Kovalcin, et al v. AMR Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-07022-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 13, 2016 at 4:46 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Suzanne Mladenik, Plaintiff

Represented by Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes, LLP

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

v.
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
American Airlines, Inc. Officer/Director, American Airlines, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.
No Logo Globe Aviation Services, Defendant
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ICTS International NV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Paul Robbins +1 212 448 1100 +1 212 448 0066 probbins@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Midway Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo NorthWest Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael D. Steger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Douglas Steger +1 845 727 1750 +1 845 689 2155 msteger@steger-law.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/10/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 9/5/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 112 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File Document
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality. Document filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Steger, Michael)
    LREF
    Legal Document 111 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
      LREF
      Legal Document 110 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims By The Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiff's Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 109 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. i/s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
          LREF
          Legal Document 108 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
            LREF
            Legal Document 107 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 105 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
              FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 03 CV 7022(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/4/07) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
              LREF
              Legal Document 104 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [102] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond)
                LREF
                Legal Document 103 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: [102] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 102 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007, Terminated: 9/5/2007 ~Motion for Judgment
                  MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..(Barry, Desmond)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 101 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, and 4 World Trade Center LLC, contained in the Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 100 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 4/4/2008 Terminate Motions
                        Motions terminated: (1058 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 61 in 1:05-cv-07243-AKH) CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 99 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (PANYNJ), contained in the Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant AirTran, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 98 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                            AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 97 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                              PRIVACY ACT ORDER. To the extent that the Government objects to providing the parties with the requested information on the ground that such production is prohibited by the Privacy Act, the objection is overruled and the US shall produce the Requested Information to the parties purs. to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11). This Document relates to 21MC101. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 96 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government. Memorandum of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey in Support of Focused Discovery from the Government. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Jacob, Beth)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                    DECLARATION of Robert A. Clifford, Gregory P. Joseph, Marc S. Moller, Ronald L. Motley, Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 93 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                        DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                          DECLARATION of Wolfgang A. Dase, Esq. in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 9/5/2007 ~Motion to Sever
                                            CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without prejudice (This document relates to All Cases); the Cross-Claims by Cross-claim pltffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trace Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trace Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability complaint and Cross-claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against deft AirTran, are dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/11/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(sn)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT... It is hereby agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel that any disclosure of a document or information by the Government shall not constitute a waiver by the Government of any privilege or other protection that may be applicable or information not disclosed. This Non-Waiver Agreement does not constitute and agreement by the Government to produce any particular document or information in the litigation, and is without prejudice to any objections the Government may have to any party's discovery requests. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al. This Document also relates to 21MC101.(rjm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that deft. AirTran Airways, Inc. is dismissed w/out prejudice and w/out costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97) and in any other actions involving United Airlines Flight 175 departing from Logan Airport in Boston... 03-6802, 02-6364, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-7153, 02-2802, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-7152, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365. Ptffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 6/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                      DECLARATION of Keith Harris in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                        DECLARATION of Richard A Williamson in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice... that defendant MIDWEST AIRLINES, formally known as MIDWEST EXPRESS AIRLINES, is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the following individual action consolidated in the: In Re: September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 1. Feller v AMR Corporation, etal: 04 CV 09627... and as further set forth in said Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 81 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that Defts. UAL Corporation and United Airlines, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11th Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-8918, 04-7291, 03-7076, 02-8916, 02-7156, 02-7155, 03-6803, 03-7040, 02-3676, 03-7022, 03-7070, 02-7289, 03-7071, 02-7144... