yalung, Romeo Lagman Yalung (Amended) (6 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    Answer to Complaint Filed for Romeo Lagman Yalung, Vilma Yalung (5 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      First Amended Complaint Filed (15 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                        Notice of Entry of Order Filed (7 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend (2 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                                            Demurrer to Complaint Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                                              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Demurrer to Complaint Filed (16 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                  Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Demurrer Filed (35 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                    Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 06/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                      Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Tesla, Inc. (27 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                        Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                          Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/04/2021 09:00 AM D- 24 (3 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                            Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                              Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                Initial Case Management Conference 10/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 20 (2 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Benjamin Maldonado Escudero (2 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Complaint - Auto Tort Filed (11 Pages)

                                                                        Space Space

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 478 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?