Kaden Southard, et al v. Nisha Marathe, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. 21-CIV-00126

Tags
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 9:58 PM ST (1 month ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AL-RAWI, DUAA, Plaintiff
No Logo SOUTHARD, KADEN, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo DOES 1 TO 10, Defendant
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant
No Logo KHURANA, RIDHIMA, Defendant
No Logo MARATHE, NISHA, Defendant
No Logo RANDHAWA, NAVPREET S, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo KHURANA, RIDHIMA, Cross Defendant
No Logo MARATHE, NISHA, Cross Defendant
No Logo RANDHAWA, NAVPREET S, Cross Defendant
No Logo ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE, Cross Defendant
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Answer (Unlimited)
Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
    Blank 9 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
    Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...
      Blank 8 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Notice of Reassignment
      Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Amended Summons Issued / Filed
        Amended Summons Issued / Filed
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 First Amended Complaint
          First Amended Complaint
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Notice of Assignment
            Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
              Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Notice Of Posting Jury Fees
              Notice of Posting Jury Fees
                Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet
                Civil Case Cover Sheet
                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Summons issued
                  Summons Issued / Filed
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Complaint
                    Complaint

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 89 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?