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) (Orig. doc. Filed in case no. 21 MC 97, as doc. #949)(ae)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                    Case Designated ECF. (rjm, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Justin B. Kaplan is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #872)(sn)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Joseph F. Rice is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #871)(sn)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE that defendant AirTran Airways, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice... without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21MC97) and in any other actions involving American Airlines Flight 11 departing from Logan Airport in Boston or damages arising from the World Trade Center site or the surrounding areas: 02-3676, 02-8918, 03-7076, 03-6809, 02-8916, 02-7156, 03-6803, 02-7155, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7070, 03-7071, 02-7144, 02-7290, 02-7289, 03-7032. This Document relates to All Cases. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 1/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue.(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/06) (Original document filed in 21mc97 as doc. #863) (kco, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: that dft Continental Airlines, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the individual actions consolidated in the In Re September Litigation (21 MC 97). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/06) Original document filed in case #21 MC 97, document #822.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as against defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc., and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/04) (dt, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendant United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                  Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendant United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    NOTICE of Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. And US AIR Group d/b/a US Airways Express To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Securitas AB served on 3/17/2004, answer due 4/6/2004. Service was accepted by Nina Svensson. (sac, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P. without prejudice of Security Equipment Manufacturer Defendants. (This document relates to 21MC97 as document #487.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/04) (pl, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Joinder
                                                                                            JOINDER to join the affidavit of Jeffrey J. Ellis. Document filed by The Boeing Company.(jco, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Joinder
                                                                                              JOINDER to the Motion for Summary Judgment of defendants United Air Lines, Inc. and UAL Corporation. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(jco, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP dismissing the cases governed by this motion. Document filed by US Airways, Inc. (db, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant America West Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by America West Airlines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Adoption Master Answer To Plaintiff's Flight 11 Amended Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joinder of The Affidavit of Jeffrey J. Ellis. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc. (ps, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, In. to Plaintiffs' Amended Filght 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by American Trans Air, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services. (sac, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (laq, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adoption Of Master Answer Of Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (jmi, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of adopting Massachusetts Port Authority's Master Answer to plaintiffs' amended flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (jp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (sac, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(djc, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Motion for Elizabeth Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/22/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21mc97, doc. #334.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                              MOTION; for an order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of the F.R.C.P. granting Elizabeth Smith permission to appear as attorney of record for the plaintiffs; w/ attch. affidavit in support; Document filed by plaintiffs. (orig. document docketed in 02cv0456 as document #42).. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                ORDER; that the cases listed immediately below are active cases but plaintiffs in those cases have filed VCF claims. However, these cases were not included in Appendix A to the 3/1/2004 Order. These cases also may be subject to motions to dismiss by defendants but these cases shall remain active subject to any dismissal motions. 02cv452, 02cv458, 02cv6361, 03cv7031, 02cv6364, 02cv7143, 02cv7146, 02cv7147, 02cv7148, 02cv7150, 02cv7224, 03cv7098, 03cv7638, 03cv10325, 02cv7243, 02cv7245, 03cv7075, 02cv7258, 02cv7267, 03cv7133, 02cv7271, 02cv7272, 02cv7290, 03cv6866, 02cv7608, 03cv2004, 02cv10160, 03cv6183, 03cv6801, 03cv6802, 03cv6803, 03cv6804, 03cv6805, 03cv6809, 03cv6811, 03cv6944, 03cv7022, 03cv7028, 03cv7070, 03cv7071, 03cv7076, 04cv1857, 04cv2519. The foregoing cases will be subject to the discovery and briefing schedule originally set forth in the 3/24/2004 Order as modified by Order of 4/7/2004. Accordingly, plaintiffs in the foregoing cases will provide defendants with documents responsive to Richard Williamson's 3/22/2004 letter by 4/16/2004. Thereafter, defendants will review the materials produced by plaintiffs to determine whether depositions will be necessary. If defendants determine that depositions are necessary, defendants will contact plaintiff's counsel in the individual action to obtain consent for the depositions. Defendants will then request a conference with the Court to determine whether defendants may take such depositions. Defendants shall serve and file motions to dismiss by 5/17/2004. Opposing memoranda and affidavits shall be served and filed by 5/31/2004. Reply papers shall be served and filed by 6/7/2004. Oral argument on the motions to dismiss will be held on 6/9/2004 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa, Part I on 4/9/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #332(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Richard A. Williamson dated 3/24/2004; counsel for the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and World Trade Center Properties LLC write to propose the following schedule: plaintiffs are to provide the documents requested by 4/23/2004. By 5/24/2004, defendants will decide whether defendants need to take any depositions before they are able to move to dismiss. If defendants need any depositions, defendants will first contact the plaintiffs' counsel whose case it is and ask whether plaintiffs consent. Defendants will then ask for a conference with Your Honor to determine whether defendants may take such deposition(s) before moving. If depositions are conducted, defendants will move to dismiss within 30 days of the last deposition. Opposing papers will be served within two weeks after the motion(s) to dismiss are served, and reply papers will be served within one week after the opposition papers are served. If defendants do not need any depositions, defendants will serve motion(s) to dismiss by 5/24/2004. Opposing papers will be served by 6/7/2004, and reply papers will be served by 6/14/2004. Counsel also request that plaintiff Madeleine Zuccala's action (the Fiedelberg action) be added to the cases listed in the 3/18/2004 Order which are subject to motions to dismiss at this time. So Ordered. This document relates to 03cv7018, 03cv6966, 03cv7051, 03cv7022, 03cv7019, 02cv7152, 02cv6362, 02cv7244, 03cv7134, 02cv7231, 03cv6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #328.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                    CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB at the following address: Securitas AB c/o Lindhagensplan 70, Box 12307, SE-102 28, Stockholm, Sweden on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 569. (ps, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing Received
