Chase Gharrity v. Elon Musk, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2021-0199-JRS

Tags
Last Updated March 12, 2021 at 1:19 PM EST (9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gharrity, Chase, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Chase Gharrity"
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Antonio J. Gracias"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Brad W. Buss"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
Officer/Director, Advance Auto Parts Inc
Officer/Director, Cavium Networks
Officer/Director, Aecom Technology Corp
Officer/Director, Ramtron International Corp
Officer/Director, TuSimple Holdings Inc.
Marvell Technology, Inc. Officer/Director, Marvell Technology, Inc.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Mizuno, Hiromichi, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hiromichi Mizuno"
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
No Logo James Murdoch, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen Wilson-Thompson, Defendant
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimbal Musk"
Officer/Director, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Officer/Director, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Ellison, Lawrence J. Ellison, Lawrence J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Larry Ellison"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Oracle Systems Corporation Officer/Director, Oracle Systems Corporation
Officer/Director, Nextera Enterprises,inc.
Officer/Director, Mollusk Holdings, LLC
Officer/Director, Lawrence Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Cephalopod Corp
Officer/Director, Ozark Holding Inc.
Officer/Director, Leapfrog Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, Netledger, Inc.
Officer/Director, C-cor Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, K12 Inc.
No Logo Rice, Linda Johnson, Defendant
Officially listed as "Linda Johnson Rice"
Officer/Director, Bausch & Lomb, Inc.
Officer/Director, Omnicom Group Inc.
Officer/Director, Kimberly Clark Corp
Officer/Director, Dial Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Grubhub Seamless Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Enova International, Inc.
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robyn M. Denholm"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Officer/Director, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Juniper Networks, Inc. Officer/Director, Juniper Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, Echelon Corp
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Steve Jurvetson"
Officer/Director, Athenahealth, Inc.
Officer/Director, Draper Associates, LP
Officer/Director, Draper Associates, Inc.
Officer/Director, Draper Timothy C
Officer/Director, Fisher John H N
Officer/Director, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Nominal Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Order
Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Lori W. Will on behalf of Defendants Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Larry Ellison, Antonio J. Garcias, Steve Jurvetson, Hiromichi Mizuno, Kimbal Musk, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Kathleen Wilson-Thompson, and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
    Blank 8 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Withdrawal
    Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Lori W. Will on behalf of Defendants Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Larry Ellison, Antonio J. Garcias, Steve Jurvetson, Hiromichi Mizuno, Kimbal Musk, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Kathleen Wilson-Thompson, and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. with Certificate of Service
      Blank 7 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Order
      Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings)
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021
        Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings
          Blank 5 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Entry of Appearance
          Entry of Appearance on behalf of Defendants Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Larry Ellison, Antonio J. Gracias, Steve Jurvetson, Hiromichi Mizuno, Kimbal Musk, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, and Kathleen Wilson-Thompson and nominal defendant Tesla, Inc. with Certificate of Service
            Blank 4 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021
            Entry of Appearance of William M. Lafferty, Susan W. Waesco, and Sabrina M. Hendershot of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (with Certificate of Service)
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021 Public Version
              Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint - PUBLIC VERSION
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021
                Certificate of Rule 5.1
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 8/8/2021 Complaint
                  Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint - FILED UNDER SEAL

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 773 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?