                                                                                                                                      CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 569, RECEIVED ON: 3/30/04. (ps, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                        ORDER; the parties appeared before me on 3/17/2004 to show cause why plaintiffs, who had claims pending in the Victim Compensation Fund (VCF), as listed on Appendix A attached to my Order of 3/1/2004, should be granted more time to dismiss their cases... I hereby Order the following: A. Cases or plaintiffs listed immediately below shall be dismissed for the reasons as set forth in this Order: 02cv7031, 02cv7032, 02cv6363, 02cv7185, 02cv10054, 03cv194, 03cv195, 03cv5139, 03cv7043 as to plaintiffs Katja Tatjana Bothe and Costanze Menzel, 03cv7051 as to plaintiffs Steven Feidelberg, Kathleen Lozier, Meredith Anne Fry, Meg Glasser, Jay Michelstein, Helene Passaro, Midori Takahashi, Gregory Stevens, 03cv7064, 03cv6968 as to plaintiff Beth Ann Faragher, 03cv7022 as to plaintiffs Carol Waldie, Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster. B. The following cases or plaintiffs were incorrectly identified on Appendix A to my 3/1/2004 Order as having claims before the VCF; these cases may proceed in their normal course as active cases: 02cv1727, 02cv7145, 03cv6863. C. Plaintiffs listed immediately below had filed claims with the VCF but withdrew such claims in favor of litigation. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants' counsel will propose a briefing schedule for motions to dismiss based on waiver by 3/24/2004, as as further set forth in this Order: 02cv6362, 02cv7231, 03cv6966, 03cv6968, 03cv7018, 03cv7019, 03cv7022. D. The following 3 cases concern individuals on whose behalf another family member has filed a claim with the VCF. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. The briefing schedule defendants' counsel submit on 3/24/2004 shall also apply to any motions based on waiver that defendants file concerning these cases: 02cv7152, 02cv7244, 03cv7134. E. Plaintiffs in the following cases are German insurance companies who allege subrogation claims for insureds who died in the September 11th attacks. Personal representatives for such insureds have filed claims in the VCF, raising an issue of whether the right to file suit has been waived. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit contentions and supporting documentation to defendants liaison counsel by 4/2/2004 as to their rights to sue. Defendants who then wish to bring a motion to dismiss shall describe any discovery they believe to be necessary, and a briefing schedule: 03cv7043, 04cv1382, 04cv1912. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #316.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Order of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                          ORDER; the parties appeared before me on 3/17/2004 to show cause why plaintiffs, who had claims pending in the Victim Compensation Fund (VCF), as listed on Appendix A attached to my Order of 3/1/2004, should be granted more time to dismiss their cases... I hereby Order the following: A. Cases or plaintiffs listed immediately below shall be dismissed for the reasons as set forth in this Order: 02cv7031, 02cv7032, 02cv6363, 02cv7185, 02cv10054, 03cv194, 03cv195, 03cv5139, 03cv7043 as to plaintiffs Katja Tatjana Bothe and Costanze Menzel, 03cv7051 as to plaintiffs Steven Feidelberg, Kathleen Lozier, Meredith Anne Fry, Meg Glasser, Jay Michelstein, Helene Passaro, Midori Takahashi, Gregory Stevens, 03cv7064, 03cv6968 as to plaintiff Beth Ann Faragher, 03cv7022 as to plaintiffs Carol Waldie, Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster. B. The following cases or plaintiffs were incorrectly identified on Appendix A to my 3/1/2004 Order as having claims before the VCF; these cases may proceed in their normal course as active cases: 02cv1727, 02cv7145, 03cv6863. C. Plaintiffs listed immediately below had filed claims with the VCF but withdrew such claims in favor of litigation. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants' counsel will propose a briefing schedule for motions to dismiss based on waiver by 3/24/2004, as as further set forth in this Order: 02cv6362, 02cv7231, 03cv6966, 03cv6968, 03cv7018, 03cv7019, 03cv7022. D. The following 3 cases concern individuals on whose behalf another family member has filed a claim with the VCF. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. The briefing schedule defendants' counsel submit on 3/24/2004 shall also apply to any motions based on waiver that defendants file concerning these cases: 02cv7152, 02cv7244, 03cv7134. E. Plaintiffs in the following cases are German insurance companies who allege subrogation claims for insureds who died in the September 11th attacks. Personal representatives for such insureds have filed claims in the VCF, raising an issue of whether the right to file suit has been waived. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit contentions and supporting documentation to defendants liaison counsel by 4/2/2004 as to their rights to sue. Defendants who then wish to bring a motion to dismiss shall describe any discovery they believe to be necessary, and a briefing schedule: 03cv7043, 04cv1382, 04cv1912. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #316.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTIONS ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeffrey Scott Thompson for Suzanne Mladenik, Ronald L. Motley for Suzanne Mladenik, Jodi Westbrook Flowers for Suzanne Mladenik, Robert T. Haefele for Suzanne Mladenik, Donald A. Migliori for Suzanne Mladenik, Mary F. Schiavo for Suzanne Mladenik admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2004) Original Endorsements filed in case no. 21 MC 97, docs. # 289 (Jeffrey Scott Thompson), # 290 (Ronald L. Motley), # 291 (Jodi Westbrook Flowers), # 292 (Robert T. Haefele), # 293 (Donald A. Migliori), # 304 (Mary Schiavo).(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. United Airlines, Inc. served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. American Trans Air, Inc. served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. AMR Corporation served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Angie Mays. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Colgan Air, Inc. served on 1/2/2004, answer due 1/22/2004. Service was accepted by Valeri A. Leblank. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. US Airways, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Garl Goodwin. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. American Airlines, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Angie Mays. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Globe Aviation Services served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Todd Smith. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Smiths Heimann GMBH served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Michael Muller. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Michael Muller. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin ; Michelle Lancaster ; Suzanne Mladenik ; Carol Waldie. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Quantum Magnetics, Inc. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Lowell Burnett. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin ; Michelle Lancaster ; Suzanne Mladenik ; Carol Waldie. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Pinkerton's, Inc. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Dawn Schulze. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin ; Michelle Lancaster ; Suzanne Mladenik ; Carol Waldie. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Dawn Schulze. Document filed by Carol Waldie. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Boeing Company served on 1/2/2004, answer due 1/22/2004. Service was accepted by Armeic Harmon. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin ; Michelle Lancaster ; Suzanne Mladenik ; Carol Waldie. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Massachusetts Port Authority served on 1/2/2004, answer due 1/22/2004. Service was accepted by Janice Bollman. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin ; Michelle Lancaster ; Suzanne Mladenik ; Carol Waldie. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. City of Portland, Maine, Massachusettes Port Authority served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Brandi Maxwell. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin ; Michelle Lancaster ; Suzanne Mladenik ; Carol Waldie. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Marie McAlevy. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Aixa Flores. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Aixa Flores. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Smiths Detection-Warren, Inc. served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by John Pecinkas. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Huntleigh USA Corporation served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Kathy Richardson. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. Original Document filed in 21mc97, Doc#266. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Globe Aviation Services served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Quantum Magnetics, Inc. c/o Secretary of State served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Registered Mail #597 175 329. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin ; Michelle Lancaster ; Suzanne Mladenik ; Carol Waldie. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Smiths Heimann GMBH served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint on Heimann Systems Corp. Service was accepted by Secretary of State on 1/8/04. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Massachusetts Port Authority served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Maria Snow. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. City of Portland, Maine, Massachusettes Port Authority served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Maria L. Stromsky, Portland City Clerk's Office. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Securitas AB served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Smiths Heimann GMBH served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Globe Aviation Services served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. ICTS International NV served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. US Airways, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Smiths Detection-Warren, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Pinkerton's, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Huntleigh USA Corporation served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Colgan Air, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Boeing Company served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Quantum Magnetics, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster, Suzanne Mladenik, Carol Waldie. ICTS International NV waiver sent on 1/6/2004, answer due 3/8/2004. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against Massachusetts Port Authority, AirTran Airways, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., NorthWest Airlines Corporation, Midway Airlines Corporation, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., American Trans Air, Inc., America West Airlines, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Document filed by Suzanne Mladenik. Related document: [1] Complaint.(yv, ) Received in night deposit box on 1/14/04 at 11:05 p.m. Modified on 1/23/2004 (yv, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Answer Due Date re: [9] Amended Complaint, as to AMR Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; American Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Burns International Security Services Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Colgan Air, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Globe Aviation Services answer due on 1/26/2004; Huntleigh USA Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; ICTS International NV answer due on 1/26/2004; Pinkerton's, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Securitas AB answer due on 1/26/2004; The Boeing Company answer due on 1/26/2004; US Airways, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION CONSENT AND ORDER TO CHANGE ATTORNEY that Motley Rice LLC is being substituted as counsel for the plaintiffs in this action, instead of Speiser Krause Nolan & Granito. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/6/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED American Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2003, answer due 2/27/2004. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster, Suzanne Mladenik, Carol Waldie. AMR Corporation waiver sent on 12/29/2003, answer due 2/27/2004. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Kenneth P. Nolan . (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Consolidation - Member
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Case consolidated with 1:21-mc-97. (rjm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case accepted as related to 1:21mc97. Notice of assignment to follow. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER; granting [2-1] motion for an order permitting her to place the within action on the Court's suspense docket pursuant to this Court's Order dated July 22,2003. Purs. to the Order issued 7/22/03 in In re 9/11 Litigation, 21 MC 97 (AKH), and applicable to this case, the pltff's motion to place this action on the suspense docket is granted. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003, Terminated: 9/26/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster, Suzanne Mladenik, Carol Waldie for an order permitting her to place the within action on the Court's suspense docket pursuant to this Court's Order dated July 22,2003 . Return Date not indicated. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484540. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:21mc97. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?